Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 420 Today
» 1522 Yesterday
» 8157 Week
» 19862 Month
» 351351 Year
» 427938 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

83 Bo-Bo


Class BR (Pre Tops) BR (Type B) BR (Tops) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
AL3/A 3024   83001 04/07/1960 W Withdrawn 17/07/1983 17/07/1983
AL3/A 3025   83002 11/07/1960 W Withdrawn 17/07/1983 17/07/1983
AL3/A 3026   83003 04/08/1960 GS
LG
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Longsight (Electric)
Withdrawn
26/01/1974
11/05/1974
04/05/1975
04/05/1975
AL3/A 3027   83004 31/08/1960 W Withdrawn 15/01/1978 15/01/1978
AL3/A 3028   83005 23/09/1960 GS
LG
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Longsight (Electric)
Withdrawn
01/07/1972
02/02/1974
17/07/1983
17/07/1983
AL3/A 3029   83006 04/10/1960 W Withdrawn 17/07/1983 17/07/1983
AL3/A 3030   83007 27/10/1960 W Withdrawn 17/07/1983 17/07/1983
AL3/A 3031   83008 11/11/1960 W Withdrawn 17/07/1983 17/07/1983
AL3/A 3032   83009 25/11/1960 W Withdrawn 19/03/1989 19/03/1989
AL3/A 3033   83010 16/12/1960 W Withdrawn 14/02/1970
17/07/1983
17/07/1983
AL3/A 3034   83011 08/03/1960 W Withdrawn 17/07/1983 17/07/1983
AL3/A 3035   83012 03/07/1961 R
W
Reinstated
Withdrawn
17/05/1988
01/03/1989
01/03/1989
AL3/A 3098 3303 83013 04/03/1961 W Withdrawn 17/07/1983 17/07/1983
AL3/B 3099 3304 83014 06/05/1961 W Withdrawn 17/07/1983 17/07/1983
AL3/A 3100   83015 20/06/1962 W Withdrawn 06/12/1969
25/02/1988
25/02/1988