CarR/GWR "CR-3" Class 0-4-0ST
Class | CarR (CarR) | CarR | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CarR | 5 | 1338 | 05/1898 | CHYS CED TN TN 87D W |
Cardiff Cathays Cardiff East Dock Taunton Taunton Swansea East Dock Withdrawn |
15/01/1931 14/02/1931 12/1943 15/06/1947 18/06/1960 09/1963 |
30/09/1963 | |
CarR | 6 | 1339 | 1898 | W | Withdrawn | 1934 | 1934 |