SHT/GWR "SHT-2" Class 0-4-0ST
Class | SHT | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHT | 11 | 1141 | 06/1906 | DG DG W |
Danygraig Danygraig Withdrawn |
23/03/1946 15/06/1947 07/1952 |
18/07/1952 |
SHT | 12 | 1143 | 06/1908 | DG 84G W |
Danygraig Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/12/1959 16/11/1960 |
16/11/1960 |
SHT | 18 | 1145 | 08/1918 | DG W |
Danygraig Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/1959 |
20/07/1959 |