Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 35 Online
» 2429 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33079 Week
» 131724 Month
» 334388 Year
» 3361241 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29803
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
118 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
60135 |
MADGE WILDFIRE |
06/10/1950 |
A2 |
60539 |
BRONZINO |
02/01/1953 |
A1 |
60158 |
ABERDONIAN |
29/04/1954 |
A1 |
60162 |
SAINT JOHNSTOUN |
18/02/1956 |
A1 |
60147 |
NORTH EASTERN |
16/11/1957 |
A1 |
60116 |
HAL O' THE WYND |
12/01/1960 |
A1 |
60154 |
BON ACCORD |
12/11/1962 |
|