Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 187 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2302 Week
» 24808 Month
» 327998 Year
» 1549563 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

70 C-C


Class SR BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
  CC1 20001 26/07/1941 BTN
73A
75A
W
Brighton
Stewarts Lane
Brighton
Withdrawn
26/07/1941
11/03/1959
22/08/1966
01/1969
01/1969
  CC2 20002 09/1945 BTN
73A
75A
W
Brighton
Stewarts Lane
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/03/1959
22/08/1966
12/1968
12/1968
    20003 09/1948 BTN
73A
75A
W
Brighton
Stewarts Lane
Brighton
Withdrawn
09/1948
11/03/1959
22/08/1966
06/10/1968
06/10/1968