Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1203 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19006 Week
» 72022 Month
» 191549 Year
» 3218402 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #4634
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HA |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5006 |
TREGENNA CASTLE |
11/06/1927 |
Castle |
4083 |
ABBOTSBURY CASTLE |
09/09/1929 |
Castle |
4092 |
DUNRAVEN CASTLE |
17/04/1931 |
Castle |
4079 |
PENDENNIS CASTLE |
24/05/1935 |
Castle |
5041 |
TIVERTON CASTLE |
25/01/1939 |
Castle |
5044 |
EARL OF DUNRAVEN |
25/01/1939 |
Castle |
5094 |
TRETOWER CASTLE |
02/06/1943 |
Castle |
5033 |
BROUGHTON CASTLE |
13/02/1948 |
Castle |
5074 |
HAMPDEN |
19/05/1949 |
Castle |
5043 |
EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE |
07/02/1951 |
Castle |
5088 |
LLANTHONY ABBEY |
02/03/1953 |
|