Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 817 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18620 Week
» 71636 Month
» 191163 Year
» 3218016 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #3089/29359
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
109 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
V2 |
4861 |
|
28/12/1939 |
V2 |
863 |
|
21/05/1947 |
V2 |
60861 |
|
20/06/1949 |
V2 |
60826 |
|
13/03/1953 |
V2 |
60983 |
|
02/04/1955 |
V2 |
60881 |
|
05/10/1956 |
V2 |
60903 |
|
11/03/1959 |
V2 |
60858 |
|
14/10/1961 |
|