Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1500 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14906 Week
» 67922 Month
» 187449 Year
» 3214302 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29430
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
109 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
V2 |
60831 |
|
29/12/1950 |
V2 |
60917 |
|
10/04/1953 |
V2 |
60896 |
|
24/02/1955 |
V2 |
60971 |
|
25/05/1957 |
V2 |
60887 |
|
01/07/1959 |
V2 |
60898 |
|
02/02/1962 |
|