Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 148 Today
» 963 Yesterday
» 148 Week
» 23286 Month
» 188186 Year
» 699288 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



Reliable $1 Web Hosting by HostBig

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Guestbook
BRDatabase Guestbook
Thanks for visiting my website. Please leave your comments...
Total Entries: 67   Entries Viewed Per Page: 10
1 [2] 3 4 ... 7
Name Comments
57) Paul 
Location:
Bolton Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 10.0; Win64; x64) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/57.0.2987.133 Safari/537.36
Sunday, 9 April 2017 08:03 IP: 2.31.58.231 Write a comment

What a fantastic website this is, I use it all thee time. You deserve some sort of official recognition for all the hard work and your dedication and service to the railway hobby. Another donation on the way.
56) GEOFF GRIFFITHS  Male
Location:
DONCASTER Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Macintosh; Intel Mac OS X 10_10_5) AppleWebKit/602.3.12 (KHTML, like Gecko) Version/10.0.2 Safari/602.3.12 View Web Page 
Monday, 20 March 2017 19:02 Host: 215.237.198.146.dyn.plus.net Write a comment

Absolutely fantastic website...i use it all the time to find information on locomotives. Well done. smile
55) Archie Bennett 
Location:
Ontario, Canada Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 10.0; Win64; x64) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/51.0.2704.79 Safari/537.36 Edge/14.14393
Friday, 27 January 2017 22:37 Host: bas1-oakville54-184-146-131-107.dsl.bell.ca Write a comment

Good range of information.
The 1947 directions to visit Perth South shed from the main station appear to refer to the old NBR shed close to the station, on the West side of the tracks, which was closed in 1950.
Perth South was a lot more than 5 minutes walk - more like 25 minutes. The map shows the correct location, however.
54) Stuart Warr  Male
Location:
Porthcawl Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 6.3; WOW64) AppleWebKit/537.36 (KHTML, like Gecko) Chrome/55.0.2883.87 Safari/537.36
Tuesday, 24 January 2017 20:54 Host: host-2-100-56-205.as13285.net Write a comment

Just found your website by chance, have had a quick look and I am amazed at how much information you have. I will return and look in greater depth when I have some spare time.
53) alan carter 
Location:
Eccles Manchester Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Windows NT 6.1; WOW64; rv:50.0) Gecko/20100101 Firefox/50.0
Wednesday, 18 January 2017 15:25 Host: 50-195-136-133-static.hfc.comcastbusiness.net Write a comment

Fantastic web -site thanks to all who keep this running Appreciated..Alan
52) David Finch  Male
Location:
Montreal, Quebec, Canada Location
IP logged Mozilla/5.0 (Macintosh; Intel Mac OS X 10.9; rv:50.0) Gecko/20100101 Firefox/50.0 View Web Page 
Friday, 23 December 2016 18:12 Host: modemcable155.86-22-96.mc.videotron.ca Write a comment

Hi Ian,
Fell on your site while researching a particular ex-LNER J50 for a friend. Very helpful and easy to navigate. A magnificent job you've done creating this! I will definitely donate to keep it going.


Cheers,

David
51) John Burns 
IP logged Unknown
Wednesday, 11 November 2015 22:55 IP: 86.176.175.4 Write a comment

Thank you for providing such an excellent reference source. It has been a great help to me in checking so called facts on other sites. Well done.
50) Mark/Alan Walker 
IP logged Unknown
Wednesday, 11 November 2015 20:54 IP: 81.159.179.209 Write a comment

Hi,

I'd just like to say thanks for this wonderful website,it has really helped to add interest to my photo captions.

Keep up the good work!!
49) Ollie Hand 
IP logged Unknown
Thursday, 10 November 2016 15:27 IP: 86.164.90.21 Write a comment

My grandfather, Ralph Shorrock, was an engine driver for L&YR and I have a photo of him on a Class 27, Horwich 0-6-0, Number 1146, Built 03/1892. He was age 40 at the 1911 Census where his occupation is listed. Date of the photo unknown
48) Neil MacDonald 
IP logged Unknown
Tuesday, 10 November 2015 20:14 IP: 92.234.123.48 Write a comment

I was a Guard at Newcastle.

One night between Christmas and New Year in 1977 I worked a relief train from Newcastle to Edinburgh and the Empty Coaching Stock (ECS) back to Newcastle. Haymarket men brought the loco. from Haymarket to Waverley for the ECS. This loco. was 40072 and it was to make its final revenue earning journey that evening.

As it was a very cold night I decided to ride in the rear cab to save the need for the boiler. Everything went OK until we were approaching East Linton when there was a big bang and power was lost. Power was eventually regained but when the regulator was opened the cab lights and the instrument lights got brighter and btighter until they fused out, Also, the heaters got hotter and hotter. I had never been on a loco. that was so hot before.

My driver stopped at Drem and declared the loco. a failure and requested a fresh engine from Dunbar. We managed to make it to Dunbar where 40072 shut down and couldn't be restarted. Eventually a set of Millerhill men arrived with a fresh engine for us. They used this engine to move 40072 to the sidings.

I learned later that an auxilary generator had burned out and that was why lights and the heaters were playing up. They were getting all their power from the main generator!

Evidently, 40072 was towed back to Edinburgh and was later cut up.
View RSS Feed
1 [2] 3 4 ... 7