Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1337 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 12552 Week
» 3608 Month
» 350032 Year
» 3376885 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #28102
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
100A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
B1 |
61137 |
|
21/09/1950 |
B1 |
61138 |
|
21/05/1952 |
B1 |
61253 |
|
02/07/1954 |
B1 |
61011 |
WATERBUCK |
23/03/1956 |
B1 |
61276 |
|
21/11/1958 |
B1 |
61303 |
|
21/06/1961 |
|