Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1233 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19036 Week
» 72052 Month
» 191579 Year
» 3218432 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29343
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
109 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
V2 |
60876 |
|
13/10/1950 |
V2 |
60940 |
|
27/03/1953 |
V2 |
819 |
|
15/01/1955 |
V2 |
60819 |
|
15/01/1955 |
V2 |
60954 |
|
05/10/1956 |
V2 |
60876 |
|
13/02/1959 |
|