Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1672 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15078 Week
» 68094 Month
» 187621 Year
» 3214474 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #3097/29494
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
109 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
V2 |
4864 |
|
20/01/1940 |
V2 |
879 |
|
24/06/1947 |
V2 |
60833 |
|
15/10/1949 |
V2 |
60899 |
|
26/03/1954 |
V2 |
60897 |
|
22/09/1956 |
V2 |
60855 |
|
22/01/1959 |
|