Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 292 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18095 Week
» 71111 Month
» 190638 Year
» 3217491 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6683
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5096 |
BRIDGWATER CASTLE |
29/06/1939 |
Castle |
5031 |
TOTNES CASTLE |
24/10/1945 |
Castle |
5043 |
EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE |
23/05/1947 |
Castle |
4078 |
PEMBROKE CASTLE |
15/02/1949 |
Castle |
5089 |
WESTMINSTER ABBEY |
22/12/1950 |
Castle |
4037 |
THE SOUTH WALES BORDERERS |
04/07/1952 |
Castle |
5046 |
EARL CAWDOR |
07/10/1954 |
Castle |
5090 |
NEATH ABBEY |
24/04/1957 |
Castle |
5041 |
TIVERTON CASTLE |
07/09/1959 |
Castle |
5044 |
EARL OF DUNRAVEN |
07/09/1959 |
Castle |
4076 |
CARMARTHEN CASTLE |
15/08/1961 |
|