Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3594 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17000 Week
» 70016 Month
» 189543 Year
» 3216396 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2720
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4096 |
HIGHCLERE CASTLE |
06/04/1943 |
Castle |
5071 |
SPITFIRE |
12/06/1948 |
Castle |
7005 |
LAMPHEY CASTLE |
08/10/1948 |
Castle |
7007 |
GREAT WESTERN |
23/04/1949 |
Castle |
5068 |
BEVERSTON CASTLE |
03/11/1949 |
Castle |
4090 |
DORCHESTER CASTLE |
19/10/1951 |
Castle |
5080 |
DEFIANT |
30/05/1952 |
Castle |
5079 |
LYSANDER |
16/04/1953 |
Castle |
4082 |
WINDSOR CASTLE |
03/08/1953 |
|