Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 445 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18248 Week
» 71264 Month
» 190791 Year
» 3217644 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #4095
Type |
Hawksworth 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
47t 6cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4084 |
ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE |
04/02/1955 |
Castle |
5043 |
EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE |
24/10/1956 |
Castle |
5074 |
HAMPDEN |
23/04/1958 |
Castle |
4089 |
DONNINGTON CASTLE |
27/11/1959 |
Castle |
5000 |
LAUNCESTON CASTLE |
18/09/1961 |
|