Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2959 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33609 Week
» 132254 Month
» 334918 Year
» 3361771 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #5483
Type |
LNER Non-Corridor |
Company |
LNER |
Water |
5,000gal |
Coal |
8t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
57t 18cwt |
Wheelbase |
5' 3" + 5' 6" + 5' 3" = 16' 0" |
Wheel Diameter |
4' 2" |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A3 |
2599 |
BOOK LAW |
12/07/1930 |
A1 |
4475 |
FLYING FOX |
29/10/1936 |
A3 |
2596 |
MANNA |
19/03/1937 |
A3 |
256l |
MINORU |
23/02/1946 |
A3 |
2596 |
MANNA |
15/03/1946 |
A3 |
60048 |
DONCASTER |
14/04/1962 |
|