Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2757 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33407 Week
» 132052 Month
» 334716 Year
» 3361569 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #8956/29281
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
107 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A4 |
4493 |
WOODCOCK |
26/07/1937 |
A4 |
4499 |
SIR MURROUGH WILSON |
11/03/1943 |
A4 |
31 |
GOLDEN PLOVER |
01/08/1947 |
A3 |
60101 |
CICERO |
16/11/1954 |
A3 |
60055 |
WOOLWINDER |
17/06/1958 |
A3 |
60099 |
CALL BOY |
05/12/1959 |
A4 |
60023 |
GOLDEN EAGLE |
10/01/1963 |
|