Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4304 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 19916 Week
» 118561 Month
» 321225 Year
» 3348078 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2774
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5019 |
TREAGO CASTLE |
28/01/1939 |
Castle |
5080 |
DEFIANT |
19/02/1943 |
Castle |
4086 |
BUILTH CASTLE |
22/04/1944 |
Castle |
5065 |
NEWPORT CASTLE |
22/12/1944 |
Castle |
4086 |
BUILTH CASTLE |
19/01/1948 |
Castle |
5008 |
RAGLAN CASTLE |
09/03/1951 |
Castle |
7019 |
FOWEY CASTLE |
21/01/1953 |
Castle |
4091 |
DUDLEY CASTLE |
12/08/1953 |
Castle |
7007 |
GREAT WESTERN |
11/09/1953 |
Castle |
5049 |
EARL OF PLYMOUTH |
15/12/1953 |
Castle |
4095 |
HARLECH CASTLE |
06/12/1955 |
Castle |
5070 |
SIR DANIEL GOOCH |
24/10/1957 |
Castle |
5069 |
ISAMBARD KINGDOM BRUNEL |
28/11/1958 |
|