Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 4145 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23056 Week
» 88010 Month
» 290674 Year
» 3317527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #3160/29376
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
109 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
V2 |
4890 |
|
07/09/1941 |
V2 |
4857 |
|
04/09/1943 |
V2 |
926 |
|
15/11/1947 |
V2 |
60828 |
|
03/10/1949 |
V2 |
60914 |
|
04/01/1954 |
V2 |
60869 |
|
15/02/1956 |
V2 |
60962 |
|
08/06/1960 |
|