Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 426 Today
» 1522 Yesterday
» 8163 Week
» 19868 Month
» 351357 Year
» 427944 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

83 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Type B) BR (Tops) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
E3024 83001 04/07/1960 17/07/1983 23 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/01/1985 24.59
E3025 83002 11/07/1960 17/07/1983 23 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/12/1984 24.49
E3026 83003 04/08/1960 04/05/1975 14.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 30/06/1975 14.91
E3027 83004 31/08/1960 15/01/1978 17.42 Cut British Rail (at Willesden MPD) 31/12/1978 18.35
E3028 83005 23/09/1960 17/07/1983 22.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/11/1984 24.20
E3029 83006 04/10/1960 17/07/1983 22.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/10/1984 24.09
E3030 83007 27/10/1960 17/07/1983 22.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/12/1984 24.19
E3031 83008 11/11/1960 17/07/1983 22.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/11/1984 24.07
E3032 83009 25/11/1960 19/03/1989 28.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 05/08/1993 32.72
E3033 83010 16/12/1960 17/07/1983 22.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/12/1984 24.06
E3034 83011 08/03/1960 17/07/1983 23.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/11/1984 24.75
E3035 83012 03/07/1961 01/03/1989 27.67 Prs Preserved 55.80
E3098 E3303 83013 03/1961 17/07/1983 22.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/10/1984 23.65
E3099 E3304 83014 05/1961 17/07/1983 22.17 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/11/1984 23.56
E3100 83015 20/06/1962 25/02/1988 25.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 20/04/1993 30.85