Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2263 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32913 Week
» 131558 Month
» 334222 Year
» 3361075 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #8075
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
94HP |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A3 |
2743 |
FELSTEAD |
22/08/1928 |
A3 |
2744 |
GRAND PARADE |
29/03/1932 |
A3 |
2747 |
CORONACH |
22/05/1933 |
A3 |
2750 |
PAPYRUS |
18/06/1938 |
A3 |
2503 |
FIRDAUSSI |
19/10/1943 |
|