Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 528 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 11743 Week
» 2799 Month
» 349223 Year
» 3376076 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #27003
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
94HP |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A3 |
60080 |
DICK TURPIN |
20/10/1950 |
A3 |
60086 |
GAINSBOROUGH |
18/06/1952 |
A3 |
60089 |
FELSTEAD |
13/10/1953 |
A3 |
60092 |
FAIRWAY |
17/03/1955 |
A3 |
60041 |
SALMON TROUT |
20/02/1958 |
A3 |
60038 |
FIRDAUSSI |
30/09/1959 |
|