Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2750 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33400 Week
» 132045 Month
» 334709 Year
» 3361562 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2385
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5000 |
LAUNCESTON CASTLE |
06/1928 |
Castle |
4094 |
DYNEVOR CASTLE |
06/04/1935 |
Castle |
5013 |
ABERGAVENNY CASTLE |
03/01/1942 |
Castle |
5024 |
CAREW CASTLE |
04/04/1946 |
Castle |
5062 |
EARL OF SHAFTESBURY |
30/03/1948 |
Castle |
4000 |
NORTH STAR |
15/11/1951 |
Castle |
5025 |
CHIRK CASTLE |
06/08/1953 |
Castle |
7004 |
EASTNOR CASTLE |
30/05/1960 |
|