Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 642 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31292 Week
» 129937 Month
» 332601 Year
» 3359454 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29290
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
107 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A4 |
60005 |
SIR CHARLES NEWTON |
11/06/1951 |
A4 |
60029 |
WOODCOCK |
22/04/1954 |
A4 |
60033 |
SEAGULL |
13/06/1956 |
A4 |
60001 |
SIR RONALD MATTHEWS |
11/04/1958 |
A3 |
60057 |
ORMONDE |
27/01/1960 |
A3 |
60071 |
TRANQUIL |
04/11/1961 |
|