Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 40 Online
» 2023 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32673 Week
» 131318 Month
» 333982 Year
» 3360835 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #9662/29832
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
118 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
60116 |
|
08/10/1948 |
A2 |
60531 |
BAHRAM |
23/10/1952 |
A1 |
60126 |
SIR VINCENT RAVEN |
16/03/1954 |
A1 |
60151 |
MIDLOTHIAN |
15/08/1956 |
A2 |
60523 |
SUN CASTLE |
05/03/1958 |
A2 |
60512 |
STEADY AIM |
09/01/1960 |
A2 |
60524 |
HERRINGBONE |
08/11/1962 |
|