Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 4608 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 15823 Week
» 6879 Month
» 353303 Year
» 3380156 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #1196
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
15 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
O4 |
1625 |
|
08/1918 |
O4 |
6360 |
|
15/11/1924 |
O4 |
6367 |
|
25/01/1930 |
O4 |
6314 |
|
28/04/1932 |
O4 |
5334 |
|
21/07/1934 |
|