Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 358 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18161 Week
» 71177 Month
» 190704 Year
» 3217557 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29365/3006
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
109 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
V2 |
4821 |
|
17/03/1939 |
V2 |
861 |
|
11/01/1947 |
V2 |
60855 |
|
15/07/1949 |
V2 |
60874 |
|
11/08/1953 |
V2 |
60876 |
|
11/05/1956 |
V2 |
60913 |
|
12/05/1959 |
V2 |
60973 |
|
04/06/1962 |
|