Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 322 Today
» 799 Yesterday
» 5387 Week
» 17165 Month
» 306557 Year
» 817659 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



Reliable $1 Web Hosting by HostBig

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Guestbook
BRDatabase Guestbook
Thanks for visiting my website. Please leave your comments...
Total Entries: 88   Entries Viewed Per Page: 10
1 2 [3] 4 5 ... 9
Name Comments
68) ihedi 
Location:
Gniew Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 6.1; WOW64) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/51.0.2704.103 Safari/537.36 View Web Page 
Friday, 13 July 2018 18:38 IP: 103.204.108.145 Write a comment

Unia a pędzenie stomatolog - dentysta Ursynów z form zewnętrznych, takich niczym aura, usterki bądź kradzieże.
67) John Whiteoak  Male
Location:
Sunderland Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 10.0; Win64; x64) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/66.0.3359.181 Safari/537.36
Friday, 25 May 2018 19:58 Host: host86-175-63-133.range86-175.btcentralplus.com Write a comment

Fabulous source of information, thank you!
66) Gerry  Male
Location:
Toronto, ON. Canada Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (iPad; CPU OS 11_2_2 like Mac OS X) AppleWebKit/604.1.34 (KHTML, like Gecko) GSA/43.0.185608249 Mobile/15C202 Safari/604.1
Tuesday, 27 February 2018 22:49 Host: CPEf0f2498e35e3-CMf0f2498e35e0.cpe.net.cable.rogers.com Write a comment

Many thanks for this database.
Being a BR(Ne) ex.LNER follower, I knew nothing about a Johnson 0-4-4T No. 1647 which I was given. Thanks to your database, I was able to i.d. the engine. !!!
65) Andrew Harvey-Adams  Male
Location:
Hertfordshire Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (iPad; CPU OS 11_2_5 like Mac OS X) AppleWebKit/604.5.6 (KHTML, like Gecko) Version/11.0 Mobile/15D60 Safari/604.1
Tuesday, 13 February 2018 16:56 Host: host86-164-239-147.range86-164.btcentralplus.com Write a comment

Can I visit the site
64) Iwan Astley  Male
Location:
North Wales Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 6.3; WOW64; Trident/7.0; Touch; rv:11.0) like Gecko
Friday, 19 January 2018 18:13 IP: 95.147.193.235 Write a comment

Most informative, thanks for all the effort put in.
63) TomUK  Male
Location:
Altrincham Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 6.1; Win64; x64) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/61.0.3163.100 Safari/537.36
Friday, 3 November 2017 14:58 Host: 027ce78f.bb.sky.com Write a comment

Just watched an excellent British Transport Film called "Fully Fitted Freight" - it featured Stanier Black Five, 45238. Thanks to your great website I was able to find out everything I needed to know about this engine's 30 year history.
I recommend the above documentary to anyone with an interest in the golden days of steam.
62) Steve  Male
Location:
Oxfordshire Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 10.0; Win64; x64) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/61.0.3163.100 Safari/537.36
Thursday, 2 November 2017 19:41 Host: host81-152-135-67.range81-152.btcentralplus.com Write a comment

Excellent site - clearly laid out and very useful. A job well done!
61) Stan Brown  Male
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Linux; Android 5.1; Hudl 2 Build/LMY47I) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/62.0.3202.73 Safari/537.36
Thursday, 2 November 2017 13:13 IP: 94.118.168.30 Write a comment

Just visiting
60) Christopher Watkinson  Male
Location:
South Yorkshire Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Linux; Android 6.0.1; SM-J500FN Build/MMB29M) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/58.0.3029.83 Mobile Safari/537.36 MSN AIM  Skype
Sunday, 22 October 2017 07:30 Host: 141.202.6.51.dyn.plus.net Write a comment

Not been into anything to do about railways etc very long. Your website so far seems really exciting.Just the sort of info I've been looking for,for so long. Will be visiting again a lot more.Keep up the really good work. Fantastic. Chris.
59) Adam Bridgewater  Male
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 10.0; Win64; x64) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/60.0.3112.101 Safari/537.36 Skype
Sunday, 27 August 2017 20:38 Host: 5ac44053.bb.sky.com Write a comment

I love your website. Brilliant idea. I use it a lot for many things, and I really appreciate the time and effort put into it.
View RSS Feed
1 2 [3] 4 5 ... 9