CarR/GWR "CR-3" Class 0-4-0ST
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
15/01/1931 | Reallocation | 1338 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
14/02/1931 | Reallocation | 1338 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | CED | Cardiff East Dock | |
1934 | Condemned | 1339 | COND | ||||
12/1943 | Reallocation | 1338 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | TN | Taunton | For use at Bridgwater Docks |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1338 | TN | Taunton | TN | Taunton | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 1338 | TN | Taunton | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
30/09/1963 | Condemned | 1338 | 98W | COND |