Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 195 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2310 Week
» 24816 Month
» 328006 Year
» 1549571 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

70 C-C


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
26/07/1941 To Service CC1   NEW BTN Brighton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation CC2     BTN Brighton  
09/1948 To Service 20003   NEW BTN Brighton  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 20001 BTN Brighton 73A Stewarts Lane  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 20002 BTN Brighton 73A Stewarts Lane  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 20003 BTN Brighton 73A Stewarts Lane  
22/08/1966 Reallocation 20001 73A Stewarts Lane 75A Brighton  
22/08/1966 Reallocation 20002 73A Stewarts Lane 75A Brighton  
22/08/1966 Reallocation 20003 73A Stewarts Lane 75A Brighton  
06/10/1968 Condemned 20003 75A Brighton   COND  
12/1968 Condemned 20002 75A Brighton   COND  
01/1969 Condemned 20001 75A Brighton   COND