Monthly Periods Entered
Date | Source | New | Wdth | Allc | Mods | Reb | Ren | DMUs | EMUs | RCar | Err | WR | SR | LMR | ER | NER | SCR |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/1949 | Railway Observer | 30/06/1949 | 25/06/1949 | 16/07/1949 | 31/07/1949 | 06/1949 | 16/07/1949 | ||||||||||
07/1950 | Railway Observer | 20/05/1950 | 17/06/1950 | 17/06/1950 | 30/06/1950 | 30/06/1950 | 17/06/1950 | ||||||||||
11/1950 | Trains Illustrated | 31/08/1950 | 09/09/1950 | 09/09/1950 | 23/09/1950 | 23/09/1950 | 23/09/1950 | ||||||||||
12/1950 | Trains Illustrated | 30/09/1950 | 07/10/1950 | 07/10/1950 | 21/10/1950 | 21/10/1950 | 21/10/1950 | ||||||||||
01/1951 | Trains Illustrated | 31/10/1950 | 13/11/1950 | 04/11/1950 | 25/11/1950 | 25/11/1950 | 25/11/1950 | ||||||||||
02/1951 | Trains Illustrated | 30/11/1950 | 08/12/1950 | 02/12/1950 | 23/12/1950 | 23/12/1950 | 23/12/1950 | ||||||||||
03/1951 | Trains Illustrated | 31/12/1950 | 31/12/1950 | 20/01/1951 | 20/01/1951 | 20/01/1951 | |||||||||||
04/1951 | Trains Illustrated | 31/01/1951 | 05/02/1951 | 27/01/1951 | 17/02/1951 | 17/02/1951 | 17/02/1951 | ||||||||||
05/1951 | Trains Illustrated | 28/02/1951 | 20/03/1951 | 24/02/1951 | 24/03/1951 | 24/03/1951 | 24/03/1951 | ||||||||||
06/1951 | Trains Illustrated | 31/03/1951 | 11/04/1951 | 24/03/1951 | 21/04/1951 | 21/04/1951 | 21/04/1951 | ||||||||||
07/1951 | Trains Illustrated | 30/04/1951 | 12/05/1951 | 19/05/1951 | 19/05/1951 | 19/05/1951 | |||||||||||
08/1951 | Trains Illustrated | 19/05/1951 | 27/06/1951 | 16/06/1951 | 23/06/1951 | 23/06/1951 | 19/05/1951 | ||||||||||
09/1951 | Trains Illustrated | 30/06/1951 | 27/07/1951 | 17/07/1951 | 21/07/1951 | 21/07/1951 | 16/06/1951 | ||||||||||
10/1951 | Trains Illustrated | 31/07/1951 | 11/08/1951 | 18/08/1951 | 18/08/1951 | 14/07/1951 | |||||||||||
11/1951 | Trains Illustrated | 31/08/1951 | 05/09/1951 | 08/09/1951 | 22/09/1951 | 22/09/1951 | 08/09/1951 | ||||||||||
12/1951 | Trains Illustrated | 30/09/1951 | 06/10/1951 | 06/10/1951 | 20/10/1951 | 20/10/1951 | 06/10/1951 | ||||||||||
03/1952 | Trains Illustrated | 31/12/1951 | 21/01/1952 | 29/12/1951 | 19/01/1952 | 19/01/1952 | 29/12/1951 | ||||||||||
04/1952 | Trains Illustrated | 31/01/1952 | 26/01/1952 | 16/02/1952 | 16/02/1952 | 26/01/1952 | |||||||||||
05/1952 | Trains Illustrated | 29/02/1952 | 19/03/1952 | 23/02/1952 | 22/03/1952 | 22/03/1952 | 23/02/1952 | ||||||||||
06/1952 | Trains Illustrated | 31/03/1952 | 22/03/1952 | 19/04/1952 | 19/04/1952 | 19/04/1952 | |||||||||||
07/1952 | Trains Illustrated | 30/04/1952 | 19/04/1952 | 17/05/1952 | 17/05/1952 | 17/05/1952 | |||||||||||
08/1952 | Trains Illustrated | 17/05/1952 | 30/06/1952 | 14/06/1952 | 21/06/1952 | 21/06/1952 | 14/06/1952 | ||||||||||
09/1952 | Trains Illustrated | 30/06/1952 | 12/07/1952 | 19/07/1952 | 19/07/1952 | 12/07/1952 | |||||||||||
10/1952 | Trains Illustrated | 12/07/1952 | 13/08/1952 | 09/08/1952 | 23/08/1952 | 23/08/1952 | 09/08/1952 | ||||||||||
11/1952 | Trains Illustrated | 31/08/1952 | 06/09/1952 | 20/09/1952 | 20/09/1952 | 06/09/1952 | |||||||||||
12/1952 | Trains Illustrated | 06/09/1952 | 07/10/1952 | 18/10/1952 | 18/10/1952 | 04/10/1952 | |||||||||||
01/1953 | Trains Illustrated | 04/10/1952 | 04/10/1952 | 15/11/1952 | 15/11/1952 | 01/11/1952 | |||||||||||
02/1953 | Trains Illustrated | 01/11/1952 | 11/12/1952 | 29/11/1952 | 13/12/1952 | 13/12/1952 | 29/11/1952 | ||||||||||
03/1953 | Trains Illustrated | 29/11/1952 | 08/01/1953 | 03/01/1953 | 17/01/1953 | 17/01/1953 | 27/12/1952 | ||||||||||
04/1953 | Trains Illustrated | 27/12/1952 | 24/01/1953 | 14/02/1953 | 14/02/1953 | 24/01/1953 | |||||||||||
05/1953 | Trains Illustrated | 24/01/1953 | 14/02/1953 | 21/02/1953 | 21/03/1953 | 21/03/1953 | 21/03/1953 | ||||||||||
06/1953 | Trains Illustrated | 21/02/1953 | 27/03/1953 | 21/03/1953 | 18/04/1953 | 18/04/1953 | |||||||||||
07/1953 | Trains Illustrated | 21/03/1953 | 18/04/1953 | 16/05/1953 | 16/05/1953 | 18/04/1953 | |||||||||||
08/1953 | Trains Illustrated | 18/04/1953 | 26/05/1953 | 16/05/1953 | 20/06/1953 | 20/06/1953 | 16/05/1953 | ||||||||||
09/1953 | Trains Illustrated | 16/05/1953 | 20/07/1953 | 11/07/1953 | 25/07/1953 | 25/07/1953 | 13/06/1953 | ||||||||||
10/1953 | Trains Illustrated | 11/07/1953 | 24/08/1953 | 08/08/1953 | 22/08/1953 | 22/08/1953 | 11/07/1953 | ||||||||||
11/1953 | Trains Illustrated | 08/08/1953 | 05/09/1953 | 19/09/1953 | 19/09/1953 | 05/09/1953 | |||||||||||
12/1953 | Trains Illustrated | 05/09/1953 | 01/10/1953 | 03/10/1953 | 24/10/1953 | 24/10/1953 | 03/10/1953 | ||||||||||
01/1954 | Trains Illustrated | 03/10/1953 | 31/10/1953 | 21/11/1953 | 21/11/1953 | 31/10/1953 | |||||||||||
02/1954 | Trains Illustrated | 31/10/1953 | 10/12/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 19/12/1953 | 19/12/1953 | 28/11/1953 | ||||||||||
03/1954 | Trains Illustrated | 25/11/1953 | 30/12/1953 | 02/01/1954 | 23/01/1954 | 23/01/1954 | 26/12/1953 | ||||||||||
04/1954 | Trains Illustrated | 26/12/1953 | 08/02/1954 | 30/01/1954 | 20/02/1954 | 20/02/1954 | 23/01/1954 | ||||||||||
05/1954 | Trains Illustrated | 30/01/1954 | 19/03/1954 | 27/02/1954 | 20/03/1954 | 20/03/1954 | 20/02/1954 | ||||||||||
06/1954 | Trains Illustrated | 27/02/1954 | 27/03/1954 | 24/04/1954 | 24/04/1954 | 17/04/1954 | |||||||||||
07/1954 | Trains Illustrated | 27/03/1954 | 13/05/1954 | 24/04/1954 | 22/05/1954 | 22/05/1954 | 15/05/1954 | ||||||||||
08/1954 | Trains Illustrated | 24/04/1954 | 18/06/1954 | 19/06/1954 | 19/06/1954 | 19/06/1954 | 12/06/1954 | ||||||||||
09/1954 | Trains Illustrated | 22/05/1954 | 17/07/1954 | 24/07/1954 | 24/07/1954 | ||||||||||||
10/1954 | Trains Illustrated | 19/06/1954 | 20/08/1954 | 14/08/1954 | 21/08/1954 | 21/08/1954 | 07/08/1954 | ||||||||||
11/1954 | Trains Illustrated | 17/07/1954 | 11/09/1954 | 25/09/1954 | 18/09/1954 | 04/09/1954 | |||||||||||
12/1954 | Trains Illustrated | 14/08/1954 | 09/10/1954 | 31/10/1954 | 31/10/1954 | 02/10/1954 | |||||||||||
01/1955 | Trains Illustrated | 09/10/1954 | 06/11/1954 | 06/11/1954 | 13/11/1954 | 13/11/1954 | 30/10/1954 | ||||||||||
02/1955 | Trains Illustrated | 06/11/1954 | 11/12/1954 | 04/12/1954 | 25/12/1954 | 18/12/1954 | 27/11/1954 | ||||||||||
03/1955 | Trains Illustrated | 04/12/1954 | 01/01/1955 | 22/01/1955 | 22/01/1955 | 25/12/1954 | |||||||||||
04/1955 | Trains Illustrated | 01/01/1955 | 08/02/1955 | 29/01/1955 | 19/02/1955 | 19/02/1955 | 22/01/1955 | ||||||||||
05/1955 | Trains Illustrated | 29/01/1955 | 11/03/1955 | 26/02/1955 | 19/03/1955 | 19/03/1955 | 19/02/1955 | ||||||||||
06/1955 | Trains Illustrated | 26/03/1955 | 20/04/1955 | 26/03/1955 | 23/04/1955 | 23/04/1955 | 16/04/1955 | ||||||||||
07/1955 | Trains Illustrated | 23/04/1955 | 09/05/1955 | 23/04/1955 | 14/05/1955 | 14/05/1955 | 14/05/1955 | ||||||||||
08/1955 | Trains Illustrated | 21/05/1955 | 21/06/1955 | 21/05/1955 | 18/06/1955 | 18/06/1955 | |||||||||||
09/1955 | Trains Illustrated | 18/06/1955 | 07/07/1955 | 16/07/1955 | 23/07/1955 | 23/07/1955 | 09/07/1955 | ||||||||||
10/1955 | Trains Illustrated | 16/07/1955 | 12/08/1955 | 13/08/1955 | 20/08/1955 | 20/08/1955 | 06/08/1955 | ||||||||||
11/1955 | Trains Illustrated | 13/08/1955 | 16/09/1955 | 10/09/1955 | 17/09/1955 | 17/09/1955 | 02/09/1955 | ||||||||||
12/1955 | Trains Illustrated | 10/09/1955 | 10/10/1955 | 08/10/1955 | 22/10/1955 | 22/10/1955 | 01/10/1955 | ||||||||||
01/1956 | Trains Illustrated | 08/10/1955 | 01/11/1955 | 05/11/1955 | 12/11/1955 | 12/11/1955 | 29/10/1955 | ||||||||||
02/1956 | Trains Illustrated | 05/11/1955 | 19/12/1955 | 03/12/1955 | 17/12/1955 | 17/12/1955 | 26/11/1955 | ||||||||||
03/1956 | Trains Illustrated | 03/12/1955 | 27/01/1956 | 31/12/1955 | 21/01/1956 | 21/01/1956 | 24/12/1955 | ||||||||||
04/1956 | Trains Illustrated | 31/12/1955 | 18/02/1956 | 28/01/1956 | 18/02/1956 | 18/02/1956 | 21/01/1956 | ||||||||||
05/1956 | Trains Illustrated | 28/01/1956 | 02/03/1956 | 25/02/1956 | 24/03/1956 | 24/03/1956 | 18/02/1956 | ||||||||||
06/1956 | Trains Illustrated | 25/02/1956 | 20/04/1956 | 24/03/1956 | 21/04/1956 | 21/04/1956 | 17/03/1956 | ||||||||||
07/1956 | Trains Illustrated | 24/03/1956 | 05/05/1956 | 21/04/1956 | 26/05/1956 | 26/05/1956 | 12/05/1956 | ||||||||||
08/1956 | Trains Illustrated | 21/04/1956 | 15/06/1956 | 19/05/1956 | 16/06/1956 | 16/06/1956 | |||||||||||
09/1956 | Trains Illustrated | 16/06/1956 | 11/06/1956 | 16/06/1956 | 21/07/1956 | 21/07/1956 | 09/06/1956 | ||||||||||
10/1956 | Trains Illustrated | 14/07/1956 | 27/08/1956 | 11/08/1956 | 25/08/1956 | 25/08/1956 | 04/08/1956 | ||||||||||
11/1956 | Trains Illustrated | 11/08/1956 | 08/09/1956 | 22/09/1956 | 22/09/1956 | 01/09/1956 | |||||||||||
12/1956 | Trains Illustrated | 08/09/1956 | 27/10/1956 | 06/10/1956 | 20/10/1956 | 20/10/1956 | |||||||||||
01/1957 | Trains Illustrated | 06/10/1956 | 17/11/1956 | 03/11/1956 | 17/11/1956 | 17/11/1956 | 27/10/1956 | ||||||||||
02/1957 | Trains Illustrated | 03/11/1956 | 17/12/1956 | 01/12/1956 | 15/12/1956 | 15/12/1956 | |||||||||||
03/1957 | Trains Illustrated | 01/12/1956 | 25/01/1957 | 29/12/1956 | 19/01/1957 | 19/01/1957 | 22/12/1956 | ||||||||||
04/1957 | Trains Illustrated | 29/12/1956 | 26/01/1957 | 16/02/1957 | 16/02/1957 | 19/01/1957 | |||||||||||
05/1957 | Trains Illustrated | 26/01/1957 | 16/02/1957 | 23/02/1957 | 16/03/1957 | 16/03/1957 | 16/02/1957 | ||||||||||
06/1957 | Trains Illustrated | 23/02/1957 | 01/04/1957 | 23/03/1957 | 20/04/1957 | 20/04/1957 | 16/03/1957 | ||||||||||
07/1957 | Trains Illustrated | 20/04/1957 | 20/04/1957 | 18/05/1957 | 18/05/1957 | 13/04/1957 | |||||||||||
08/1957 | Trains Illustrated | 18/05/1957 | 12/06/1957 | 18/05/1957 | 15/06/1957 | 15/06/1957 | 11/05/1957 | ||||||||||
09/1957 | Trains Illustrated | 15/06/1957 | 19/07/1957 | 16/06/1957 | 20/07/1957 | 20/07/1957 | 08/06/1957 | ||||||||||
10/1957 | Trains Illustrated | 13/07/1957 | 15/08/1957 | 10/08/1957 | 24/08/1957 | 24/08/1957 | 06/07/1957 | ||||||||||
11/1957 | Trains Illustrated | 10/08/1957 | 07/09/1957 | 21/09/1957 | 21/09/1957 | 31/08/1957 | |||||||||||
12/1957 | Trains Illustrated | 07/09/1957 | 08/10/1957 | 05/10/1957 | 19/10/1957 | 19/10/1957 | 28/09/1957 | ||||||||||
01/1958 | Trains Illustrated | 05/10/1957 | 08/10/1957 | 05/10/1957 | 09/11/1957 | 09/11/1957 | 26/10/1957 | ||||||||||
02/1958 | Trains Illustrated | 02/11/1957 | 31/10/1957 | 30/11/1957 | 14/12/1957 | 14/12/1957 | 23/11/1957 | ||||||||||
03/1958 | Trains Illustrated | 30/11/1957 | 14/01/1958 | 28/12/1957 | 08/01/1958 | 08/01/1958 | 31/12/1957 | ||||||||||
04/1958 | Trains Illustrated | 25/01/1958 | 14/01/1958 | 25/01/1958 | 08/02/1958 | 08/02/1958 | 18/01/1958 | ||||||||||
05/1958 | Trains Illustrated | 22/02/1958 | 24/02/1958 | 22/02/1958 | 03/08/1958 | 03/08/1958 | |||||||||||
06/1958 | Trains Illustrated | 22/03/1958 | 22/03/1958 | 12/04/1958 | 12/04/1958 | 15/02/1958 | |||||||||||
07/1958 | Trains Illustrated | 19/04/1958 | 19/04/1958 | 10/05/1958 | 10/05/1958 | 12/04/1958 | |||||||||||
08/1958 | Trains Illustrated | 17/05/1958 | 06/06/1958 | 17/05/1958 | 14/06/1958 | 14/06/1958 | |||||||||||
09/1958 | Trains Illustrated | 14/06/1958 | 23/06/1958 | 14/06/1958 | 19/07/1958 | 19/07/1958 | 10/05/1958 | ||||||||||
10/1958 | Trains Illustrated | 12/07/1958 | 31/07/1958 | 12/07/1958 | 16/08/1958 | 16/08/1958 | 05/07/1958 | ||||||||||
11/1958 | Trains Illustrated | 09/08/1958 | 26/08/1958 | 09/08/1958 | 13/09/1958 | 13/09/1958 | 02/08/1958 | ||||||||||
12/1958 | Trains Illustrated | 06/09/1958 | 23/09/1958 | 06/09/1958 | 11/10/1958 | 11/10/1958 | 27/09/1958 | ||||||||||
01/1959 | Trains Illustrated | 04/10/1958 | 13/10/1958 | 04/10/1958 | 15/11/1958 | 15/11/1958 | 25/10/1958 | ||||||||||
02/1959 | Trains Illustrated | 01/11/1958 | 29/11/1958 | 13/12/1958 | 13/12/1958 | 22/11/1958 | |||||||||||
03/1959 | Trains Illustrated | 29/11/1958 | 27/12/1958 | 17/01/1959 | 17/01/1959 | 17/01/1959 | |||||||||||
04/1959 | Trains Illustrated | 27/12/1958 | 24/01/1959 | 14/02/1959 | 21/02/1959 | 14/02/1959 | |||||||||||
05/1959 | Trains Illustrated | 24/01/1959 | 11/03/1959 | 21/02/1959 | 14/03/1959 | 14/03/1959 | 14/03/1959 | ||||||||||
06/1959 | Trains Illustrated | 21/03/1959 | 13/04/1959 | 21/03/1959 | 18/04/1959 | 18/04/1959 | 11/04/1959 | ||||||||||
07/1959 | The Locomotive | 18/04/1959 | 01/05/1959 | 18/04/1959 | 23/05/1959 | 23/05/1959 | 09/05/1959 | ||||||||||
08/1959 | Trains Illustrated | 16/05/1959 | 14/06/1959 | 16/05/1959 | 20/06/1959 | 20/06/1959 | 06/06/1959 | ||||||||||
09/1959 | Trains Illustrated | 13/06/1959 | 18/07/1959 | 13/06/1959 | 18/07/1959 | 18/07/1959 | 04/07/1959 | ||||||||||
10/1959 | Trains Illustrated | 11/07/1959 | 19/08/1959 | 08/08/1959 | 22/08/1959 | 22/08/1959 | 01/08/1959 | ||||||||||
11/1959 | Trains Illustrated | 08/08/1959 | 08/09/1959 | 05/09/1959 | 19/09/1959 | 19/09/1959 | 29/08/1959 | ||||||||||
12/1959 | Trains Illustrated | 05/09/1959 | 22/10/1959 | 03/10/1959 | 17/10/1959 | 10/10/1959 | 26/09/1959 | ||||||||||
01/1960 | Trains Illustrated | 31/10/1959 | 07/11/1959 | 07/11/1959 | 24/10/1959 | ||||||||||||
02/1960 | Trains Illustrated | 03/10/1959 | 26/11/1959 | 05/12/1959 | 05/12/1959 | 05/12/1959 | 21/11/1959 | ||||||||||
03/1960 | Trains Illustrated | 26/12/1959 | 31/12/1959 | 02/01/1960 | 16/01/1960 | 16/01/1960 | 19/12/1959 | ||||||||||
04/1960 | Trains Illustrated | 09/02/1960 | 30/01/1960 | 13/02/1960 | 13/02/1960 | 16/01/1960 | |||||||||||
05/1960 | Trains Illustrated | 27/02/1960 | 10/03/1960 | 27/02/1960 | 19/03/1960 | 12/03/1960 | 13/02/1960 | ||||||||||
06/1960 | Trains Illustrated | 26/03/1960 | 05/04/1960 | 26/03/1960 | 09/04/1960 | 02/04/1960 | 12/03/1960 | ||||||||||
07/1960 | Trains Illustrated | 23/04/1960 | 06/05/1960 | 23/04/1960 | 14/05/1960 | 14/05/1960 | 09/04/1960 | ||||||||||
08/1960 | Trains Illustrated | 21/05/1960 | 21/05/1960 | 11/06/1960 | 18/06/1960 | 07/05/1960 | |||||||||||
09/1960 | Trains Illustrated | 18/06/1960 | 08/07/1960 | 18/06/1960 | 16/07/1960 | 16/07/1960 | 04/06/1960 | ||||||||||
10/1960 | Trains Illustrated | 16/07/1960 | 16/07/1960 | 20/08/1960 | 20/08/1960 | 30/07/1960 | |||||||||||
11/1960 | Trains Illustrated | 13/08/1960 | 23/08/1960 | 13/08/1960 | 17/09/1960 | 17/09/1960 | 28/08/1960 | ||||||||||
12/1960 | Trains Illustrated | 10/09/1960 | 05/10/1960 | 08/10/1960 | 15/10/1960 | 15/10/1960 | |||||||||||
01/1961 | Trains Illustrated | 08/10/1960 | 24/11/1960 | 05/11/1960 | 12/11/1960 | 12/11/1960 | |||||||||||
02/1961 | Trains Illustrated | 05/11/1960 | 03/12/1960 | 10/12/1960 | 17/12/1960 | 19/11/1960 | |||||||||||
03/1961 | Trains Illustrated | 31/12/1960 | 17/01/1961 | 31/12/1960 | 14/01/1961 | 14/01/1961 | 17/12/1960 | ||||||||||
04/1961 | Trains Illustrated | 28/01/1961 | 10/02/1961 | 28/01/1961 | 11/02/1961 | 11/02/1961 | 14/01/1961 | ||||||||||
05/1961 | Trains Illustrated | 25/02/1961 | 18/03/1961 | 25/02/1961 | 11/03/1961 | 11/03/1961 | 11/02/1961 | ||||||||||
06/1961 | Trains Illustrated | 25/03/1961 | 25/03/1961 | 15/04/1961 | 15/04/1961 | 11/03/1961 | |||||||||||
07/1961 | Trains Illustrated | 22/04/1961 | 03/05/1961 | 22/04/1961 | 13/05/1961 | 13/05/1961 | 08/04/1961 | ||||||||||
08/1961 | Trains Illustrated | 20/05/1961 | 26/05/1961 | 20/05/1961 | 17/06/1961 | 17/06/1961 | 06/05/1961 | ||||||||||
09/1961 | Trains Illustrated | 17/06/1961 | 03/06/1961 | 17/06/1961 | 22/07/1961 | 22/07/1961 | 03/06/1961 | ||||||||||
10/1961 | Trains Illustrated | 15/07/1961 | 23/08/1961 | 15/07/1961 | 19/08/1961 | 12/08/1961 | 29/07/1961 | ||||||||||
11/1961 | Trains Illustrated | 12/08/1961 | 23/08/1961 | 09/09/1961 | 09/09/1961 | 09/09/1961 | 26/08/1961 | ||||||||||
12/1961 | Trains Illustrated | 09/09/1961 | 10/10/1961 | 07/10/1961 | 14/10/1961 | 14/10/1961 | 23/09/1961 | ||||||||||
01/1962 | Modern Railways | 07/10/1961 | 09/11/1961 | 04/11/1961 | 18/11/1961 | 18/11/1961 | 21/10/1961 | ||||||||||
02/1962 | Modern Railways | 04/11/1961 | 08/12/1961 | 02/12/1961 | 16/12/1961 | 16/12/1961 | 18/11/1961 | ||||||||||
03/1962 | Modern Railways | 31/12/1961 | 04/01/1962 | 30/12/1961 | 20/01/1962 | 20/01/1962 | 30/12/1961 | ||||||||||
04/1962 | Modern Railways | 27/01/1962 | 01/02/1962 | 27/01/1962 | 17/02/1962 | 17/02/1962 | 27/01/1962 | ||||||||||
05/1962 | Modern Railways | 24/02/1962 | 05/03/1962 | 24/02/1962 | 17/03/1962 | 17/03/1962 | 24/02/1962 | ||||||||||
06/1962 | Modern Railways | 24/03/1962 | 02/04/1962 | 24/03/1962 | 14/04/1962 | 14/04/1962 | 24/03/1962 | ||||||||||
07/1962 | Modern Railways | 21/04/1962 | 01/05/1962 | 21/04/1962 | 12/05/1962 | 12/05/1962 | 21/04/1962 | ||||||||||
08/1962 | Modern Railways | 19/05/1962 | 28/05/1962 | 19/05/1962 | 09/06/1962 | 16/06/1962 | 19/05/1962 | ||||||||||
09/1962 | Modern Railways | 16/06/1962 | 02/07/1962 | 16/06/1962 | 14/07/1962 | 14/07/1962 | 16/06/1962 | ||||||||||
10/1962 | Modern Railways | 14/07/1962 | 30/07/1962 | 14/07/1962 | 11/08/1962 | 11/08/1962 | 14/07/1962 | ||||||||||
11/1962 | Modern Railways | 11/08/1962 | 24/09/1962 | 08/09/1962 | 08/09/1962 | 08/09/1962 | 08/09/1962 | ||||||||||
12/1962 | Modern Railways | 08/09/1962 | 22/10/1962 | 06/10/1962 | 06/10/1962 | 06/10/1962 | 29/09/1962 | ||||||||||
01/1963 | Modern Railways | 19/11/1962 | 03/11/1962 | 17/11/1962 | 17/11/1962 | 27/10/1962 | |||||||||||
02/1963 | Modern Railways | 06/10/1962 | 17/12/1962 | 01/12/1962 | 15/12/1962 | 15/12/1962 | 24/11/1962 | ||||||||||
03/1963 | Modern Railways | 07/01/1963 | 29/12/1962 | 12/01/1963 | 12/01/1963 | 22/12/1962 | |||||||||||
04/1963 | Modern Railways | 09/02/1963 | 30/01/1963 | 26/01/1963 | 16/02/1963 | 09/02/1963 | 19/01/1963 | ||||||||||
05/1963 | Modern Railways | 09/03/1963 | 04/03/1963 | 23/02/1963 | 16/03/1963 | 16/03/1963 | 16/02/1963 | ||||||||||
06/1963 | Modern Railways | 06/04/1963 | 01/04/1963 | 23/03/1963 | 06/04/1963 | 13/04/1963 | 13/04/1963 | ||||||||||
07/1963 | Modern Railways | 04/05/1963 | 29/04/1963 | 18/05/1963 | 18/05/1963 | 18/05/1963 | 11/05/1963 | ||||||||||
08/1963 | Modern Railways | 01/06/1963 | 24/06/1963 | 15/06/1963 | 15/06/1963 | 08/06/1963 | |||||||||||
09/1963 | Modern Railways | 29/09/1963 | 22/07/1963 | 13/07/1963 | 13/07/1963 | 13/07/1963 | 06/07/1963 | ||||||||||
10/1963 | Modern Railways | 27/07/1963 | 19/08/1963 | 10/08/1963 | 24/08/1963 | 10/08/1963 | 03/08/1963 | ||||||||||
11/1963 | Modern Railways | 31/08/1963 | 16/09/1963 | 07/09/1963 | 21/09/1963 | 14/09/1963 | 07/09/1963 | ||||||||||
12/1963 | Modern Railways | 28/09/1963 | 14/10/1963 | 05/10/1963 | 05/10/1963 | 12/10/1963 | 05/10/1963 | ||||||||||
01/1964 | Modern Railways | 02/11/1963 | 11/11/1963 | 02/11/1963 | 02/11/1963 | 16/11/1963 | 02/11/1963 | ||||||||||
02/1964 | Modern Railways | 30/11/1963 | 09/12/1963 | 30/11/1963 | 07/12/1963 | 07/12/1963 | 30/11/1963 | ||||||||||
03/1964 | Modern Railways | 28/12/1963 | 06/01/1964 | 28/12/1963 | 19/01/1964 | 28/12/1963 | |||||||||||
04/1964 | Modern Railways | 25/01/1964 | 27/01/1964 | 25/01/1964 | 08/02/1964 | 15/02/1964 | 25/01/1964 | ||||||||||
05/1964 | Modern Railways | 22/02/1964 | 02/03/1964 | 22/02/1964 | 22/02/1964 | 14/03/1964 | 29/02/1964 | ||||||||||
06/1964 | Modern Railways | 13/04/1964 | 31/03/1964 | 21/03/1964 | 11/04/1964 | 11/04/1964 | 28/03/1964 | ||||||||||
07/1964 | Modern Railways | 04/05/1964 | 25/05/1964 | 16/05/1964 | 09/05/1964 | 23/05/1964 | 25/04/1964 | ||||||||||
08/1964 | Modern Railways | 22/06/1964 | 13/06/1964 | 27/06/1964 | 30/05/1964 | ||||||||||||
09/1964 | Modern Railways | 20/07/1964 | 20/07/1964 | 11/07/1964 | 04/07/1964 | 25/07/1964 | 27/06/1964 | ||||||||||
10/1964 | Modern Railways | 17/08/1964 | 15/08/1964 | 22/08/1964 | 25/07/1964 | ||||||||||||
11/1964 | Modern Railways | 24/08/1964 | 14/09/1964 | 05/09/1964 | 12/09/1964 | 19/09/1964 | 22/08/1964 | ||||||||||
12/1964 | Modern Railways | 12/10/1964 | 12/10/1964 | 03/10/1964 | 17/10/1964 | 17/10/1964 | 26/09/1964 | ||||||||||
01/1965 | Modern Railways | 22/11/1964 | 20/11/1964 | 31/10/1964 | 31/10/1964 | 21/11/1964 | 31/10/1964 | ||||||||||
02/1965 | Modern Railways | 29/11/1964 | 21/12/1964 | 28/11/1964 | 28/11/1964 | 19/12/1964 | 28/11/1964 | ||||||||||
03/1965 | Modern Railways | 23/01/1965 | 18/01/1965 | 26/12/1964 | 09/01/1965 | 02/01/1965 | 26/12/1964 | ||||||||||
04/1965 | Modern Railways | 21/02/1965 | 15/02/1965 | 30/01/1965 | 06/02/1965 | 30/01/1965 | 30/01/1965 | ||||||||||
05/1965 | Modern Railways | 28/03/1965 | 15/03/1965 | 27/02/1965 | 20/03/1965 | 27/02/1965 | 27/02/1965 | ||||||||||
06/1965 | Modern Railways | 11/04/1965 | 12/04/1965 | 27/03/1965 | 17/04/1965 | 24/04/1965 | 24/04/1965 | ||||||||||
07/1965 | Modern Railways | 16/05/1965 | 10/05/1965 | 24/04/1965 | 01/05/1965 | 22/05/1965 | |||||||||||
08/1965 | Modern Railways | 13/06/1965 | 08/06/1965 | 19/06/1965 | 12/06/1965 | 19/06/1965 | 29/05/1965 | ||||||||||
09/1965 | Modern Railways | 11/07/1965 | 05/07/1965 | 17/07/1965 | 26/06/1965 | 17/07/1965 | 26/06/1965 | ||||||||||
10/1965 | Modern Railways | 08/08/1965 | 02/08/1965 | 07/08/1965 | 14/08/1965 | 31/07/1965 | |||||||||||
11/1965 | Modern Railways | 19/09/1965 | 27/09/1965 | 11/09/1965 | 18/09/1965 | 11/09/1965 | 25/09/1965 | ||||||||||
12/1965 | Modern Railways | 25/10/1965 | 09/10/1965 | 02/10/1965 | 09/10/1965 | ||||||||||||
01/1966 | Modern Railways | 07/11/1965 | 22/11/1965 | 06/11/1965 | 13/11/1965 | 30/10/1965 | |||||||||||
02/1966 | Modern Railways | 20/12/1965 | 04/12/1965 | 11/12/1965 | 04/12/1965 | 27/11/1965 | |||||||||||
03/1966 | Modern Railways | 15/01/1966 | 10/01/1966 | 03/01/1966 | 01/01/1966 | 01/01/1966 | 25/12/1965 | ||||||||||
04/1966 | Modern Railways | 20/02/1966 | 07/02/1966 | 29/01/1966 | 02/02/1966 | 29/01/1966 | |||||||||||
05/1966 | Modern Railways | 07/03/1966 | 26/02/1966 | 12/03/1966 | 26/02/1966 | 29/01/1966 | |||||||||||
06/1966 | Modern Railways | 27/03/1966 | 26/03/1966 | 09/04/1966 | 26/03/1966 | 26/03/1966 | |||||||||||
07/1966 | Modern Railways | 01/05/1966 | 02/05/1966 | 23/04/1966 | 23/04/1966 | 23/04/1966 | |||||||||||
08/1966 | Modern Railways | 19/06/1966 | 21/05/1966 | 18/06/1966 | 18/06/1966 | 30/04/1966 | |||||||||||
09/1966 | Modern Railways | 27/06/1966 | 16/07/1966 | 16/07/1966 | 26/06/1966 | ||||||||||||
10/1966 | Modern Railways | 22/08/1966 | 13/08/1966 | 13/08/1966 | 13/08/1966 | 23/07/1966 | |||||||||||
11/1966 | Modern Railways | 28/08/1966 | 19/09/1966 | 10/09/1966 | 24/09/1966 | 10/09/1966 | 20/08/1966 | ||||||||||
12/1966 | Modern Railways | 08/10/1966 | 08/10/1966 | 24/09/1966 | |||||||||||||
01/1967 | Modern Railways | 30/10/1966 | 14/11/1966 | 05/11/1966 | 19/11/1966 | 05/11/1966 | |||||||||||
02/1967 | Modern Railways | 12/12/1966 | 03/12/1966 | 03/12/1966 | 03/12/1966 | 26/11/1966 | |||||||||||
03/1967 | Modern Railways | 15/01/1967 | 18/01/1967 | 31/12/1966 | 07/01/1967 | 31/12/1966 | 31/12/1966 | ||||||||||
04/1967 | Modern Railways | 20/02/1967 | 28/01/1967 | 18/02/1967 | 28/01/1967 | 28/01/1967 | |||||||||||
05/1967 | Modern Railways | 16/03/1967 | 25/02/1967 | 18/03/1967 | 25/02/1967 | 25/02/1967 | |||||||||||
06/1967 | Modern Railways | 17/04/1967 | 25/03/1967 | 15/04/1967 | 25/03/1967 | ||||||||||||
07/1967 | Modern Railways | 14/05/1967 | 15/05/1967 | 22/04/1967 | 13/05/1967 | 22/04/1967 | 29/04/1967 | ||||||||||
08/1967 | Modern Railways | 12/06/1967 | 20/05/1967 | 24/06/1967 | 20/05/1967 | 27/05/1967 | |||||||||||
09/1967 | Modern Railways | 22/07/1967 | 09/07/1967 | 15/07/1967 | 22/07/1967 | 24/06/1967 | |||||||||||
10/1967 | Modern Railways | 07/08/1967 | 05/08/1967 | 15/07/1967 | 29/07/1967 | ||||||||||||
11/1967 | Modern Railways | 09/09/1967 | 09/09/1967 | 12/08/1967 | 26/08/1967 | ||||||||||||
12/1967 | Modern Railways | 24/10/1967 | 07/10/1967 | 21/10/1967 | 09/09/1967 | 30/09/1967 | |||||||||||
01/1968 | Modern Railways | 17/11/1967 | 04/11/1967 | 04/10/1967 | |||||||||||||
02/1968 | Modern Railways | 04/12/1967 | 13/11/1967 | 02/12/1967 | 30/12/1967 | 25/11/1967 | |||||||||||
03/1968 | Railway World | 29/01/1968 | 30/12/1967 | 30/12/1967 | 02/12/1967 | 30/12/1967 | |||||||||||
04/1968 | Railway World | 05/02/1968 | 27/01/1968 | 17/02/1968 | 27/01/1968 | ||||||||||||
05/1968 | Railway World | 18/03/1968 | 18/03/1968 | 24/02/1968 | 16/03/1968 | 30/12/1967 | 24/02/1968 | ||||||||||
06/1968 | Railway World | 08/04/1968 | 23/03/1968 | 13/04/1968 | 30/03/1968 | 30/03/1968 | |||||||||||
07/1968 | Railway World | 20/04/1968 | 25/05/1968 | 27/04/1968 | 27/04/1968 | ||||||||||||
08/1968 | Modern Railways | 01/06/1968 | 14/06/1968 | 18/05/1968 | 22/06/1968 | 25/05/1968 | 01/06/1968 | ||||||||||
09/1968 | Modern Railways | 09/07/1968 | 13/07/1968 | 13/07/1968 | 29/06/1968 | ||||||||||||
10/1968 | Railway World | 27/07/1968 | 29/07/1968 | 10/08/1968 | 22/06/1968 | 27/07/1968 | |||||||||||
11/1968 | Railway World | 23/09/1968 | 07/09/1968 | 31/08/1968 | 31/08/1968 | ||||||||||||
12/1968 | Railway World | 11/10/1968 | 28/09/1968 | 28/09/1968 | |||||||||||||
01/1969 | Railway World | 09/11/1968 | 07/11/1968 | 02/11/1968 | 26/10/1968 | 26/10/1968 | |||||||||||
02/1969 | Railway World | 09/12/1968 | 30/11/1968 | 23/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | ||||||||||||
03/1969 | Railway World | 01/01/1969 | 28/12/1968 | 28/12/1968 | 28/12/1968 | ||||||||||||
04/1969 | Railway World | 25/01/1969 | 10/02/1969 | 25/01/1969 | 01/02/1969 | 25/01/1969 | |||||||||||
05/1969 | Railway World | ||||||||||||||||
06/1969 | Railway World | 28/04/1969 | 19/04/1969 | 15/03/1969 | 29/03/1969 | ||||||||||||
07/1969 | Railway World | 03/05/1969 | 07/05/1969 | 26/04/1969 | 26/04/1969 | ||||||||||||
08/1969 | Railway World | 18/06/1969 | 17/05/1969 | 31/05/1969 | 31/05/1969 | ||||||||||||
09/1969 | Railway World | 14/06/1969 | 14/06/1969 | 28/06/1969 | 28/06/1969 | ||||||||||||
10/1969 | Railway World | 06/08/1969 | 12/07/1969 | 26/07/1969 | |||||||||||||
11/1969 | Railway World | 16/08/1969 | 26/08/1969 | 06/09/1969 | 30/08/1969 | 30/08/1969 | |||||||||||
12/1969 | Railway World | 27/09/1969 | 04/10/1969 | 27/09/1969 | 27/09/1969 | ||||||||||||
01/1970 | Railway World | 01/11/1969 | 01/11/1969 | 25/10/1969 | 01/11/1969 | ||||||||||||
02/1970 | Railway World | 06/12/1969 | 29/11/1969 | 29/11/1969 | |||||||||||||
03/1970 | Railway World | 27/12/1969 | 31/12/1969 | 27/12/1969 | 27/12/1969 | 27/12/1969 | |||||||||||
04/1970 | Railway World | 24/01/1970 | 31/01/1970 | 07/02/1970 | 31/01/1970 | ||||||||||||
05/1970 | Railway World | 28/02/1970 | 28/02/1970 | 28/02/1970 | |||||||||||||
06/1970 | Railway World | 04/04/1970 | 17/04/1970 | 28/03/1970 | 04/04/1970 | 28/03/1970 | |||||||||||
07/1970 | Railway World | 30/04/1970 | 25/04/1970 | 02/05/1970 | 25/04/1970 | ||||||||||||
08/1970 | Railway World | 29/05/1970 | 23/05/1970 | 30/05/1970 | 30/05/1970 | ||||||||||||
09/1970 | Railway World | 20/06/1970 | 20/06/1970 | 27/06/1970 | |||||||||||||
10/1970 | Railway World | 18/07/1970 | 18/07/1970 | 01/08/1970 | |||||||||||||
11/1970 | Railway World | 12/09/1970 | 05/09/1970 | ||||||||||||||
12/1970 | Railway World | 15/09/1970 | 10/10/1970 | 10/10/1970 | 03/10/1970 | ||||||||||||
01/1971 | Railway World | 30/10/1970 | 07/11/1970 | 07/11/1970 | 31/10/1970 | ||||||||||||
02/1971 | Railway World | 14/11/1970 | 05/12/1970 | 28/11/1970 | |||||||||||||
03/1971 | Railway World | 02/01/1971 | 01/01/1971 | 02/01/1971 | 02/01/1971 | 02/01/1971 | |||||||||||
04/1971 | Railway World | ||||||||||||||||
05/1971 | Railway World | 25/01/1971 | 27/02/1971 | 27/02/1971 | 06/02/1971 | ||||||||||||
06/1971 | Railway World | 27/02/1971 | 01/03/1971 | 27/03/1971 | 27/03/1971 | 27/03/1971 | |||||||||||
07/1971 | Railway World | 21/04/1971 | 01/05/1971 | ||||||||||||||
08/1971 | Railway World | 22/05/1971 | 13/05/1971 | 22/05/1971 | 29/05/1971 | 29/05/1971 | |||||||||||
09/1971 | Railway World | 03/07/1971 | 26/06/1971 | 19/06/1971 | 03/07/1971 | ||||||||||||
10/1971 | Railway World | 17/07/1971 | 17/07/1971 | 17/08/1971 | |||||||||||||
11/1971 | Railway World | 11/09/1971 | 14/08/1971 | 21/08/1971 | |||||||||||||
12/1971 | Railway World | 16/10/1971 | 27/08/1971 | 09/10/1971 | 25/09/1971 | 02/10/1971 | |||||||||||
01/1972 | Railway World | 06/11/1971 | 29/10/1971 | 06/11/1971 | 30/10/1971 | 30/10/1971 | |||||||||||
02/1972 | Railway World | 04/12/1971 | 11/12/1971 | 27/11/1971 | |||||||||||||
03/1972 | Railway World | 08/01/1972 | 29/12/1971 | 01/01/1972 | 15/01/1972 | 01/01/1972 | |||||||||||
04/1972 | Railway World | 29/01/1972 | 12/02/1972 | 29/01/1972 | |||||||||||||
05/1972 | Railway World | 26/02/1972 | 11/03/1972 | 26/02/1972 | |||||||||||||
06/1972 | Railway World | 11/03/1972 | 25/03/1972 | 08/04/1972 | 01/04/1972 | ||||||||||||
07/1972 | Railway World | 13/05/1972 | 25/04/1972 | 29/04/1972 | 29/04/1972 | ||||||||||||
08/1972 | Railway World | 10/06/1972 | 25/05/1972 | 27/05/1972 | 27/05/1972 | 27/05/1972 | |||||||||||
09/1972 | Railway World | 24/06/1972 | 24/06/1972 | 01/07/1972 | |||||||||||||
10/1972 | Railway World | 22/07/1972 | 29/07/1972 | 05/08/1972 | |||||||||||||
11/1972 | Railway World | 12/08/1972 | 19/08/1972 | 26/08/1972 | |||||||||||||
12/1972 | Railway World | 09/09/1972 | 14/10/1972 | 30/09/1972 | 30/09/1972 | ||||||||||||
01/1973 | Railway World | 28/10/1972 | 16/11/1972 | 11/11/1972 | 28/10/1972 | 28/10/1972 | |||||||||||
02/1973 | Railway World | 09/12/1972 | 25/11/1972 | 25/11/1972 | |||||||||||||
03/1973 | Railway World | 30/12/1972 | 23/12/1972 | 30/12/1972 | 30/12/1972 | ||||||||||||
04/1973 | Railway World | 10/02/1973 | 05/02/1973 | 27/01/1973 | 27/01/1973 | 27/01/1973 | |||||||||||
05/1973 | Railway World | 24/02/1973 | 24/02/1973 | 24/02/1973 | |||||||||||||
06/1973 | Railway World | 31/03/1973 | 24/03/1973 | 31/03/1973 | 24/03/1973 | ||||||||||||
07/1973 | Railway World | 02/05/1973 | 21/04/1973 | 28/04/1973 | 21/04/1973 | ||||||||||||
08/1973 | Railway World | 09/06/1973 | 18/05/1973 | 19/05/1973 | 26/05/1973 | 16/06/1973 | |||||||||||
09/1973 | Railway World | 07/07/1973 | 19/07/1973 | 16/06/1973 | 23/06/1973 | 14/07/1973 | |||||||||||
10/1973 | Railway World | 11/08/1973 | 28/07/1973 | 11/08/1973 | |||||||||||||
11/1973 | Railway World | 08/09/1973 | 25/08/1973 | 08/09/1973 | |||||||||||||
12/1973 | Railway World | 26/09/1973 | 06/10/1973 | 06/10/1973 | |||||||||||||
01/1974 | Railway World | 03/11/1973 | 22/10/1973 | 03/11/1973 | |||||||||||||
02/1974 | Railway World | 24/11/1973 | 03/11/1973 | 24/11/1973 | 01/12/1973 | ||||||||||||
03/1974 | Railway World | 29/12/1973 | 29/12/1973 | 29/12/1973 | 29/12/1973 | 29/12/1973 | |||||||||||
04/1974 | Railway World | 19/01/1974 | 28/01/1974 | 26/01/1974 | 26/01/1974 | 26/01/1974 | |||||||||||
05/1974 | Railway World | 16/02/1974 | 07/03/1974 | 23/02/1974 | 23/02/1974 | 23/02/1974 | |||||||||||
06/1974 | Railway World | 16/03/1974 | 26/03/1974 | 16/03/1974 | 23/03/1974 | 23/03/1974 | |||||||||||
07/1974 | Railway World | 20/04/1974 | 23/03/1974 | 27/04/1974 | |||||||||||||
08/1974 | Railway World | 18/05/1974 | 03/05/1974 | 18/05/1974 | 01/06/1974 | 25/05/1974 | |||||||||||
09/1974 | Railway World | 06/07/1974 | 19/06/1974 | 15/06/1974 | 29/06/1974 | 29/06/1974 | |||||||||||
10/1974 | Railway World | 27/07/1974 | 13/07/1974 | 27/07/1974 | 27/07/1974 | ||||||||||||
11/1974 | Railway World | 07/09/1974 | 30/08/1974 | 10/08/1974 | 17/08/1974 | 31/08/1974 | |||||||||||
12/1974 | Railway World | 28/09/1974 | 05/10/1974 | 21/09/1974 | 28/09/1974 | ||||||||||||
01/1975 | Railway World | 26/10/1974 | 02/11/1974 | 26/10/1974 | 26/10/1974 | ||||||||||||
02/1975 | Railway World | 16/11/1974 | 16/11/1974 | 16/11/1974 | 16/11/1974 | ||||||||||||
03/1975 | Railway World | 28/12/1974 | 28/12/1974 | 28/12/1974 | 30/11/1974 | ||||||||||||
04/1975 | Railway World | 08/02/1975 | 27/01/1975 | 25/01/1975 | 01/02/1975 | 01/02/1975 | |||||||||||
05/1975 | Railway World | 08/03/1975 | 22/02/1975 | 01/03/1975 | 01/03/1975 | ||||||||||||
06/1975 | Railway World | 05/04/1975 | 22/03/1975 | 22/03/1975 | 29/03/1975 | ||||||||||||
07/1975 | Railway World | 10/05/1975 | 05/05/1975 | 10/05/1975 | 26/04/1975 | ||||||||||||
08/1975 | Railway World | 07/06/1975 | 17/05/1975 | 31/05/1975 | 24/05/1975 | ||||||||||||
09/1975 | Railway World | 21/06/1975 | 03/07/1975 | 12/07/1975 | 12/07/1975 | 21/06/1975 | |||||||||||
10/1975 | Railway World | 09/08/1975 | 09/08/1975 | 09/08/1975 | 26/07/1975 | ||||||||||||
11/1975 | Railway World | 06/09/1975 | 06/09/1975 | 06/09/1975 | 23/08/1975 | ||||||||||||
12/1975 | Railway World | 20/09/1975 | 27/09/1975 | 27/09/1975 | |||||||||||||
01/1976 | Railway World | 11/10/1975 | 04/10/1975 | 25/10/1975 | 25/10/1975 | ||||||||||||
02/1976 | Railway World | 08/11/1975 | 08/11/1975 | 23/11/1975 | 15/11/1975 | ||||||||||||
03/1976 | Railway World | 27/12/1975 | 27/11/1975 | 27/12/1975 | 04/01/1976 | 03/01/1976 | |||||||||||
04/1976 | Railway World | 10/01/1976 | 24/01/1976 | 01/02/1976 | 07/02/1976 | ||||||||||||
05/1976 | Railway World | 21/02/1976 | 21/02/1976 | 29/02/1976 | 06/03/1976 | ||||||||||||
06/1976 | Railway World | 05/04/1976 | 20/03/1976 | 28/03/1976 | 27/03/1976 | ||||||||||||
07/1976 | Railway World | 17/04/1976 | 02/05/1976 | 01/05/1976 | |||||||||||||
08/1976 | Railway World | 22/05/1976 | 16/06/1976 | 12/06/1976 | 06/06/1976 | 29/06/1976 | |||||||||||
09/1976 | Railway World | 19/06/1976 | 04/07/1976 | 03/07/1976 | |||||||||||||
10/1976 | Railway World | 24/07/1976 | 07/08/1976 | 08/08/1976 | 24/07/1976 | ||||||||||||
11/1976 | Railway World | 14/08/1976 | 04/09/1976 | 11/09/1976 | 04/09/1976 | ||||||||||||
12/1976 | Railway World | 09/10/1976 | 23/09/1976 | 02/10/1976 | 25/09/1976 | 02/10/1976 | |||||||||||
03/1977 | Railway World | 11/12/1976 | 31/12/1976 | 25/12/1976 | 31/12/1976 | 31/12/1976 | |||||||||||
06/1979 | Railway World | 31/03/1979 | 10/03/1979 | 03/03/1979 |