Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3485 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34135 Week
» 132780 Month
» 335444 Year
» 3362297 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #3731/29780
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
117 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A2 |
518 |
TEHRAN |
28/12/1946 |
A2 |
60514 |
CHAMOSSAIRE |
24/12/1953 |
A2 |
60512 |
STEADY AIM |
04/11/1955 |
A2 |
60535 |
HORNET'S BEAUTY |
20/12/1957 |
A2 |
60534 |
IRISH ELEGANCE |
03/06/1959 |
A1 |
60129 |
GUY MANNERING |
17/03/1961 |
|