Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3493 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16899 Week
» 69915 Month
» 189442 Year
» 3216295 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #2963/29481
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
109 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
V2 |
4811 |
|
28/10/1938 |
V2 |
4787 |
|
18/08/1945 |
V2 |
888 |
|
31/05/1947 |
V2 |
60955 |
|
03/06/1949 |
V2 |
60959 |
|
25/10/1952 |
V2 |
60898 |
|
31/07/1954 |
V2 |
60802 |
|
17/05/1957 |
V2 |
60862 |
|
07/10/1961 |
|