Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #4016
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
7004 |
EASTNOR CASTLE |
19/06/1946 |
Castle |
5063 |
EARL BALDWIN |
22/09/1948 |
Castle |
7029 |
CLUN CASTLE |
12/05/1952 |
Castle |
5066 |
WARDOUR CASTLE |
08/03/1954 |
Castle |
5000 |
LAUNCESTON CASTLE |
03/11/1955 |
|