Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 420 Today
» 1522 Yesterday
» 8157 Week
» 19862 Month
» 351351 Year
» 427938 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

83 Bo-Bo


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/07/1972 Reallocation 3028     GS Glasgow Shields Road  
26/01/1974 Reallocation 83003     GS Glasgow Shields Road  
02/02/1974 Reallocation 83005 GS Glasgow Shields Road LG Longsight (Electric)  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 83003 GS Glasgow Shields Road LG Longsight (Electric)  
04/05/1975 Condemned 83003 LG Longsight (Electric)   COND  
15/01/1978 Condemned 83004       COND  
17/07/1983 Condemned 83001       COND  
17/07/1983 Condemned 83002       COND  
17/07/1983 Condemned 83005 LG Longsight (Electric)   COND  
17/07/1983 Condemned 83006       COND  
17/07/1983 Condemned 83007       COND  
17/07/1983 Condemned 83008       COND  
17/07/1983 Condemned 83010 99R     COND  
17/07/1983 Condemned 83011       COND  
17/07/1983 Condemned 83013       COND  
17/07/1983 Condemned 83014       COND  
25/02/1988 Condemned 83015 99R     COND  
17/05/1988 Reallocation 83012     WN Willesden  
01/03/1989 Condemned 83012 WN Willesden   COND  
19/03/1989 Condemned 83009       COND