Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2551 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 7704 Week
» 142520 Month
» 345184 Year
» 3372037 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #5275
Type |
GNR 5,000g |
Company |
GNR |
Water |
5,000gal |
Coal |
8t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
56t 6cwt |
Wheelbase |
5' 3" + 5' 6" + 5' 3" = 16' 0" |
Wheel Diameter |
4' 2" |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
2565 |
MERRY HAMPTON |
16/07/1924 |
A3 |
2749 |
FLAMINGO |
20/03/1929 |
A3 |
2796 |
SPEARMINT |
07/07/1938 |
A3 |
2747 |
CORONACH |
28/02/1942 |
A3 |
60078 |
NIGHT HAWK |
06/05/1952 |
|