Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 593 Today
» 1155 Yesterday
» 4000 Week
» 28802 Month
» 257766 Year
» 334353 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



Reliable $1 Web Hosting by HostBig

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Guestbook
BRDatabase Guestbook
Thanks for visiting my website. Please leave your comments...
Total Entries: 200   Entries Viewed Per Page: 10
1 ... 18 19 [20]
Name Comments
10) Alastair 
IP logged Unknown
Sunday, 1 February 2015 00:45 IP: 95.145.233.189 Write a comment

Outstanding site, just discovered it. Plenty of useful information.
9) Alastair 
IP logged Unknown
Sunday, 1 February 2015 00:35 IP: 95.145.233.189 Write a comment

Just discovered your site. Outstanding and very informative
8) Ray 
IP logged Unknown
Saturday, 12 July 2014 04:37 IP: 86.139.138.128 Write a comment

Fantastic site. Stumbled on by a happy accident
7) Dave Stapleton 
IP logged Unknown
Monday, 11 March 2013 00:14 IP: 86.136.185.159 Write a comment

Great website and database, very helpful.

I am looking for information and photographs of Class 3F LMS 7266 (BR 47266) Jinty, can anyone help please?
6) Derek Green 
IP logged Unknown
Friday, 11 January 2013 07:29 IP: 213.249.226.111 Write a comment

Many thanks indeed, this site is so great to move around and highly informative. It is helping me catalogue my recent preservation photos. I have made a donation as well.
5) Phil Young 
IP logged Unknown
Wednesday, 7 May 2014 23:15 IP: 178.22.161.74 Write a comment

Thanks for this site it is great to think people are so committed to compiling the info and presenting it in such a user friendly way. Thanks for assisting me in my hobby. If only aviation legislation was presented this way, my job would be so much easier. Cheers
4) Jon 
IP logged Unknown
Thursday, 8 November 2012 06:34 IP: 62.31.139.66 Write a comment

I agree with Steve Smith's sentiments regarding the premature scrapping of standards, and dont forget that many B1s and A1s only worked for about 15 years.

The waste of taxpayers money was compounded by building very expensive low powered diesels which were employed on slow moving loose coupled freight services that the existing steam locos could have coped with at little extra expense (except maybe a staff pay rise that recognised the dirty conditions they faced).
3) Steve Smith 
IP logged Unknown
Thursday, 6 June 2013 23:35 IP: 86.8.9.255 Write a comment

What a fantastic data set. A huge undertaking much appreciated and excellent for research purposes. It makes the premature scrapping of the BR Standards very plain to see. A wasteful strategy, surely. By concentrating 999 Standards on, say, two main lines, then more rapid dieselisation and electrification could have gone ahead sooner elsewhere.... followed by full withdrawal of all Standards by 1985 (at around their 'normal life-expectancy')
2) Antnee 
IP logged Unknown
Sunday, 11 December 2011 11:51 IP: 86.148.84.120 Write a comment

Thanks you very much for providing this as locoshed book when AWOL many many years ago.
Regards Antnee
1) george52D 
IP logged Unknown
Monday, 9 April 2012 19:03 IP: 217.44.189.85 Write a comment

Excellent, keep up the good work
View RSS Feed
1 ... 18 19 [20]