Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1949 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 29128 Week
» 20184 Month
» 366608 Year
» 3393461 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #2108/27720
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
97 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
J39 |
2701 |
|
25/08/1928 |
J39 |
1286 |
|
07/06/1934 |
J39 |
1296 |
|
14/11/1936 |
J39 |
1281 |
|
06/05/1939 |
J39 |
1494 |
|
22/01/1944 |
J39 |
4760 |
|
19/10/1946 |
J39 |
64811 |
|
12/11/1949 |
|