Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1582 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19385 Week
» 72401 Month
» 191928 Year
» 3218781 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29504
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
109 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
V2 |
60978 |
|
28/11/1951 |
V2 |
60811 |
|
15/05/1954 |
V2 |
60860 |
DURHAM SCHOOL |
14/11/1956 |
V2 |
60885 |
|
13/01/1959 |
V2 |
60944 |
|
04/07/1962 |
|