Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3237 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33887 Week
» 132532 Month
» 335196 Year
» 3362049 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #8955
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
107 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A4 |
4492 |
DOMINION OF NEW ZEALAND |
27/06/1937 |
A4 |
4488 |
UNION OF SOUTH AFRICA |
13/01/1945 |
A4 |
587 |
KESTREL |
18/04/1946 |
A4 |
60008 |
DWIGHT D EISENHOWER |
14/06/1950 |
|