Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2442 Today
» 4203 Yesterday
» 23861 Week
» 46832 Month
» 393256 Year
» 3420109 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #8948
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
107 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A4 |
4485 |
KESTREL |
20/02/1937 |
A4 |
4486 |
MERLIN |
05/07/1940 |
A4 |
4497 |
GOLDEN PLOVER |
16/05/1942 |
A4 |
22 |
MALLARD |
05/03/1948 |
A4 |
60026 |
MILES BEEVOR |
23/09/1949 |
|