Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 2279 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32929 Week
» 131574 Month
» 334238 Year
» 3361091 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #4623
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HA |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4095 |
HARLECH CASTLE |
16/06/1926 |
Castle |
4097 |
KENILWORTH CASTLE |
31/07/1929 |
Castle |
4095 |
HARLECH CASTLE |
12/08/1932 |
Castle |
4085 |
BERKELEY CASTLE |
07/12/1935 |
Castle |
5000 |
LAUNCESTON CASTLE |
29/03/1939 |
Castle |
4000 |
NORTH STAR |
12/01/1943 |
Castle |
111 |
VISCOUNT CHURCHILL |
08/05/1946 |
Castle |
5065 |
NEWPORT CASTLE |
20/02/1948 |
Castle |
4097 |
KENILWORTH CASTLE |
17/11/1949 |
Castle |
4091 |
DUDLEY CASTLE |
01/01/1952 |
|