04/1874 |
|
|
947 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1829 |
01/1924 |
04/1874 |
|
|
948 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1830 |
09/1948 |
05/1874 |
|
|
949 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1831 |
11/1928 |
05/1874 |
|
|
950 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1832 |
02/1923 |
05/1874 |
|
|
951 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1833 |
09/1926 |
05/1874 |
|
|
952 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1834 |
01/1924 |
08/1874 |
|
|
953 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1835 |
08/07/1957 |
08/1874 |
|
|
954 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1836 |
30/05/1960 |
08/1874 |
|
|
955 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1837 |
05/1926 |
08/1874 |
|
|
956 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1838 |
04/07/1955 |
08/1874 |
|
|
957 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1839 |
04/1937 |
08/1874 |
|
|
958 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
1840 |
09/1944 |
05/1875 |
|
|
1340 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1644 |
04/06/1956 |
05/1875 |
|
|
1341 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1645 |
04/1950 |
05/1875 |
|
|
1342 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1646 |
27/01/1958 |
05/1875 |
|
|
1343 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1647 |
04/1934 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1344 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1648 |
19/01/1953 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1345 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1649 |
31/12/1921 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1346 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1650 |
07/04/1958 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1347 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1651 |
10/1948 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1348 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1652 |
12/07/1954 |
06/1875 |
|
|
1349 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1653 |
12/05/1958 |
09/1875 |
|
|
1430 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1677 |
03/1944 |
09/1875 |
|
|
1431 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1678 |
04/1951 |
09/1875 |
|
|
1432 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1679 |
04/12/1958 |
09/1875 |
|
|
1433 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1680 |
18/11/1959 |
10/1875 |
|
|
1434 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1681 |
31/12/1921 |
10/1875 |
|
|
1435 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1682 |
06/02/1956 |
10/1875 |
|
|
1436 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1683 |
11/1929 |
11/1875 |
|
|
1437 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1684 |
31/12/1921 |
11/1875 |
|
|
1438 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1685 |
27/02/1961 |
11/1875 |
|
|
1439 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
1686 |
04/1939 |
06/1876 |
|
|
288 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/1923 |
08/1876 |
|
|
624 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/1923 |
10/1876 |
|
|
108 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1926 |
12/1876 |
|
|
69 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
31/12/1920 |
01/1877 |
|
|
297 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/1923 |
01/1877 |
|
|
588 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/1923 |
02/1877 |
|
|
357 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/1921 |
05/1877 |
|
|
354 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
19/10/1960 |
06/1877 |
|
|
1033 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/1945 |
06/1877 |
|
|
1115 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/11/1959 |
07/1877 |
|
|
15 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/02/1957 |
07/1877 |
|
|
614 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/05/1954 |
08/1877 |
|
|
1058 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/1922 |
08/1877 |
|
|
1089 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/1921 |
09/1877 |
|
|
43 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
24/12/1958 |
10/1877 |
|
|
47 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1949 |
10/1877 |
|
|
632 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/1921 |
11/1877 |
|
|
607 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/09/1956 |
11/1877 |
|
|
71 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/1950 |
01/1878 |
|
|
164 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1933 |
01/1878 |
|
|
273 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1927 |
01/1878 |
|
|
998 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
06/1944 |
03/1878 |
|
|
1019 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/1928 |
03/1878 |
|
|
145 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1946 |
03/1878 |
|
|
323 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1927 |
03/1878 |
|
|
60 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/1928 |
04/1878 |
|
|
1020 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1928 |
04/1878 |
|
|
1021 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1933 |
04/1878 |
|
|
324 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/04/1955 |
05/1878 |
|
|
1460 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1933 |
07/1878 |
|
|
264 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
31/12/1921 |
07/1878 |
|
|
276 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/05/1954 |
08/1878 |
|
|
333 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/1933 |
09/1878 |
|
|
105 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/06/1954 |
10/1878 |
|
|
207 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
31/12/1920 |
10/1878 |
|
|
344 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/11/1957 |
10/1878 |
|
|
63 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/1929 |
11/1878 |
|
|
320 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1922 |
11/1878 |
|
|
341 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
07/1928 |
12/1878 |
|
|
416 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
06/1929 |
01/1879 |
|
|
334 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/1929 |
01/1879 |
|
|
466 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/1929 |
02/1879 |
|
|
343 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/1927 |
03/1879 |
|
|
1465 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
16/06/1958 |
03/1879 |
|
|
353 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/1923 |
04/1879 |
|
|
612 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/01/1960 |
05/1879 |
|
|
1055 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1928 |
05/1879 |
|
|
672 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1928 |
06/1879 |
|
|
10 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1928 |
06/1879 |
|
|
1116 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
19/08/1957 |
06/1879 |
|
|
173 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/1935 |
06/1879 |
|
|
319 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
07/02/1955 |
06/1879 |
|
|
595 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1929 |
06/1879 |
|
|
597 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/01/1958 |
07/1879 |
|
|
263 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
23/01/1956 |
08/1879 |
|
|
605 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/1927 |
08/1879 |
|
|
92 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/1923 |
09/1879 |
|
|
596 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1921 |
10/1879 |
|
|
1466 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1923 |
10/1879 |
|
|
62 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/1926 |
10/1879 |
|
|
87 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1927 |
11/1879 |
|
|
127 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
07/1921 |
12/1879 |
|
|
151 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
15/02/1960 |
12/1879 |
|
|
57 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
18/06/1956 |
12/1879 |
|
|
604 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
16/05/1955 |
02/1880 |
|
|
247 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1927 |
03/1880 |
|
|
321 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/1926 |
03/1880 |
|
|
322 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/1924 |
03/1880 |
|
|
65 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
06/1928 |
05/1880 |
|
|
999 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1933 |
06/1880 |
|
|
1000 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1951 |
07/1880 |
|
|
1313 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
07/01/1957 |
08/1880 |
|
|
1461 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/10/1958 |
09/1880 |
|
|
615 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/1927 |
09/1880 |
|
|
638 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/1928 |
10/1880 |
|
|
1462 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
18/06/1956 |
10/1880 |
|
|
585 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/1926 |
10/1880 |
|
|
586 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/1922 |
10/1880 |
|
|
591 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1921 |
11/1880 |
|
|
623 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/01/1956 |
07/1881 |
124 |
|
609 |
0-6-0T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1911 |
08/1881 |
124 |
|
124 |
0-6-0T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/1926 |
08/1881 |
124 |
|
602 |
0-6-0T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1929 |
08/1881 |
124 |
|
610 |
0-6-0T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1917 |
09/1881 |
124 |
|
1059 |
0-6-0T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/1927 |
09/1881 |
124 |
|
193 |
0-6-0T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/1928 |
12/1881 |
124 |
|
197 |
0-6-0T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1927 |
12/1881 |
124 |
|
198 |
0-6-0T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1928 |
01/1882 |
124 |
|
599 |
0-6-0T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/1926 |
02/1882 |
124 |
|
171 |
0-6-0T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/1927 |
02/1882 |
124 |
|
598 |
0-6-0T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/1926 |
03/1882 |
124 |
|
211 |
0-6-0T |
E. Fletcher |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1928 |
03/1882 |
|
|
255 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/1928 |
03/1882 |
|
|
256 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/1923 |
06/1882 |
|
|
1312 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/1923 |
06/1882 |
|
|
281 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
24/02/1958 |
07/1882 |
|
|
138 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1944 |
08/1882 |
|
|
226 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1929 |
06/1883 |
|
|
186 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/1927 |
06/1883 |
|
|
28 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/1921 |
08/1883 |
|
|
188 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/1922 |
09/1883 |
59 |
|
497 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/1924 |
10/1883 |
|
|
189 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/1926 |
10/1883 |
59 |
|
440 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1926 |
11/1883 |
59 |
|
208 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/1924 |
12/1883 |
59 |
|
455 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/1927 |
12/1883 |
59 |
|
506 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/1928 |
12/1883 |
59 |
|
620 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1927 |
01/1884 |
59 |
|
235 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1927 |
01/1884 |
59 |
|
681 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/1928 |
03/1884 |
59 |
|
446 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/1924 |
03/1884 |
|
|
498 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1926 |
04/1884 |
59 |
|
369 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/1926 |
04/1884 |
59 |
|
508 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/1926 |
05/1884 |
59 |
|
502 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/1929 |
05/1884 |
59 |
|
682 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1927 |
06/1884 |
59 |
|
567 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1928 |
06/1884 |
59 |
|
571 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/1924 |
07/1884 |
|
|
606 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1926 |
10/1884 |
59 |
|
131 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1930 |
10/1884 |
|
|
1480 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2581 |
03/1927 |
10/1884 |
|
|
1481 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2582 |
04/1925 |
10/1884 |
|
|
1482 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2583 |
10/1927 |
10/1884 |
|
|
1483 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2584 |
09/1927 |
10/1884 |
59 |
|
522 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1927 |
11/1884 |
|
|
1484 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2585 |
11/1924 |
11/1884 |
59 |
|
388 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/1927 |
11/1884 |
59 |
|
565 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/1929 |
11/1884 |
59 |
|
59 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/1927 |
11/1884 |
59 |
|
812 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/1929 |
12/1884 |
|
|
1485 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2586 |
11/1928 |
12/1884 |
|
|
1486 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2587 |
01/1930 |
12/1884 |
|
|
1487 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2588 |
12/1926 |
12/1884 |
|
|
290 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
York Works |
?? |
|
23/08/1954 |
12/1884 |
|
|
305 |
0-4-4T |
E. Fletcher |
York Works |
?? |
|
06/1948 |
12/1884 |
59 |
|
78 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/1927 |
02/1885 |
59 |
|
1102 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/1929 |
02/1885 |
|
|
1488 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2589 |
05/1928 |
02/1885 |
|
|
1489 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2590 |
02/1926 |
02/1885 |
|
|
1490 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2591 |
01/1928 |
03/1885 |
59 |
|
1106 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/1926 |
03/1885 |
|
|
1491 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2592 |
01/1926 |
05/1885 |
59 |
|
232 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/1928 |
08/1885 |
59 |
|
422 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1927 |
08/1885 |
59 |
|
491 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1929 |
08/1885 |
8 |
|
8 |
0-6-0T |
H. Tennant |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1931 |
09/1885 |
59 |
|
142 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/1928 |
09/1885 |
59 |
|
192 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/1925 |
09/1885 |
8 |
|
20 |
0-6-0T |
H. Tennant |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1931 |
10/1885 |
8 |
|
461 |
0-6-0T |
H. Tennant |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1931 |
11/1885 |
8 |
|
489 |
0-6-0T |
H. Tennant |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1931 |
11/1885 |
8 |
|
662 |
0-6-0T |
H. Tennant |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/1931 |
12/1885 |
8 |
|
64 |
0-6-0T |
H. Tennant |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/1930 |
12/1885 |
8 |
|
82 |
0-6-0T |
H. Tennant |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1931 |
12/1885 |
8 |
|
88 |
0-6-0T |
H. Tennant |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1931 |
03/1886 |
59 |
|
1141 |
0-6-0 |
A. McDonnell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1926 |
03/1886 |
A |
|
187 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
03/1928 |
03/1886 |
A |
|
72 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
04/1931 |
04/1886 |
A |
|
262 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
02/1934 |
04/1886 |
A |
|
485 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
05/1934 |
05/1886 |
A |
|
575 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
09/1937 |
05/1886 |
A |
|
671 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
06/1933 |
05/1886 |
A |
|
685 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
10/1932 |
05/1886 |
A |
|
801 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
10/1932 |
06/1886 |
B |
|
14 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/1932 |
06/1886 |
A |
|
490 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
06/1931 |
06/1886 |
B |
|
531 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/1937 |
06/1886 |
A |
|
674 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
06/1934 |
07/1886 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/03/1952 |
07/1886 |
B |
|
185 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1932 |
08/1886 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
27/11/1950 |
08/1886 |
C1 |
|
22 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
11.86 |
11/1932 |
08/1886 |
C |
|
22 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
11.86 |
11/1932 |
08/1886 |
B |
|
428 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/1930 |
08/1886 |
C1 |
|
480 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
12.86 |
12/1931 |
08/1886 |
C |
|
480 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
12.86 |
12/1931 |
08/1886 |
C1 |
|
539 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
13.86 |
12/1932 |
08/1886 |
C |
|
539 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
13.86 |
12/1932 |
09/1886 |
C |
|
16 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
16.86 |
13/11/1951 |
09/1886 |
B |
|
504 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/1937 |
09/1886 |
B |
|
528 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1929 |
10/1886 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/1950 |
10/1886 |
C1 |
|
182 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
15.86 |
07/1932 |
10/1886 |
C |
|
182 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
15.86 |
07/1932 |
10/1886 |
C1 |
|
86 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
14.86 |
07/1930 |
10/1886 |
C |
|
86 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
14.86 |
07/1930 |
11/1886 |
B |
|
1165 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1939 |
11/1886 |
E |
|
144 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
11/1886 |
C1 |
|
152 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
19.86 |
10/1932 |
11/1886 |
C |
|
152 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
19.86 |
10/1932 |
11/1886 |
E |
|
165 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/01/1960 |
11/1886 |
C1 |
|
360 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
20.86 |
03/1930 |
11/1886 |
C |
|
360 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
20.86 |
03/1930 |
11/1886 |
C1 |
|
4 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
18.86 |
12/1931 |
11/1886 |
C |
|
4 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
18.86 |
12/1931 |
12/1886 |
E |
|
299 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1951 |
12/1886 |
E |
|
317 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1936 |
12/1886 |
A |
|
414 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
06/1930 |
12/1886 |
A |
|
415 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
06/1931 |
12/1886 |
A |
|
419 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
05/1930 |
12/1886 |
C1 |
|
558 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
21.86 |
07/1932 |
12/1886 |
C |
|
558 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
21.86 |
07/1932 |
12/1886 |
C1 |
|
667 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
22.86 |
11/1931 |
12/1886 |
C |
|
667 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
22.86 |
11/1931 |
01/1887 |
E |
|
261 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/02/1957 |
01/1887 |
E |
|
304 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/1936 |
01/1887 |
E |
|
399 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/1933 |
02/1887 |
E |
|
27 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/1933 |
02/1887 |
E |
|
326 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/02/1961 |
02/1887 |
A |
|
507 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
06/1930 |
02/1887 |
E |
|
533 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
21/08/1954 |
02/1887 |
A |
|
537 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
05/1930 |
03/1887 |
A |
|
1322 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
02/1932 |
03/1887 |
A |
|
454 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
02/1934 |
04/1887 |
E |
|
168 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/11/1955 |
04/1887 |
A |
|
201 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
03/1929 |
04/1887 |
E |
|
263 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
04/1887 |
A |
|
404 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
02/1935 |
04/1887 |
E |
|
70 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/11/1960 |
05/1887 |
C |
|
1301 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
8.87 |
01/1935 |
05/1887 |
C |
|
1305 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
9.87 |
10/1949 |
05/1887 |
C |
|
1332 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
10.87 |
12/1931 |
05/1887 |
E |
|
272 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1947 |
05/1887 |
E |
|
278 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/1935 |
05/1887 |
E |
|
347 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/09/1955 |
05/1887 |
A |
|
469 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
02/1937 |
06/1887 |
C |
|
1309 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
11.87 |
02/1937 |
06/1887 |
C |
|
1315 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
12.87 |
27/02/1950 |
06/1887 |
C |
|
1323 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
13.87 |
28/08/1951 |
06/1887 |
C |
|
1336 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
17.87 |
05/1932 |
06/1887 |
E |
|
493 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1939 |
06/1887 |
E |
|
494 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/11/1956 |
06/1887 |
E |
|
499 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/09/1956 |
06/1887 |
E |
|
811 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
09/1887 |
C |
|
1337 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
18.87 |
05/1949 |
09/1887 |
C |
|
1338 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
19.87 |
10/1932 |
10/1887 |
C |
|
1339 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
20.87 |
02/1929 |
01/1888 |
B |
|
9 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/1949 |
03/1888 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/1949 |
04/1888 |
E |
|
242 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/1936 |
04/1888 |
E |
|
268 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1939 |
04/1888 |
E |
|
275 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1947 |
05/1888 |
|
|
172 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
12/1929 |
05/1888 |
|
|
205 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
06/1929 |
05/1888 |
|
|
21 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
11/1929 |
05/1888 |
E |
|
285 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1936 |
05/1888 |
E |
|
286 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/08/1958 |
05/1888 |
|
|
35 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
03/1930 |
05/1888 |
E |
|
403 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/1950 |
06/1888 |
C |
|
101 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
17.88 |
06/1935 |
06/1888 |
E |
|
1123 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
27/04/1959 |
06/1888 |
|
|
1160 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
01/1934 |
06/1888 |
C |
|
1161 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
15.88 |
09/1935 |
06/1888 |
E |
|
1163 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/1933 |
06/1888 |
|
|
13 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
04/1938 |
06/1888 |
C |
|
160 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
13.88 |
12/1932 |
06/1888 |
|
|
169 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
06/1930 |
06/1888 |
|
|
279 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
09/1931 |
06/1888 |
C |
|
5 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
16.88 |
01/1933 |
06/1888 |
E |
|
541 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/04/1958 |
06/1888 |
C |
|
56 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
14.88 |
04/1937 |
06/1888 |
E |
|
584 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/1935 |
06/1888 |
|
|
804 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
01/1935 |
06/1888 |
|
|
854 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
04/1935 |
06/1888 |
C |
|
95 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
18.88 |
06/1932 |
09/1888 |
C |
|
110 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
21.88 |
12/1931 |
09/1888 |
C |
|
31 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
20.88 |
12/1932 |
09/1888 |
C |
|
7 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
19.88 |
02/1935 |
10/1888 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/1938 |
10/1888 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
28/06/1955 |
10/1888 |
C |
|
800 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
22.88 |
18/04/1951 |
10/1888 |
B |
|
855 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/1950 |
10/1888 |
B |
|
857 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1935 |
10/1888 |
B |
|
858 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/1936 |
11/1888 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
26/09/1955 |
11/1888 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
20/10/1952 |
11/1888 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
25/11/1950 |
11/1888 |
B |
|
860 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/1937 |
12/1888 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
28/06/1955 |
12/1888 |
B |
|
213 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1936 |
12/1888 |
B |
|
219 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
17/07/1952 |
12/1888 |
B |
|
284 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/1936 |
12/1888 |
B |
|
371 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1931 |
12/1888 |
H1 |
|
590 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
12/1888 |
B |
|
683 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1939 |
12/1888 |
|
|
995 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
06/1933 |
02/1889 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1949 |
02/1889 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/1949 |
02/1889 |
B |
|
349 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/1937 |
02/1889 |
C |
|
458 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
1.89 |
11/1938 |
02/1889 |
C |
|
564 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
2.89 |
10/1934 |
02/1889 |
C |
|
869 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
3.89 |
01/1931 |
03/1889 |
B |
|
350 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1936 |
03/1889 |
B |
|
351 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/1930 |
03/1889 |
C |
|
871 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
4.89 |
05/1943 |
03/1889 |
C |
|
872 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
5.89 |
11/1933 |
03/1889 |
C |
|
874 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
6.89 |
11/06/1948 |
03/1889 |
C |
|
875 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
7.89 |
16/08/1948 |
03/1889 |
C |
|
876 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
8.89 |
23/04/1962 |
04/1889 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
27/10/1954 |
04/1889 |
B |
|
1124 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1939 |
04/1889 |
B |
|
1145 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1936 |
04/1889 |
B |
|
373 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/1933 |
04/1889 |
C |
|
611 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
11.89 |
05/1934 |
04/1889 |
C |
|
877 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
9.89 |
05/1944 |
04/1889 |
C |
|
878 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
10.89 |
04/1933 |
05/1889 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
28/02/1955 |
05/1889 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/07/1952 |
05/1889 |
B |
|
445 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1945 |
05/1889 |
B |
|
523 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
05/1889 |
C |
|
613 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
12.89 |
28/05/1956 |
05/1889 |
C |
|
619 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
13.89 |
12/12/1949 |
05/1889 |
C |
|
944 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
14.89 |
04/1950 |
05/1889 |
C |
|
960 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
19.89 |
01/1934 |
05/1889 |
C |
|
992 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
15.89 |
04/1937 |
06/1889 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/07/1952 |
06/1889 |
B |
|
509 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1937 |
06/1889 |
C |
|
680 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
24.89 |
15/09/1952 |
06/1889 |
C |
|
776 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
25.89 |
01/02/1951 |
06/1889 |
C |
|
778 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
26.89 |
07/07/1954 |
06/1889 |
C |
|
806 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
27.89 |
01/1951 |
06/1889 |
C |
|
899 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
18.89 |
26/11/1958 |
06/1889 |
C |
|
962 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
28.89 |
31/10/1949 |
06/1889 |
C |
|
963 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
29.89 |
10/1947 |
06/1889 |
C |
|
965 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
30.89 |
07/1947 |
06/1889 |
C |
|
993 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
16.89 |
30/11/1954 |
06/1889 |
C |
|
994 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
17.89 |
03/1934 |
06/1889 |
C |
|
996 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
20.89 |
08/1935 |
07/1889 |
E |
|
1167 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
24/11/1958 |
07/1889 |
E |
|
221 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1951 |
07/1889 |
E |
|
84 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1933 |
08/1889 |
E |
|
224 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/07/1951 |
08/1889 |
E |
|
225 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
08/1889 |
E |
|
453 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/1939 |
08/1889 |
E |
|
492 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1953 |
09/1889 |
E |
|
495 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/04/1959 |
09/1889 |
E |
|
496 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
09/1889 |
E |
|
501 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/01/1959 |
10/1889 |
B |
|
215 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1937 |
10/1889 |
B |
|
216 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1931 |
10/1889 |
C |
|
973 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
31.89 |
29/12/1954 |
11/1889 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
18/10/1956 |
11/1889 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/02/1953 |
11/1889 |
B |
|
218 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/1943 |
11/1889 |
B |
|
238 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1929 |
11/1889 |
C |
|
960 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
33.89 |
03/1937 |
11/1889 |
C |
|
976 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
39.89 |
11/1945 |
11/1889 |
C |
|
981 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
32.89 |
02/06/1948 |
12/1889 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/05/1955 |
12/1889 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
27/10/1952 |
12/1889 |
B |
|
1168 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1931 |
12/1889 |
|
|
1171 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
02/1934 |
12/1889 |
C |
|
122 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
59.89 |
11/1938 |
12/1889 |
|
|
128 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
07/1936 |
12/1889 |
C |
|
133 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
60.89 |
11/1938 |
12/1889 |
|
|
155 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
10/1929 |
12/1889 |
|
|
41 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
02/1934 |
12/1889 |
|
|
418 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
11/1929 |
12/1889 |
|
|
420 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
04/1938 |
12/1889 |
|
|
423 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
12/1933 |
12/1889 |
|
|
425 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
02/1935 |
12/1889 |
|
|
483 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
04/1934 |
12/1889 |
|
|
55 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
05/1930 |
12/1889 |
C |
|
680 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
42.89 |
12/1934 |
12/1889 |
C |
|
776 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
43.89 |
05/1935 |
12/1889 |
C |
|
778 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
44.89 |
07/1944 |
12/1889 |
C |
|
806 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
45.89 |
07/1949 |
12/1889 |
B |
|
809 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/1937 |
12/1889 |
C |
|
899 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
41.89 |
08/1949 |
12/1889 |
C |
|
962 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
46.89 |
01/1933 |
12/1889 |
C |
|
963 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
47.89 |
03/1935 |
12/1889 |
C |
|
965 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
48.89 |
08/1947 |
12/1889 |
C |
|
996 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
40.89 |
01/1944 |
02/1890 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/10/1955 |
02/1890 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
18/08/1952 |
03/1890 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1949 |
03/1890 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1949 |
03/1890 |
B |
|
287 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1937 |
03/1890 |
B |
|
959 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1934 |
04/1890 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
15/10/1951 |
04/1890 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/10/1948 |
04/1890 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/1951 |
04/1890 |
C |
|
209 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
1.90 |
10/1945 |
04/1890 |
C |
|
259 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
2.90 |
07/1935 |
05/1890 |
B |
|
|
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
28/08/1951 |
05/1890 |
E |
|
1083 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
15/04/1957 |
05/1890 |
E |
|
239 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/09/1957 |
05/1890 |
C |
|
291 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
3.90 |
08/1937 |
05/1890 |
C |
|
470 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
4.90 |
20/12/1948 |
06/1890 |
C |
|
1073 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
7.90 |
02/1935 |
06/1890 |
C |
|
1075 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
8.90 |
05/1937 |
06/1890 |
E |
|
241 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
18/08/1952 |
06/1890 |
E |
|
244 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
22/07/1954 |
06/1890 |
E |
|
254 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1947 |
06/1890 |
C |
|
294 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
19.90 |
02/10/1950 |
06/1890 |
C |
|
431 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
20.90 |
07/1943 |
06/1890 |
C |
|
432 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
21.90 |
11/1949 |
06/1890 |
E |
|
50 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/11/1960 |
06/1890 |
C |
|
510 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
5.90 |
05/1937 |
06/1890 |
C |
|
511 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
6.90 |
07/1938 |
06/1890 |
C |
|
520 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
22.90 |
12/1929 |
06/1890 |
C |
|
530 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
23.90 |
08/1938 |
06/1890 |
C |
|
534 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
24.90 |
11/1929 |
06/1890 |
C |
|
538 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
25.90 |
03/1937 |
06/1890 |
C |
|
556 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
26.90 |
07/1935 |
06/1890 |
C |
|
579 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
27.90 |
05/1937 |
06/1890 |
C |
|
582 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
28.90 |
08/1949 |
07/1890 |
E |
|
260 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/11/1954 |
07/1890 |
E |
|
296 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1933 |
07/1890 |
E |
|
338 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
14/09/1955 |
07/1890 |
E |
|
400 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/03/1960 |
09/1890 |
E |
|
103 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/01/1960 |
09/1890 |
C |
|
123 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
30.90 |
08/1949 |
09/1890 |
E |
|
176 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/06/1959 |
09/1890 |
E |
|
177 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/01/1960 |
09/1890 |
E |
|
179 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
31/08/1959 |
09/1890 |
E |
|
181 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
18/02/1957 |
09/1890 |
E |
|
248 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
14/11/1957 |
09/1890 |
C |
|
312 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
31.90 |
12/05/1958 |
09/1890 |
E |
|
54 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/1947 |
09/1890 |
C |
|
93 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
29.90 |
04/1943 |
10/1890 |
C |
|
313 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
32.90 |
14/02/1948 |
10/1890 |
C |
|
314 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
33.90 |
16/09/1958 |
10/1890 |
C |
|
315 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
34.90 |
10/1935 |
10/1890 |
C |
|
316 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
35.90 |
08/1935 |
10/1890 |
E |
|
478 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/1933 |
10/1890 |
E |
|
482 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
26/05/1952 |
10/1890 |
C |
|
668 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
38.90 |
01/1933 |
10/1890 |
E |
|
802 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
14/10/1960 |
10/1890 |
C |
|
97 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
36.90 |
06/12/1954 |
10/1890 |
C |
|
99 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
37.90 |
03/1931 |
11/1890 |
C |
|
139 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
132 |
27/11/1951 |
11/1890 |
C |
|
68 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
131 |
21/11/1949 |
12/1890 |
C |
|
104 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
2.91 |
02/1935 |
12/1890 |
C |
|
30 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
59.90 |
08/1946 |
12/1890 |
C |
|
300 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
133 |
21/06/1954 |
12/1890 |
C |
|
34 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
60.90 |
05/1937 |
12/1890 |
C |
|
48 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
1.91 |
05/1937 |
12/1890 |
C |
|
810 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
134 |
29/04/1948 |
01/1891 |
C |
|
102 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
137 |
08/1946 |
01/1891 |
C |
|
147 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
138 |
02/1950 |
01/1891 |
C |
|
26 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
136 |
05/09/1960 |
01/1891 |
C |
|
997 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
135 |
02/1950 |
02/1891 |
C |
|
148 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
139 |
09/1929 |
02/1891 |
C |
|
1547 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
141 |
05/1931 |
02/1891 |
C |
|
1548 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
142 |
02/1937 |
02/1891 |
C |
|
157 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
140 |
11/1942 |
03/1891 |
C |
|
107 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
3.91 |
09/1933 |
03/1891 |
C |
|
1549 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
143 |
12/1946 |
03/1891 |
C |
|
1550 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
144 |
28/06/1954 |
03/1891 |
C |
|
1551 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
145 |
05/1937 |
04/1891 |
C |
|
1552 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
146 |
06/1951 |
04/1891 |
C |
|
1553 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
147 |
24/08/1953 |
04/1891 |
C |
|
1554 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
148 |
04/03/1957 |
04/1891 |
C |
|
289 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
4.91 |
08/1938 |
04/1891 |
C |
|
331 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
5.91 |
10/1935 |
04/1891 |
C |
|
665 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
6.91 |
30/01/1950 |
05/1891 |
C |
|
1555 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
149 |
11/1949 |
05/1891 |
C |
|
1556 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
150 |
05/12/1951 |
05/1891 |
C |
|
1557 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
9.91 |
04/1950 |
05/1891 |
C |
|
1558 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
10.91 |
12/1936 |
05/1891 |
C |
|
1559 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
11.91 |
17/07/1950 |
05/1891 |
C |
|
1560 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
12.91 |
08/1936 |
05/1891 |
C |
|
666 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
7.91 |
02/1937 |
05/1891 |
C |
|
807 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
8.91 |
01/01/1955 |
06/1891 |
C |
|
1071 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
25.91 |
08/1933 |
06/1891 |
C |
|
1561 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
13.91 |
06/12/1954 |
06/1891 |
C |
|
1562 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
14.91 |
05/12/1955 |
06/1891 |
C |
|
1563 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
15.91 |
11/1929 |
06/1891 |
C |
|
1564 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
16.91 |
09/11/1957 |
06/1891 |
C |
|
1565 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
17.91 |
30/12/1954 |
06/1891 |
C |
|
1566 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
18.91 |
09/1949 |
06/1891 |
C |
|
424 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
20.91 |
07/1934 |
06/1891 |
C |
|
51 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
19.91 |
04/1944 |
06/1891 |
C |
|
513 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
21.91 |
02/1949 |
06/1891 |
C |
|
568 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
22.91 |
08/1938 |
06/1891 |
C |
|
569 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
23.91 |
06/1947 |
06/1891 |
C |
|
570 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
5.70 |
21/11/1955 |
07/1891 |
C |
|
1567 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
151 |
02/1950 |
07/1891 |
C |
|
1568 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
152 |
01/1937 |
07/1891 |
C |
|
1569 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
153 |
02/04/1951 |
07/1891 |
C |
|
1570 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
154 |
06/1935 |
08/1891 |
C |
|
1122 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
26.91 |
13/12/1954 |
08/1891 |
C |
|
1571 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
155 |
03/1936 |
08/1891 |
C |
|
1572 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
156 |
08/1936 |
08/1891 |
C |
|
1573 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
157 |
06/1947 |
09/1891 |
C |
|
1187 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
27.91 |
02/1936 |
09/1891 |
C |
|
1188 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
28.91 |
09/1935 |
09/1891 |
C |
|
1574 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
158 |
13/12/1954 |
09/1891 |
C |
|
1575 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
159 |
30/12/1954 |
09/1891 |
C |
|
1576 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
160 |
30/10/1961 |
10/1891 |
A |
|
1577 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
01/1932 |
11/1891 |
A |
|
1578 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
03/1937 |
11/1891 |
A |
|
1579 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
04/1937 |
11/1891 |
A |
|
1580 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
01/1933 |
11/1891 |
A |
|
1581 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
10/1935 |
11/1891 |
E |
|
161 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/05/1954 |
11/1891 |
E |
|
252 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/02/1961 |
11/1891 |
E |
|
280 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
14/11/1957 |
11/1891 |
E |
|
447 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
11/1891 |
E |
|
448 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
11/1891 |
E |
|
77 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
21/11/1955 |
12/1891 |
A |
|
1582 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
07/1937 |
12/1891 |
A |
|
1583 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
05/1936 |
12/1891 |
A |
|
1584 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
08/1928 |
12/1891 |
A |
|
1585 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
03/1930 |
12/1891 |
A |
|
1586 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
08/1932 |
12/1891 |
L |
|
544 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
18/12/1958 |
12/1891 |
L |
|
545 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
18/08/1958 |
01/1892 |
C |
|
1587 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
6.92 |
01/1931 |
01/1892 |
C |
|
1588 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
7.92 |
04/1950 |
01/1892 |
C |
|
1589 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
8.92 |
14/11/1951 |
01/1892 |
E |
|
301 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/1947 |
01/1892 |
E |
|
401 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/1936 |
01/1892 |
E |
|
449 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/02/1961 |
01/1892 |
E |
|
450 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
19/11/1956 |
01/1892 |
E |
|
451 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
01/1892 |
E |
|
452 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/11/1950 |
02/1892 |
E |
|
1085 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/05/1957 |
02/1892 |
E |
|
1103 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/11/1953 |
02/1892 |
C |
|
1590 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
9.92 |
05/12/1958 |
02/1892 |
C |
|
1591 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
10.92 |
04/10/1948 |
02/1892 |
E |
|
572 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/02/1961 |
02/1892 |
E |
|
577 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
18/06/1957 |
03/1892 |
E |
|
1140 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
26/10/1953 |
03/1892 |
E |
|
1142 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
30/07/1959 |
03/1892 |
E |
|
1153 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/10/1955 |
03/1892 |
E |
|
1157 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/10/1948 |
03/1892 |
C |
|
1592 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
1.92 |
09/1937 |
03/1892 |
C |
|
1593 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
2.92 |
12/09/1951 |
03/1892 |
C |
|
1594 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
3.92 |
05/1947 |
03/1892 |
C |
|
1595 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
4.92 |
16/05/1949 |
03/1892 |
L |
|
546 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/01/1958 |
04/1892 |
C |
|
1596 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
5.92 |
10/1949 |
04/1892 |
L |
|
547 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
14/03/1955 |
04/1892 |
L |
|
548 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
07/12/1959 |
05/1892 |
L |
|
549 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/02/1960 |
06/1892 |
A |
|
1597 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
02/1934 |
06/1892 |
A |
|
1598 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
05/1935 |
06/1892 |
A |
|
1599 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
05/1936 |
06/1892 |
A |
|
1600 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
08/1937 |
06/1892 |
A |
|
1601 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
07/1934 |
06/1892 |
A |
|
1602 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
01/1930 |
06/1892 |
L |
|
550 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1960 |
06/1892 |
L |
|
551 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/09/1957 |
06/1892 |
L |
|
552 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
26/10/1959 |
06/1892 |
L |
|
553 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
14/04/1960 |
07/1892 |
E |
|
1084 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/11/1950 |
07/1892 |
E |
|
1095 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/06/1955 |
07/1892 |
E |
|
1143 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/01/1959 |
07/1892 |
E |
|
1144 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
07/1892 |
E |
|
237 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/06/1952 |
07/1892 |
E |
|
240 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
26/11/1956 |
07/1892 |
E |
|
402 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/1933 |
08/1892 |
E |
|
1151 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
26/05/1956 |
08/1892 |
E |
|
1155 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/10/1954 |
08/1892 |
E |
|
1314 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
09/1892 |
A |
|
1603 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
11/1929 |
09/1892 |
A |
|
1604 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
11/1935 |
09/1892 |
A |
|
1605 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
10/1928 |
09/1892 |
A |
|
1606 |
2-4-2T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
02/1935 |
10/1892 |
C |
|
1607 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
29.92 |
01/1943 |
10/1892 |
C |
|
1608 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
30.92 |
04/1949 |
11/1892 |
E |
|
1196 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/09/1956 |
11/1892 |
E |
|
1197 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/11/1956 |
11/1892 |
E |
|
1198 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/02/1959 |
11/1892 |
E |
|
1199 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
19/07/1958 |
11/1892 |
C |
|
1609 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
31.92 |
18/07/1960 |
11/1892 |
C |
|
1610 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
12.92 |
21/03/1951 |
12/1892 |
C |
|
1611 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
33.92 |
11/1949 |
12/1892 |
C |
|
1612 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
34.92 |
05/1937 |
12/1892 |
C |
|
1613 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
35.92 |
08/1947 |
12/1892 |
C |
|
1614 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
36.92 |
05/1949 |
12/1892 |
C |
|
1615 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
37.92 |
26/06/1948 |
12/1892 |
C |
|
1616 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
38.92 |
10/1929 |
12/1892 |
|
|
1620 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/1934 |
01/1893 |
E |
|
137 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
27/03/1957 |
01/1893 |
E |
|
969 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/1933 |
01/1893 |
E |
|
972 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
26/05/1956 |
01/1893 |
E |
|
977 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/12/1952 |
01/1893 |
E |
|
978 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/03/1955 |
01/1893 |
E |
|
980 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
26/11/1956 |
03/1893 |
|
|
1621 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
07/1945 |
04/1893 |
|
|
1622 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/1935 |
05/1893 |
N |
|
1617 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/1950 |
05/1893 |
M |
|
1619 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1930 |
05/1893 |
3CC |
|
1619 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1930 |
05/1893 |
|
|
1623 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1932 |
06/1893 |
N |
|
1618 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/1949 |
06/1893 |
|
|
1624 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1938 |
06/1893 |
|
|
1625 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1932 |
06/1893 |
|
|
1626 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1934 |
06/1893 |
|
|
1627 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/1933 |
06/1893 |
|
|
1628 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/1927 |
06/1893 |
|
|
1629 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1945 |
06/1893 |
|
|
1630 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/1933 |
06/1893 |
|
|
1631 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
07/1934 |
06/1893 |
N |
|
1640 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1947 |
06/1893 |
N |
|
1641 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1950 |
07/1893 |
N |
|
1642 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1950 |
08/1893 |
N |
|
1643 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/1949 |
08/1893 |
N |
|
1644 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1947 |
08/1893 |
N |
|
1645 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/1946 |
09/1893 |
|
|
1632 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1937 |
09/1893 |
|
|
1633 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1934 |
09/1893 |
N |
|
1646 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/01/1951 |
09/1893 |
N |
|
1647 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/1948 |
10/1893 |
|
|
1634 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/1935 |
10/1893 |
|
|
1635 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1931 |
10/1893 |
N |
|
1648 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1949 |
11/1893 |
|
|
1636 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1938 |
11/1893 |
|
|
1637 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/1935 |
11/1893 |
N |
|
1649 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1949 |
11/1893 |
N |
|
1650 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/1950 |
12/1893 |
|
|
1638 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1937 |
12/1893 |
N |
|
1651 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1951 |
12/1893 |
N |
|
1652 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
27/06/1955 |
12/1893 |
N |
|
1653 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/1950 |
12/1893 |
N |
|
1654 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/02/1953 |
12/1893 |
N |
|
1655 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
27/06/1955 |
02/1894 |
N |
|
1705 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/07/1955 |
02/1894 |
C1 |
|
1801 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
1.94 |
08/1938 |
02/1894 |
C |
|
1801 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
1.94 |
08/1938 |
02/1894 |
C1 |
|
1802 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
2.94 |
04/1943 |
02/1894 |
C |
|
1802 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
2.94 |
04/1943 |
02/1894 |
N |
|
383 |
0-6-2T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1950 |
03/1894 |
|
|
1639 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/1934 |
03/1894 |
C1 |
|
1803 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
3.94 |
07/1931 |
03/1894 |
C |
|
1803 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
3.94 |
07/1931 |
03/1894 |
C1 |
|
1804 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
4.94 |
05/1937 |
03/1894 |
C |
|
1804 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
4.94 |
05/1937 |
04/1894 |
C1 |
|
1805 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
5.94 |
02/1950 |
04/1894 |
C |
|
1805 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
5.94 |
02/1950 |
04/1894 |
C1 |
|
1806 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
6.94 |
23/02/1959 |
04/1894 |
C |
|
1806 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
6.94 |
23/02/1959 |
04/1894 |
C1 |
|
1807 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
7.94 |
10/1935 |
04/1894 |
C |
|
1807 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
7.94 |
10/1935 |
05/1894 |
|
|
1096 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A177 |
|
16/04/1956 |
05/1894 |
C1 |
|
1808 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
8.94 |
05/1937 |
05/1894 |
C |
|
1808 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
8.94 |
05/1937 |
05/1894 |
C1 |
|
1809 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
9.94 |
03/1943 |
05/1894 |
C |
|
1809 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
9.94 |
03/1943 |
05/1894 |
C1 |
|
1810 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
10.94 |
29/11/1951 |
05/1894 |
C |
|
1810 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
10.94 |
29/11/1951 |
06/1894 |
|
|
1687 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A177 |
|
08/03/1955 |
06/1894 |
|
|
1691 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A177 |
|
09/02/1953 |
06/1894 |
|
|
1701 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A177 |
|
19/09/1955 |
06/1894 |
|
|
1702 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A177 |
|
17/11/1952 |
06/1894 |
|
|
1765 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A177 |
|
25/06/1951 |
06/1894 |
|
|
1783 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A177 |
|
27/11/1958 |
06/1894 |
|
|
1788 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A177 |
|
06/12/1954 |
06/1894 |
C1 |
|
1811 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
11.94 |
13/12/1954 |
06/1894 |
C |
|
1811 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
11.94 |
13/12/1954 |
06/1894 |
C1 |
|
1812 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
12.94 |
06/02/1950 |
06/1894 |
C |
|
1812 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
12.94 |
06/02/1950 |
06/1894 |
C1 |
|
1813 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
13.94 |
08/1933 |
06/1894 |
C |
|
1813 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
13.94 |
08/1933 |
06/1894 |
C1 |
|
1814 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
14.94 |
12/1949 |
06/1894 |
C |
|
1814 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
14.94 |
12/1949 |
08/1894 |
|
|
1769 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A177 |
|
17/12/1958 |
09/1894 |
|
|
1791 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A177 |
|
15/03/1955 |
11/1894 |
E |
|
1666 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1933 |
11/1894 |
E |
|
1735 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
30/08/1951 |
11/1894 |
E |
|
1796 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
13/06/1955 |
11/1894 |
C1 |
|
1815 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
15.94 |
01/1935 |
11/1894 |
C |
|
1815 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
15.94 |
01/1935 |
11/1894 |
C1 |
|
1816 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
16.94 |
11/1942 |
11/1894 |
C |
|
1816 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
16.94 |
11/1942 |
12/1894 |
E |
|
1797 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/11/1954 |
12/1894 |
C1 |
|
1817 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
17.94 |
04/1943 |
12/1894 |
C |
|
1817 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
17.94 |
04/1943 |
12/1894 |
C1 |
|
1818 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
18.94 |
08/1938 |
12/1894 |
C |
|
1818 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
18.94 |
08/1938 |
12/1894 |
C1 |
|
1819 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
19.94 |
29/08/1951 |
12/1894 |
C |
|
1819 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
19.94 |
29/08/1951 |
12/1894 |
|
|
1821 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
04/10/1950 |
12/1894 |
|
|
1822 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
13/12/1951 |
12/1894 |
|
|
1823 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
09/05/1949 |
12/1894 |
|
|
1824 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1933 |
12/1894 |
|
|
1825 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
02/01/1950 |
12/1894 |
E |
|
1831 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
24/11/1958 |
12/1894 |
E |
|
1832 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
19/07/1958 |
12/1894 |
E |
|
1833 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/06/1955 |
12/1894 |
E |
|
1834 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
19/05/1958 |
12/1894 |
E |
|
1835 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
12/1894 |
E |
|
1836 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
14/04/1960 |
02/1895 |
C1 |
|
1820 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
20.94 |
02/1950 |
02/1895 |
C |
|
1820 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
20.94 |
02/1950 |
02/1895 |
|
|
1826 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
27/12/1950 |
03/1895 |
|
|
1827 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
06/12/1947 |
03/1895 |
|
|
1837 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A185 |
|
16/09/1957 |
03/1895 |
|
|
1838 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A185 |
|
26/03/1956 |
04/1895 |
|
|
1772 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A185 |
|
10/11/1952 |
04/1895 |
|
|
1828 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1933 |
04/1895 |
|
|
1829 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
28/02/1949 |
04/1895 |
|
|
1830 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
27/12/1948 |
04/1895 |
|
|
1839 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A185 |
|
31/10/1958 |
04/1895 |
|
|
1840 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A185 |
|
03/12/1957 |
06/1895 |
|
|
1169 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A185 |
|
02/05/1951 |
06/1895 |
|
|
1703 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A185 |
|
08/04/1957 |
06/1895 |
|
|
1730 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A185 |
|
12/04/1954 |
06/1895 |
|
|
1793 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A185 |
|
28/10/1957 |
06/1895 |
|
|
1795 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A185 |
|
17/12/1957 |
06/1895 |
|
|
1841 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1938 |
06/1895 |
|
|
1842 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1938 |
08/1895 |
E |
|
1134 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1950 |
08/1895 |
|
|
1843 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
16/08/1949 |
08/1895 |
|
|
1844 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
05/10/1949 |
09/1895 |
E |
|
1758 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/1933 |
09/1895 |
E |
|
1789 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1951 |
09/1895 |
|
|
1845 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
14/06/1947 |
09/1895 |
|
|
1846 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1942 |
09/1895 |
|
|
1847 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
02/10/1950 |
10/1895 |
E |
|
1688 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/02/1959 |
10/1895 |
E |
|
1689 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/09/1956 |
10/1895 |
E |
|
1690 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
14/04/1960 |
10/1895 |
|
|
1848 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
06/1943 |
10/1895 |
|
|
1849 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/1935 |
10/1895 |
|
|
1850 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
14/02/1948 |
10/1895 |
E |
|
1861 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/1946 |
10/1895 |
E |
|
1862 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
11/1895 |
E |
|
1863 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
11/1895 |
E |
|
1864 |
0-6-0T |
T. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
14/10/1960 |
12/1895 |
|
|
1851 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/1946 |
12/1895 |
|
|
1852 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
27/04/1951 |
12/1895 |
|
|
1853 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
21/11/1951 |
01/1896 |
|
|
1854 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1933 |
01/1896 |
|
|
1855 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
07/1943 |
01/1896 |
|
|
1856 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1933 |
02/1896 |
|
|
1316 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A201 |
|
24/11/1952 |
02/1896 |
|
|
1778 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A201 |
|
11/12/1958 |
02/1896 |
|
|
1857 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1933 |
02/1896 |
|
|
1858 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
29/12/1951 |
02/1896 |
|
|
1859 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
27/12/1947 |
02/1896 |
|
|
1865 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A201 |
|
04/12/1958 |
02/1896 |
|
|
1866 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A201 |
|
28/10/1958 |
03/1896 |
|
|
1748 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A201 |
|
06/12/1955 |
03/1896 |
|
|
1751 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A201 |
|
14/06/1954 |
03/1896 |
|
|
1762 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A201 |
|
27/04/1955 |
03/1896 |
|
|
1780 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A201 |
|
01/10/1956 |
03/1896 |
|
|
1860 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
21/11/1951 |
03/1896 |
|
|
1867 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A201 |
|
11/07/1951 |
03/1896 |
|
|
1868 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A201 |
|
20/02/1958 |
05/1896 |
Q1 |
|
1869 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1930 |
06/1896 |
|
|
1713 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
07/02/1955 |
06/1896 |
|
|
1779 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
08/11/1954 |
06/1896 |
Q1 |
|
1870 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1930 |
06/1896 |
|
|
1871 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/1944 |
06/1896 |
|
|
1872 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1933 |
06/1896 |
|
|
1873 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
07/02/1948 |
06/1896 |
|
|
1874 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1938 |
06/1896 |
|
|
529 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
13/01/1958 |
08/1896 |
|
|
1737 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
05/1957 |
08/1896 |
|
|
1786 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
16/12/1958 |
09/1896 |
|
|
1875 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1931 |
09/1896 |
|
|
1876 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/1943 |
09/1896 |
|
|
394 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
30/10/1952 |
09/1896 |
|
|
505 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
10/11/1952 |
10/1896 |
|
|
1877 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1938 |
10/1896 |
|
|
405 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
22/10/1957 |
11/1896 |
|
|
1878 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/1934 |
11/1896 |
|
|
1879 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1939 |
11/1896 |
|
|
1881 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
30/07/1957 |
11/1896 |
|
|
1882 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
11/1956 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1740 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
22/12/1958 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1764 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
15/03/1955 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1880 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/1933 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1883 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
11/12/1958 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1884 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
05/1957 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1885 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
09/08/1954 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1886 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
08/10/1956 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1887 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
06/1950 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1888 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
08/10/1956 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1889 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
31/03/1953 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1890 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A209 |
|
28/06/1954 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1891 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
19/07/1947 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1892 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
04/09/1950 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1893 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1938 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1894 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1933 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1895 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
28/02/1951 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1896 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/1935 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1897 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
28/05/1951 |
12/1896 |
|
|
1898 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
07/1934 |
03/1897 |
H2 |
|
1787 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1936 |
03/1897 |
|
|
1899 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
13/09/1950 |
03/1897 |
|
|
1900 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
15/05/1948 |
03/1897 |
H2 |
|
407 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
06/1937 |
05/1897 |
|
|
1901 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
06/1945 |
05/1897 |
|
|
1904 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1938 |
05/1897 |
|
|
1911 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
03/12/1956 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1902 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
07/02/1948 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1903 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/1936 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1905 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/1943 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1906 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1938 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1907 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1938 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1908 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1938 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1909 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1937 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1910 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1938 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1912 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
27/03/1956 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1913 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
16/02/1953 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1914 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
12/08/1952 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1915 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
04/04/1955 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1916 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
15/01/1957 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1917 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
08/03/1954 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1918 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
08/03/1955 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1919 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
15/09/1958 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1920 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
04/12/1956 |
06/1897 |
|
|
1921 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/1943 |
09/1897 |
|
|
1692 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
06/12/1955 |
09/1897 |
|
|
1752 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
08/05/1950 |
09/1897 |
|
|
1922 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1932 |
09/1897 |
|
|
1923 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1938 |
10/1897 |
|
|
1693 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
08/03/1955 |
10/1897 |
|
|
1739 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
10/04/1956 |
10/1897 |
|
|
1745 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
23/02/1953 |
10/1897 |
|
|
1924 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1937 |
10/1897 |
|
|
1925 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1938 |
10/1897 |
|
|
1926 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1931 |
11/1897 |
|
|
1755 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
08/12/1958 |
11/1897 |
|
|
1759 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
06/1948 |
11/1897 |
|
|
1927 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1932 |
11/1897 |
|
|
1928 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1932 |
11/1897 |
|
|
1929 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1938 |
11/1897 |
|
|
1930 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1933 |
11/1897 |
|
|
526 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
22/02/1955 |
12/1897 |
|
|
1754 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
23/05/1955 |
12/1897 |
|
|
1775 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A218 |
|
22/11/1955 |
12/1897 |
|
|
1931 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
29/11/1948 |
12/1897 |
|
|
1932 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
10/12/1950 |
12/1897 |
|
|
1933 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1933 |
12/1897 |
|
|
1934 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
25/11/1950 |
12/1897 |
|
|
1935 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
02/05/1949 |
12/1897 |
|
|
1936 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1943 |
12/1897 |
|
|
1937 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
20/11/1950 |
12/1897 |
|
|
1938 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1938 |
12/1897 |
|
|
1939 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1938 |
12/1897 |
|
|
1940 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1933 |
12/1897 |
|
|
1941 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
21/11/1949 |
12/1897 |
|
|
1942 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1934 |
12/1897 |
|
|
1943 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/1933 |
04/1898 |
|
|
1944 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1938 |
04/1898 |
|
|
1945 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
11/04/1949 |
05/1898 |
|
|
1946 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
26/04/1950 |
05/1898 |
|
|
1947 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1944 |
05/1898 |
|
|
1948 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
12/12/1950 |
05/1898 |
P1 |
|
1961 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
23/04/1962 |
05/1898 |
P1 |
|
1962 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
17/04/1950 |
06/1898 |
|
|
1949 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1944 |
06/1898 |
|
|
1950 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/1945 |
06/1898 |
|
|
1951 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
07/02/1948 |
06/1898 |
|
|
1952 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1933 |
06/1898 |
|
|
1953 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1939 |
06/1898 |
|
|
1954 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
09/04/1951 |
06/1898 |
|
|
1955 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
27/09/1948 |
06/1898 |
|
|
1956 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
28/11/1950 |
06/1898 |
|
|
1957 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1943 |
06/1898 |
P1 |
|
1963 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
26/05/1956 |
06/1898 |
P1 |
|
1964 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
30/09/1958 |
06/1898 |
P1 |
|
1965 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1933 |
06/1898 |
P1 |
|
1966 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1942 |
06/1898 |
P1 |
|
1967 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/1949 |
06/1898 |
P1 |
|
1968 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1937 |
06/1898 |
P1 |
|
1969 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
30/09/1957 |
06/1898 |
P1 |
|
1970 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1950 |
08/1898 |
P1 |
|
1971 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/1937 |
09/1898 |
|
|
1958 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/1943 |
09/1898 |
P1 |
|
1972 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
06/1946 |
09/1898 |
P1 |
|
1973 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
30/05/1951 |
09/1898 |
P1 |
|
1974 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/1937 |
09/1898 |
P1 |
|
1975 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1937 |
10/1898 |
|
|
1959 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1938 |
10/1898 |
|
|
1960 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
29/08/1951 |
10/1898 |
P1 |
|
1976 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/05/1958 |
10/1898 |
P1 |
|
1977 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1933 |
10/1898 |
P1 |
|
1978 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1938 |
11/1898 |
P1 |
|
1979 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/12/1958 |
11/1898 |
P1 |
|
1980 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1933 |
11/1898 |
P1 |
|
1981 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
14/08/1959 |
11/1898 |
P1 |
|
1982 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
26/11/1958 |
11/1898 |
P1 |
|
1983 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1950 |
12/1898 |
E1 |
|
1715 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/1960 |
12/1898 |
E1 |
|
1718 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/10/1961 |
12/1898 |
E1 |
|
1721 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/05/1961 |
12/1898 |
E1 |
|
1722 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/10/1961 |
12/1898 |
E1 |
|
1732 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
28/09/1961 |
12/1898 |
E1 |
|
1744 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/09/1960 |
12/1898 |
E1 |
|
1746 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/10/1961 |
12/1898 |
E1 |
|
1761 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/02/1961 |
12/1898 |
E1 |
|
1770 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
27/06/1960 |
12/1898 |
P1 |
|
1984 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1933 |
12/1898 |
P1 |
|
1985 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
21/02/1951 |
12/1898 |
P1 |
|
1986 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/01/1953 |
12/1898 |
P1 |
|
1987 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/10/1954 |
12/1898 |
P1 |
|
1988 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
06/06/1960 |
12/1898 |
P1 |
|
1989 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/04/1962 |
12/1898 |
P1 |
|
1990 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
24/09/1952 |
12/1898 |
P1 |
|
1991 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1949 |
12/1898 |
P1 |
|
1992 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/07/1960 |
12/1898 |
E1 |
|
462 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/01/1960 |
03/1899 |
E1 |
|
1720 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/10/1961 |
03/1899 |
E1 |
|
1728 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
22/11/1960 |
03/1899 |
E1 |
|
1733 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/12/1959 |
03/1899 |
E1 |
|
1734 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/03/1961 |
03/1899 |
E1 |
|
1736 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
15/03/1961 |
03/1899 |
E1 |
|
1741 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/10/1960 |
03/1899 |
P1 |
|
1993 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
21/09/1954 |
03/1899 |
P1 |
|
1994 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/1949 |
03/1899 |
P1 |
|
1995 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/1950 |
03/1899 |
P1 |
|
1996 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1933 |
04/1899 |
E1 |
|
1742 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
14/08/1961 |
04/1899 |
E1 |
|
1747 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
15/09/1961 |
04/1899 |
E1 |
|
1749 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/10/1961 |
04/1899 |
E1 |
|
1763 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/10/1961 |
04/1899 |
P1 |
|
1997 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1933 |
04/1899 |
P1 |
|
1998 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1938 |
04/1899 |
P1 |
|
1999 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1933 |
06/1899 |
P1 |
|
1724 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1938 |
06/1899 |
P1 |
|
1725 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/05/1951 |
06/1899 |
P1 |
|
1726 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/06/1958 |
06/1899 |
P1 |
|
1727 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1938 |
06/1899 |
P1 |
|
2000 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/06/1962 |
06/1899 |
S |
|
2001 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
9.99 |
10/06/1931 |
06/1899 |
S |
|
2002 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
10.99 |
07/07/1931 |
06/1899 |
P1 |
|
536 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
27/09/1954 |
08/1899 |
|
|
2011 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
27/02/1951 |
08/1899 |
P1 |
|
2031 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1933 |
09/1899 |
S |
|
2003 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
11.99 |
07/07/1931 |
09/1899 |
|
|
2012 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
07/03/1951 |
09/1899 |
|
|
2013 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
13/03/1951 |
09/1899 |
P1 |
|
2032 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/07/1948 |
09/1899 |
P1 |
|
2033 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/03/1959 |
09/1899 |
P1 |
|
2034 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
18/01/1954 |
10/1899 |
|
|
2014 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/10/1956 |
10/1899 |
P1 |
|
2035 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1937 |
10/1899 |
P1 |
|
2036 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1933 |
10/1899 |
P1 |
|
2037 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
14/10/1958 |
10/1899 |
P1 |
|
2038 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/1947 |
10/1899 |
P1 |
|
2039 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/1933 |
11/1899 |
|
|
2015 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
28/03/1951 |
11/1899 |
|
|
2016 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/10/1956 |
11/1899 |
|
|
2017 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/1944 |
11/1899 |
P1 |
|
2040 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
31/05/1951 |
11/1899 |
P1 |
|
2041 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/09/1957 |
11/1899 |
P1 |
|
2042 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
30/04/1950 |
11/1899 |
P1 |
|
2043 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1946 |
11/1899 |
P1 |
|
2044 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/06/1958 |
12/1899 |
S |
|
2004 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
22.99 |
29/08/1928 |
12/1899 |
S |
|
2005 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
23.99 |
21/11/1928 |
12/1899 |
S |
|
2006 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
24.99 |
10/06/1931 |
12/1899 |
|
|
2018 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
15/11/1954 |
12/1899 |
|
|
2019 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
27/02/1951 |
12/1899 |
|
|
2020 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/02/1956 |
12/1899 |
P1 |
|
2045 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/04/1949 |
12/1899 |
P1 |
|
2046 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
15/09/1959 |
12/1899 |
P1 |
|
2047 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/11/1954 |
12/1899 |
P1 |
|
2048 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
22/08/1959 |
12/1899 |
P1 |
|
25 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1954 |
12/1899 |
P1 |
|
463 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
31/05/1954 |
01/1900 |
P1 |
|
2061 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
18/11/1954 |
02/1900 |
P1 |
|
2062 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1933 |
02/1900 |
|
|
2104 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
20/03/1951 |
03/1900 |
S |
|
2007 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
28.99 |
24/10/1928 |
03/1900 |
P1 |
|
2049 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1934 |
03/1900 |
P1 |
|
2050 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/1938 |
03/1900 |
P1 |
|
2051 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/06/1948 |
03/1900 |
P1 |
|
2063 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/1935 |
03/1900 |
P1 |
|
2064 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/1934 |
03/1900 |
P1 |
|
2065 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
30/10/1961 |
03/1900 |
P1 |
|
2066 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/1937 |
03/1900 |
P1 |
|
2067 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
22/03/1954 |
04/1900 |
P1 |
|
2052 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/1933 |
04/1900 |
P1 |
|
2053 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
27/10/1954 |
04/1900 |
P1 |
|
2054 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1937 |
04/1900 |
P1 |
|
2068 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/04/1962 |
04/1900 |
P1 |
|
2069 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
22/11/1954 |
04/1900 |
P1 |
|
2070 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/06/1962 |
05/1900 |
S |
|
2008 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
1.00 |
31/12/1929 |
05/1900 |
P1 |
|
2055 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/12/1959 |
05/1900 |
P1 |
|
2056 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1950 |
05/1900 |
P1 |
|
2057 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
28/05/1956 |
05/1900 |
P1 |
|
2071 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/12/1958 |
05/1900 |
P1 |
|
2072 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
26/11/1958 |
05/1900 |
P1 |
|
2073 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
15/09/1959 |
05/1900 |
P1 |
|
2074 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
06/1900 |
S |
|
2009 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
2.00 |
07/07/1931 |
06/1900 |
S |
|
2010 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
3.00 |
07/07/1931 |
06/1900 |
P1 |
|
2058 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/1945 |
06/1900 |
P1 |
|
2059 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/11/1954 |
06/1900 |
P1 |
|
2060 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/1944 |
06/1900 |
P1 |
|
2075 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/08/1958 |
06/1900 |
P1 |
|
2076 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
22/08/1959 |
06/1900 |
P1 |
|
2077 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1934 |
06/1900 |
P1 |
|
2078 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/1947 |
06/1900 |
P1 |
|
2079 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/10/1959 |
06/1900 |
P1 |
|
2080 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/1949 |
06/1900 |
P1 |
|
257 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
15/08/1960 |
06/1900 |
P1 |
|
29 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
22/08/1960 |
06/1900 |
P1 |
|
459 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/01/1961 |
08/1900 |
|
|
2021 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/1947 |
08/1900 |
|
|
2022 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
23/11/1954 |
09/1900 |
|
|
2023 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
29/06/1954 |
09/1900 |
|
|
2024 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/04/1951 |
09/1900 |
|
|
2025 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/04/1951 |
10/1900 |
|
|
2026 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
14/11/1955 |
10/1900 |
|
|
2027 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/1946 |
10/1900 |
|
|
2081 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
06/09/1955 |
11/1900 |
|
|
2028 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/01/1951 |
11/1900 |
|
|
2082 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
02/12/1958 |
11/1900 |
|
|
2083 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
09/04/1956 |
11/1900 |
|
|
2084 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
21/08/1951 |
11/1900 |
|
|
2085 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
12/12/1955 |
12/1900 |
|
|
2029 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
19/10/1954 |
12/1900 |
|
|
2030 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
26/10/1955 |
12/1900 |
|
|
2086 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
11/12/1958 |
12/1900 |
|
|
2087 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
13/12/1955 |
12/1900 |
|
|
2088 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
28/08/1951 |
12/1900 |
|
|
2089 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
05/03/1957 |
12/1900 |
|
|
2090 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
03/12/1957 |
12/1900 |
|
|
2091 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
20/11/1958 |
12/1900 |
|
|
2092 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
07/01/1957 |
12/1900 |
|
|
2093 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
11/1956 |
12/1900 |
|
|
2094 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
08/12/1958 |
12/1900 |
|
|
2095 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
11/11/1957 |
12/1900 |
|
|
2101 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
23/10/1956 |
12/1900 |
|
|
2102 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/1951 |
12/1900 |
|
|
2103 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
11/04/1951 |
12/1900 |
|
|
2111 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
33.00 |
01/07/1929 |
03/1901 |
|
|
2096 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
10/10/1958 |
03/1901 |
|
|
2097 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
08/10/1957 |
03/1901 |
|
|
2105 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1947 |
03/1901 |
|
|
2106 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/04/1951 |
03/1901 |
|
|
2107 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
13/03/1951 |
04/1901 |
|
|
2098 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
04/02/1955 |
04/1901 |
|
|
2099 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
21/11/1955 |
04/1901 |
|
|
2100 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A281 |
|
24/11/1958 |
04/1901 |
|
|
2108 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
17/01/1948 |
04/1901 |
|
|
2109 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
06/1944 |
05/1901 |
|
|
2110 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
06/03/1951 |
06/1901 |
|
|
1319 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
10/08/1953 |
06/1901 |
|
|
1334 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
22/03/1955 |
06/1901 |
|
|
1695 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
11/03/1957 |
06/1901 |
|
|
2112 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
6.01 |
14/04/1931 |
06/1901 |
|
|
2113 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
7.01 |
17/10/1930 |
06/1901 |
|
|
2114 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
8.01 |
17/10/1930 |
06/1901 |
|
|
381 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
08/12/1952 |
06/1901 |
|
|
439 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
23/02/1953 |
06/1901 |
|
|
468 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
12/04/1956 |
06/1901 |
|
|
540 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
08/10/1956 |
06/1901 |
|
|
580 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
26/03/1956 |
08/1901 |
|
|
2115 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
9.01 |
19/06/1929 |
08/1901 |
T |
|
2116 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
10 01 |
26/06/1948 |
08/1901 |
T1 |
|
2116 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
10 01 |
26/06/1948 |
09/1901 |
|
|
149 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
27/08/1957 |
09/1901 |
T |
|
2117 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
11 01 |
20/12/1950 |
09/1901 |
T1 |
|
2117 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
11 01 |
20/12/1950 |
09/1901 |
|
|
380 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
18/03/1957 |
09/1901 |
|
|
387 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
28/04/1958 |
10/1901 |
T |
|
2118 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
12 01 |
07/02/1948 |
10/1901 |
T1 |
|
2118 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
12 01 |
07/02/1948 |
10/1901 |
T |
|
2119 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
13 01 |
22/11/1948 |
10/1901 |
T1 |
|
2119 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
13 01 |
22/11/1948 |
10/1901 |
T |
|
2120 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
14 01 |
11/06/1948 |
10/1901 |
T1 |
|
2120 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
14 01 |
11/06/1948 |
10/1901 |
T |
|
2121 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
15 01 |
03/11/1949 |
10/1901 |
T1 |
|
2121 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
15 01 |
03/11/1949 |
10/1901 |
|
|
384 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
06/11/1958 |
10/1901 |
|
|
408 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
02/12/1958 |
10/1901 |
|
|
413 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
04/11/1957 |
10/1901 |
|
|
427 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
27/02/1956 |
11/1901 |
T |
|
2122 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
16 01 |
12/06/1950 |
11/1901 |
T1 |
|
2122 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
16 01 |
12/06/1950 |
11/1901 |
|
|
433 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
13/12/1955 |
11/1901 |
|
|
435 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
11/02/1957 |
11/1901 |
|
|
436 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
26/03/1956 |
11/1901 |
|
|
437 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
12/01/1953 |
12/1901 |
T |
|
2123 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
17 01 |
27/11/1950 |
12/1901 |
T1 |
|
2123 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
17 01 |
27/11/1950 |
12/1901 |
T |
|
2124 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
18 01 |
26/04/1947 |
12/1901 |
T1 |
|
2124 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
18 01 |
26/04/1947 |
12/1901 |
T |
|
2125 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
19 01 |
09/05/1951 |
12/1901 |
T1 |
|
2125 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A137 |
19 01 |
09/05/1951 |
12/1901 |
|
|
441 |
0-4-4T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
A--- |
|
28/04/1954 |
03/1902 |
T |
|
1002 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
2 02 |
22/08/1950 |
03/1902 |
T1 |
|
1002 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
2 02 |
22/08/1950 |
03/1902 |
T |
|
130 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
20 01 |
21/06/1950 |
03/1902 |
T1 |
|
130 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
20 01 |
21/06/1950 |
03/1902 |
T |
|
1320 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
3 02 |
01/11/1948 |
03/1902 |
T1 |
|
1320 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
3 02 |
01/11/1948 |
03/1902 |
T |
|
527 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
1 02 |
31/10/1950 |
03/1902 |
T1 |
|
527 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
1 02 |
31/10/1950 |
04/1902 |
T |
|
1700 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
4 02 |
26/06/1948 |
04/1902 |
T1 |
|
1700 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
4 02 |
26/06/1948 |
04/1902 |
T |
|
1704 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
5 02 |
26/04/1947 |
04/1902 |
T1 |
|
1704 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
5 02 |
26/04/1947 |
05/1902 |
T |
|
1708 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
6 02 |
22/11/1947 |
05/1902 |
T1 |
|
1708 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
6 02 |
22/11/1947 |
05/1902 |
T |
|
1709 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
7 02 |
06/06/1951 |
05/1902 |
T1 |
|
1709 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
7 02 |
06/06/1951 |
05/1902 |
P1 |
|
2126 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/1949 |
05/1902 |
P1 |
|
2127 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1933 |
06/1902 |
T |
|
1717 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
8 02 |
07/02/1948 |
06/1902 |
T1 |
|
1717 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
8 02 |
07/02/1948 |
06/1902 |
T |
|
1729 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
9 02 |
19/07/1947 |
06/1902 |
T1 |
|
1729 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
A139 |
9 02 |
19/07/1947 |
06/1902 |
P1 |
|
2128 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/05/1954 |
06/1902 |
P1 |
|
2129 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/1937 |
06/1902 |
P1 |
|
2130 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
22/10/1958 |
06/1902 |
P1 |
|
2131 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
22/05/1951 |
06/1902 |
P1 |
|
2132 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1937 |
08/1902 |
P1 |
|
2133 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1946 |
08/1902 |
P1 |
|
2134 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
09/04/1962 |
09/1902 |
P1 |
|
2135 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/1949 |
09/1902 |
P1 |
|
2136 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/1946 |
10/1902 |
U |
|
1112 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
24/09/1957 |
10/1902 |
U |
|
1138 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/11/1957 |
10/1902 |
U |
|
1321 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
19/11/1956 |
10/1902 |
U |
|
1667 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
26/11/1956 |
10/1902 |
P1 |
|
2137 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1938 |
10/1902 |
P1 |
|
2138 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
14/03/1955 |
10/1902 |
P1 |
|
2139 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
21/11/1949 |
11/1902 |
U |
|
1683 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/04/1959 |
11/1902 |
U |
|
1697 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/12/1957 |
11/1902 |
U |
|
1774 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/07/1957 |
11/1902 |
P1 |
|
2140 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1950 |
11/1902 |
P1 |
|
2141 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
18/06/1962 |
11/1902 |
P1 |
|
2142 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
16/01/1961 |
12/1902 |
U |
|
1109 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/04/1962 |
12/1902 |
U |
|
1132 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/02/1958 |
12/1902 |
U |
|
1148 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/04/1962 |
12/1902 |
U |
|
1317 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/02/1959 |
12/1902 |
T |
|
1682 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
30 02 |
10/08/1951 |
12/1902 |
T1 |
|
1682 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
30 02 |
10/08/1951 |
12/1902 |
T |
|
1684 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
31 02 |
22/11/1950 |
12/1902 |
T1 |
|
1684 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
31 02 |
22/11/1950 |
12/1902 |
T |
|
1685 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
32 02 |
03/07/1950 |
12/1902 |
T1 |
|
1685 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
32 02 |
03/07/1950 |
12/1902 |
U |
|
1706 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/1948 |
12/1902 |
U |
|
1710 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
17/03/1958 |
12/1902 |
P1 |
|
1714 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/1937 |
12/1902 |
P1 |
|
1723 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
23/04/1962 |
12/1902 |
P1 |
|
1743 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/1946 |
12/1902 |
U |
|
429 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
27/12/1957 |
12/1902 |
U |
|
89 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/10/1955 |
02/1903 |
T |
|
1694 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
1 03 |
28/03/1949 |
02/1903 |
T1 |
|
1694 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
1 03 |
28/03/1949 |
03/1903 |
T |
|
1696 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
2 03 |
20/02/1950 |
03/1903 |
T1 |
|
1696 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
2 03 |
20/02/1950 |
03/1903 |
U |
|
1699 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/06/1961 |
03/1903 |
U |
|
1707 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
17/03/1958 |
03/1903 |
U |
|
1711 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
27/12/1957 |
03/1903 |
T |
|
83 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
3 03 |
18/09/1950 |
03/1903 |
T1 |
|
83 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
3 03 |
18/09/1950 |
04/1903 |
U |
|
1716 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/04/1962 |
04/1903 |
U |
|
1785 |
0-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
30/07/1957 |
04/1903 |
T |
|
410 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
4/03 |
02/05/1949 |
04/1903 |
T1 |
|
410 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
4/03 |
02/05/1949 |
04/1903 |
T |
|
474 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
5 03 |
30/08/1950 |
04/1903 |
T1 |
|
474 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
5 03 |
30/08/1950 |
05/1903 |
T |
|
1186 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
6 03 |
14/02/1948 |
05/1903 |
T1 |
|
1186 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
6 03 |
14/02/1948 |
06/1903 |
T |
|
1009 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
9 03 |
11/12/1950 |
06/1903 |
T1 |
|
1009 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
9 03 |
11/12/1950 |
06/1903 |
T |
|
162 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
11 03 |
18/04/1949 |
06/1903 |
T1 |
|
162 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E105 |
11 03 |
18/04/1949 |
06/1903 |
T |
|
1731 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
8 03 |
19/12/1950 |
06/1903 |
T1 |
|
1731 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
8 03 |
19/12/1950 |
06/1903 |
T |
|
1757 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
7 03 |
13/06/1951 |
06/1903 |
T1 |
|
1757 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
7 03 |
13/06/1951 |
06/1903 |
T |
|
650 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
12 03 |
25/10/1950 |
06/1903 |
T1 |
|
650 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
12 03 |
25/10/1950 |
06/1903 |
T |
|
651 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
10 03 |
12/06/1950 |
06/1903 |
T1 |
|
651 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
10 03 |
12/06/1950 |
09/1903 |
T |
|
715 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
15 03 |
27/09/1950 |
09/1903 |
T1 |
|
715 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
15 03 |
27/09/1950 |
09/1903 |
T |
|
785 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
16 03 |
11/04/1949 |
09/1903 |
T1 |
|
785 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
16 03 |
11/04/1949 |
10/1903 |
T |
|
1128 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
18 03 |
02/08/1947 |
10/1903 |
T1 |
|
1128 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
18 03 |
02/08/1947 |
10/1903 |
T |
|
792 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
17/O3 |
29/11/1950 |
10/1903 |
T1 |
|
792 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
17/O3 |
29/11/1950 |
11/1903 |
T |
|
1218 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
19 03 |
21/08/1950 |
11/1903 |
T1 |
|
1218 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E107 |
19 03 |
21/08/1950 |
11/1903 |
V |
|
532 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/1943 |
12/1903 |
T |
|
1110 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
6 |
25/07/1950 |
12/1903 |
T1 |
|
1110 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
6 |
25/07/1950 |
12/1903 |
T |
|
1669 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
1 |
12/02/1949 |
12/1903 |
T1 |
|
1669 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
1 |
12/02/1949 |
12/1903 |
V |
|
649 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1943 |
12/1903 |
V |
|
784 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
15/11/1947 |
02/1904 |
T |
|
430 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
3 |
09/01/1950 |
02/1904 |
T1 |
|
430 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
3 |
09/01/1950 |
03/1904 |
T |
|
1111 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
7 |
22/08/1949 |
03/1904 |
T1 |
|
1111 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
7 |
22/08/1949 |
03/1904 |
T |
|
411 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
2 |
08/11/1948 |
03/1904 |
T1 |
|
411 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
2 |
08/11/1948 |
03/1904 |
T |
|
443 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
4 |
03/11/1949 |
03/1904 |
T1 |
|
443 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
4 |
03/11/1949 |
03/1904 |
T |
|
444 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
5 |
22/11/1948 |
03/1904 |
T1 |
|
444 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
5 |
22/11/1948 |
04/1904 |
T |
|
1149 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
8 |
22/02/1949 |
04/1904 |
T1 |
|
1149 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
8 |
22/02/1949 |
04/1904 |
T |
|
1150 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
9 |
27/02/1948 |
04/1904 |
T1 |
|
1150 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
9 |
27/02/1948 |
05/1904 |
T |
|
1173 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
10 |
12/02/1949 |
05/1904 |
T1 |
|
1173 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
E109 |
10 |
12/02/1949 |
06/1904 |
|
|
1159 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/02/1959 |
06/1904 |
|
|
1172 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/02/1959 |
06/1904 |
|
|
132 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
21/01/1959 |
06/1904 |
V |
|
1680 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
15/11/1947 |
06/1904 |
|
|
243 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
18/06/1962 |
06/1904 |
V |
|
295 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/1944 |
06/1904 |
|
|
342 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/11/1959 |
06/1904 |
|
|
434 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/01/1959 |
06/1904 |
|
|
442 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
14/10/1958 |
06/1904 |
|
|
543 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
18/06/1962 |
06/1904 |
|
|
554 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/02/1961 |
06/1904 |
|
|
555 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/10/1959 |
06/1904 |
V |
|
742 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
06/03/1948 |
08/1904 |
V |
|
1753 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
07/1946 |
09/1904 |
|
|
1043 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
28/01/1959 |
10/1904 |
|
|
1057 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/10/1961 |
10/1904 |
|
|
1098 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
21/02/1959 |
10/1904 |
|
|
1130 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/06/1962 |
10/1904 |
|
|
1369 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
21/02/1959 |
10/1904 |
V |
|
1776 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/1944 |
10/1904 |
V |
|
1792 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/03/1948 |
10/1904 |
V |
|
1794 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1944 |
11/1904 |
|
|
1671 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/12/1961 |
11/1904 |
|
|
1674 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
19/07/1958 |
11/1904 |
|
|
1676 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/04/1962 |
12/1904 |
|
|
1678 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
15/01/1959 |
12/1904 |
|
|
1773 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/03/1959 |
04/1905 |
|
|
1360 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
18/02/1959 |
04/1905 |
|
|
1670 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/01/1962 |
05/1905 |
|
|
1146 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/06/1962 |
05/1905 |
|
|
1673 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/06/1962 |
05/1905 |
|
|
1698 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
16/04/1962 |
05/1905 |
|
|
816 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
19/07/1958 |
05/1905 |
|
|
835 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
15/05/1961 |
05/1905 |
|
|
881 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
19/07/1958 |
06/1905 |
|
|
1139 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
03/01/1961 |
06/1905 |
|
|
1194 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/03/1959 |
06/1905 |
|
|
1200 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
19/07/1958 |
06/1905 |
|
|
1202 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
18/02/1959 |
06/1905 |
|
|
1208 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
19/07/1958 |
06/1905 |
|
|
1370 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/06/1962 |
06/1905 |
|
|
1390 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
29/01/1962 |
06/1905 |
|
|
1781 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/10/1961 |
06/1905 |
|
|
233 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
28/01/1959 |
06/1905 |
|
|
379 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
24/07/1961 |
06/1905 |
|
|
406 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
18/06/1962 |
06/1905 |
|
|
67 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
22/01/1959 |
09/1905 |
|
|
1366 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
15/01/1959 |
09/1905 |
|
|
412 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
25/02/1959 |
10/1905 |
|
|
438 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
18/06/1962 |
10/1905 |
|
|
517 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
18/06/1962 |
10/1905 |
|
|
525 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
31/07/1961 |
11/1905 |
|
|
765 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
25/02/1959 |
11/1905 |
|
|
818 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
18/06/1962 |
11/1905 |
|
|
831 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/09/1960 |
12/1905 |
|
|
1131 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
31/07/1961 |
12/1905 |
|
|
1777 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
27/03/1961 |
04/1906 |
S |
|
726 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
41 |
26/12/1936 |
04/1906 |
4CC |
|
730 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/1935 |
04/1906 |
S |
|
740 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
42 |
03/09/1932 |
04/1906 |
S |
|
757 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
43 |
03/05/1932 |
04/1906 |
P3 |
|
790 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
24/04/1959 |
04/1906 |
P3 |
|
814 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
19/10/1959 |
04/1906 |
P3 |
|
836 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/11/1961 |
05/1906 |
|
|
731 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/1933 |
05/1906 |
S |
|
760 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
44 |
26/03/1931 |
05/1906 |
P3 |
|
839 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/06/1959 |
05/1906 |
P3 |
|
880 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
27/08/1959 |
06/1906 |
S |
|
761 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
47 |
22/02/1951 |
06/1906 |
S |
|
763 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
48 |
16/04/1929 |
06/1906 |
S |
|
766 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
49 |
26/10/1931 |
06/1906 |
S |
|
768 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
50 |
25/05/1929 |
06/1906 |
P3 |
|
883 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/06/1959 |
06/1906 |
P3 |
|
888 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/04/1962 |
06/1906 |
P3 |
|
891 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
14/05/1962 |
06/1906 |
P3 |
|
917 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/06/1966 |
06/1906 |
P3 |
|
938 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/07/1967 |
08/1906 |
S |
|
1077 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
52 |
06/11/1931 |
08/1906 |
S |
|
775 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
51 |
15/08/1936 |
09/1906 |
P3 |
|
1006 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/08/1966 |
09/1906 |
P3 |
|
1016 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/10/1964 |
09/1906 |
P3 |
|
1018 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/05/1965 |
09/1906 |
|
|
476 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/1951 |
09/1906 |
|
|
592 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
19/10/1954 |
10/1906 |
P3 |
|
1052 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/04/1959 |
10/1906 |
P3 |
|
1189 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
28/06/1965 |
10/1906 |
P3 |
|
1227 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/07/1967 |
10/1906 |
|
|
707 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/11/1956 |
10/1906 |
|
|
708 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
23/02/1953 |
10/1906 |
|
|
711 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
14/10/1954 |
11/1906 |
P3 |
|
1256 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
15/05/1966 |
11/1906 |
P3 |
|
1393 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
27/11/1962 |
11/1906 |
P3 |
|
1402 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/06/1959 |
11/1906 |
|
|
712 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
07/05/1957 |
11/1906 |
|
|
713 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/1951 |
11/1906 |
|
|
723 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1949 |
12/1906 |
P3 |
|
1686 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/08/1962 |
12/1906 |
|
|
724 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/11/1956 |
12/1906 |
|
|
725 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
10/04/1951 |
02/1907 |
|
|
1026 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
23/09/1954 |
03/1907 |
|
|
1042 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
19/11/1957 |
03/1907 |
|
|
1147 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/1943 |
04/1907 |
|
|
1206 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
01/1945 |
04/1907 |
|
|
1209 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/09/1957 |
05/1907 |
|
|
1217 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
06/09/1954 |
05/1907 |
|
|
1232 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
07/06/1951 |
05/1907 |
|
|
1234 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1943 |
06/1907 |
|
|
1051 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/1951 |
06/1907 |
|
|
1078 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
13/05/1957 |
06/1907 |
|
|
1184 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
15/08/1955 |
06/1907 |
|
|
1236 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/1947 |
06/1907 |
|
|
1260 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
20/11/1957 |
06/1907 |
T |
|
578 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
516 |
16/05/1949 |
06/1907 |
T1 |
|
578 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
516 |
16/05/1949 |
06/1907 |
T |
|
660 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
517 |
31/12/1948 |
06/1907 |
T1 |
|
660 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
517 |
31/12/1948 |
06/1907 |
T |
|
939 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
518 |
18/09/1947 |
06/1907 |
T1 |
|
939 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
518 |
18/09/1947 |
08/1907 |
T |
|
1031 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
519 |
23/04/1951 |
08/1907 |
T1 |
|
1031 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
519 |
23/04/1951 |
08/1907 |
|
|
1207 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
19/10/1956 |
08/1907 |
|
|
1210 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
26/04/1954 |
09/1907 |
T |
|
1032 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
520 |
19/07/1947 |
09/1907 |
T1 |
|
1032 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
520 |
19/07/1947 |
09/1907 |
T |
|
1054 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
521 |
16/05/1949 |
09/1907 |
T1 |
|
1054 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
521 |
16/05/1949 |
09/1907 |
|
|
1223 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
29/11/1948 |
09/1907 |
|
|
1235 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
31/05/1954 |
09/1907 |
|
|
1258 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1946 |
09/1907 |
|
|
1665 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/1957 |
09/1907 |
|
|
1672 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
04/02/1957 |
10/1907 |
T |
|
1062 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
522 |
20/12/1948 |
10/1907 |
T1 |
|
1062 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
522 |
20/12/1948 |
10/1907 |
T |
|
1177 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
523 |
16/05/1949 |
10/1907 |
T1 |
|
1177 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
523 |
16/05/1949 |
10/1907 |
T |
|
1178 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
524 |
12/02/1949 |
10/1907 |
T1 |
|
1178 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
524 |
12/02/1949 |
10/1907 |
H2 |
|
1662 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/1937 |
11/1907 |
T |
|
1215 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
525 |
07/12/1946 |
11/1907 |
T1 |
|
1215 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
351A |
525 |
07/12/1946 |
12/1907 |
T |
|
644 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
526 |
11/06/1948 |
12/1907 |
T1 |
|
644 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
526 |
11/06/1948 |
12/1907 |
T |
|
645 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
527 |
29/09/1951 |
12/1907 |
T1 |
|
645 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
527 |
29/09/1951 |
12/1907 |
T |
|
646 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
528 |
22/08/1949 |
12/1907 |
T1 |
|
646 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
528 |
22/08/1949 |
12/1907 |
T |
|
647 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
529 |
21/11/1949 |
12/1907 |
T1 |
|
647 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
529 |
21/11/1949 |
12/1907 |
W |
|
686 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
84 |
07/06/1947 |
12/1907 |
W |
|
687 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
85 |
16/08/1951 |
12/1907 |
W |
|
688 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
86 |
20/12/1948 |
01/1908 |
W |
|
689 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
87 |
09/04/1951 |
02/1908 |
W |
|
690 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
88 |
15/08/1951 |
03/1908 |
T |
|
648 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
530 |
03/09/1951 |
03/1908 |
T1 |
|
648 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
530 |
03/09/1951 |
03/1908 |
T |
|
652 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
531 |
25/03/1948 |
03/1908 |
T1 |
|
652 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
531 |
25/03/1948 |
03/1908 |
T |
|
653 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
532 |
04/04/1949 |
03/1908 |
T1 |
|
653 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
532 |
04/04/1949 |
03/1908 |
W |
|
691 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
89 |
17/07/1950 |
03/1908 |
W |
|
692 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
90 |
30/03/1953 |
03/1908 |
W |
|
693 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
91 |
24/08/1951 |
04/1908 |
T |
|
654 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
533 |
12/02/1949 |
04/1908 |
T1 |
|
654 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
533 |
12/02/1949 |
04/1908 |
W |
|
694 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
92 |
06/02/1951 |
04/1908 |
W |
|
695 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
93 |
06/02/1950 |
05/1908 |
P3 |
|
1014 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18355 |
23/12/1963 |
05/1908 |
P3 |
|
1015 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18356 |
09/09/1967 |
05/1908 |
P3 |
|
1017 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18357 |
05/06/1967 |
05/1908 |
P3 |
|
1022 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18358 |
24/05/1967 |
05/1908 |
P3 |
|
1023 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18359 |
29/06/1966 |
05/1908 |
P3 |
|
1024 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18360 |
21/11/1966 |
05/1908 |
P3 |
|
1025 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18361 |
14/10/1959 |
05/1908 |
P3 |
|
1027 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18362 |
01/05/1967 |
05/1908 |
P3 |
|
1028 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18363 |
30/07/1962 |
05/1908 |
P3 |
|
1029 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18364 |
09/1966 |
05/1908 |
T |
|
655 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
534 |
27/06/1949 |
05/1908 |
T1 |
|
655 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
534 |
27/06/1949 |
05/1908 |
T |
|
656 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
535 |
18/04/1951 |
05/1908 |
T1 |
|
656 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
361A |
535 |
18/04/1951 |
06/1908 |
P3 |
|
1001 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
371a |
|
10/09/1962 |
06/1908 |
P3 |
|
1003 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
371a |
|
31/07/1966 |
06/1908 |
P3 |
|
1004 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
371a |
|
07/08/1966 |
06/1908 |
P3 |
|
1005 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
371a |
|
16/04/1959 |
06/1908 |
P3 |
|
1030 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18365 |
06/05/1963 |
06/1908 |
P3 |
|
1034 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18366 |
27/02/1966 |
06/1908 |
P3 |
|
1035 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18367 |
01/03/1965 |
06/1908 |
P3 |
|
1036 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18368 |
20/03/1967 |
06/1908 |
P3 |
|
1039 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18369 |
11/1959 |
06/1908 |
P3 |
|
1040 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18370 |
07/06/1966 |
06/1908 |
P3 |
|
1044 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18371 |
26/08/1959 |
06/1908 |
P3 |
|
1046 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18372 |
03/07/1959 |
06/1908 |
P3 |
|
1047 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18373 |
05/1964 |
06/1908 |
P3 |
|
1048 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
North British |
L281 |
18374 |
30/03/1959 |
06/1908 |
S |
|
738 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
94 |
30/07/1938 |
06/1908 |
S |
|
739 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
95 |
01/07/1932 |
06/1908 |
S |
|
741 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
96 |
31/01/1930 |
06/1908 |
S |
|
743 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
97 |
03/05/1932 |
07/1908 |
P3 |
|
1201 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5104 |
13/05/1959 |
07/1908 |
P3 |
|
1203 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5105 |
30/08/1965 |
07/1908 |
P3 |
|
1204 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5106 |
18/01/1967 |
07/1908 |
P3 |
|
1205 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5107 |
13/04/1959 |
07/1908 |
S |
|
744 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
98 |
15/12/1931 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1007 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
371a |
|
01/07/1967 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1211 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5108 |
27/12/1965 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1212 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5109 |
22/02/1965 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1213 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5110 |
25/10/1965 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1214 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5111 |
08/02/1960 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1216 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5112 |
04/09/1959 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1219 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5113 |
06/05/1963 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1220 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5114 |
29/04/1963 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1221 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5115 |
27/12/1965 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1222 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5116 |
23/12/1963 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1224 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5117 |
14/02/1967 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1225 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5118 |
23/12/1963 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1226 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5119 |
08/1967 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1228 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5120 |
26/08/1959 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1229 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5121 |
02/04/1963 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1230 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5122 |
04/10/1965 |
08/1908 |
P3 |
|
1231 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
5123 |
04/09/1966 |
08/1908 |
S |
|
745 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
99 |
08/12/1931 |
08/1908 |
S |
|
746 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
100 |
28/11/1931 |
09/1908 |
P3 |
|
1013 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
371a |
|
20/01/1966 |
09/1908 |
S |
|
747 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
101 |
04/08/1932 |
09/1908 |
S |
|
748 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
102 |
22/10/1938 |
10/1908 |
P3 |
|
1008 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
371a |
|
08/1959 |
10/1908 |
P3 |
|
1010 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
371a |
|
14/05/1962 |
10/1908 |
S |
|
749 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
103 |
15/04/1930 |
11/1908 |
P3 |
|
1011 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
371a |
|
15/03/1965 |
11/1908 |
P3 |
|
1012 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
371a |
|
04/09/1966 |
11/1908 |
R1 |
|
1237 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
381a |
|
03/1945 |
11/1908 |
S |
|
750 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
104 |
01/11/1932 |
11/1908 |
S |
|
751 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
105 |
07/05/1936 |
11/1908 |
S |
|
752 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
106 |
23/06/1934 |
12/1908 |
R1 |
|
1238 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
381a |
|
03/1945 |
12/1908 |
R1 |
|
1239 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
381a |
|
12/1942 |
12/1908 |
S |
|
753 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
107 |
22/10/1938 |
01/1909 |
S |
|
754 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
108 |
26/12/1936 |
01/1909 |
S |
|
755 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
109 |
01/02/1934 |
01/1909 |
S |
|
756 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
110 |
21/09/1934 |
02/1909 |
S |
|
758 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
111 |
12/05/1930 |
03/1909 |
R1 |
|
1240 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
381a |
|
05/1944 |
03/1909 |
S |
|
759 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
112 |
22/10/1938 |
03/1909 |
S |
|
762 |
4-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
113 |
27/05/1937 |
04/1909 |
P3 |
|
1049 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3352 |
18/03/1963 |
04/1909 |
P3 |
|
1050 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3353 |
13/02/1966 |
05/1909 |
P3 |
|
1053 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3354 |
27/03/1966 |
05/1909 |
P3 |
|
1056 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3355 |
01/05/1967 |
06/1909 |
P3 |
|
1060 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3356 |
24/05/1967 |
06/1909 |
R1 |
|
1241 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
381a |
|
03/1943 |
06/1909 |
R1 |
|
1242 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
381a |
|
01/1946 |
06/1909 |
R1 |
|
1243 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
381a |
|
06/1945 |
07/1909 |
P3 |
|
1061 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3357 |
23/01/1967 |
07/1909 |
P3 |
|
1064 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3358 |
13/04/1959 |
07/1909 |
R1 |
|
1244 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
381a |
|
10/1944 |
08/1909 |
R1 |
|
1245 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
381a |
|
09/02/1946 |
08/1909 |
R1 |
|
1246 |
4-4-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
381a |
|
07/1943 |
09/1909 |
P3 |
|
1065 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3359 |
30/10/1962 |
09/1909 |
P3 |
|
1066 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3360 |
23/01/1967 |
09/1909 |
P3 |
|
1067 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3361 |
22/01/1962 |
09/1909 |
X |
|
1350 |
4-8-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
17/10/1959 |
09/1909 |
X |
|
1351 |
4-8-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
19/03/1957 |
10/1909 |
X |
|
1352 |
4-8-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
17/10/1959 |
11/1909 |
X |
|
1353 |
4-8-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
08/01/1958 |
12/1909 |
X |
|
1354 |
4-8-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
15/08/1955 |
12/1909 |
X |
|
1355 |
4-8-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
02/1910 |
X |
|
1356 |
4-8-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
16/03/1959 |
03/1910 |
X |
|
1357 |
4-8-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
12/08/1957 |
04/1910 |
X |
|
1358 |
4-8-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
05/1937 |
04/1910 |
X |
|
1359 |
4-8-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Gateshead Works |
?? |
|
02/11/1959 |
05/1910 |
V/09 |
|
696 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
391 |
|
31/12/1947 |
05/1910 |
V/09 |
|
697 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
391 |
|
10/1945 |
06/1910 |
V/09 |
|
698 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
391 |
|
27/12/1947 |
06/1910 |
V/09 |
|
699 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
391 |
|
07/1944 |
07/1910 |
V/09 |
|
700 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
391 |
|
05/1946 |
07/1910 |
V/09 |
|
701 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
391 |
|
08/1944 |
08/1910 |
V/09 |
|
702 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
391 |
|
07/1946 |
08/1910 |
V/09 |
|
703 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
391 |
|
01/1945 |
09/1910 |
V/09 |
|
704 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
391 |
|
22/11/1947 |
09/1910 |
V/09 |
|
705 |
4-4-2 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
391 |
|
12/1943 |
10/1910 |
Y |
|
1113 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
13/10/1954 |
11/1910 |
Y |
|
1114 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/11/1954 |
11/1910 |
Y |
|
1126 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/12/1957 |
12/1910 |
Y |
|
1129 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/03/1955 |
12/1910 |
Y |
|
1136 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/08/1954 |
12/1910 |
Y |
|
1170 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/04/1952 |
1911 |
T |
|
658 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
08/11/1948 |
1911 |
T1 |
|
658 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
08/11/1948 |
01/1911 |
Y |
|
1174 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
14/06/1954 |
01/1911 |
Y |
|
1175 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/05/1952 |
02/1911 |
Y |
|
1176 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/05/1955 |
02/1911 |
Y |
|
1179 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
30/11/1954 |
02/1911 |
Y |
|
1180 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
15/11/1954 |
03/1911 |
Y |
|
1181 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/11/1956 |
03/1911 |
Y |
|
1182 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/12/1957 |
03/1911 |
Y |
|
1183 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
17/12/1956 |
04/1911 |
Y |
|
1185 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/03/1956 |
04/1911 |
Y |
|
1190 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
17/11/1955 |
05/1911 |
Y |
|
1191 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/12/1957 |
05/1911 |
Y |
|
1192 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/08/1954 |
05/1911 |
Y |
|
1193 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
21/11/1955 |
06/1911 |
Y |
|
1195 |
4-6-2T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
28/05/1951 |
06/1911 |
T |
|
642 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
22/03/1947 |
06/1911 |
T1 |
|
642 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
22/03/1947 |
06/1911 |
T |
|
643 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
06/03/1948 |
06/1911 |
T1 |
|
643 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
06/03/1948 |
06/1911 |
T |
|
657 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
12/02/1949 |
06/1911 |
T1 |
|
657 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
12/02/1949 |
06/1911 |
T |
|
659 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
16/10/1947 |
06/1911 |
T1 |
|
659 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
16/10/1947 |
07/1911 |
T |
|
661 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
22/03/1947 |
07/1911 |
T1 |
|
661 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
22/03/1947 |
07/1911 |
T |
|
669 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
06/10/1951 |
07/1911 |
T1 |
|
669 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
06/10/1951 |
07/1911 |
Z |
|
706 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L436 |
19446 |
12/1946 |
07/1911 |
Z |
|
709 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L436 |
19447 |
03/1946 |
07/1911 |
Z |
|
710 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L436 |
19448 |
02/1944 |
07/1911 |
Z |
|
714 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L436 |
19449 |
01/1944 |
07/1911 |
Z |
|
716 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L436 |
19450 |
26/06/1948 |
08/1911 |
Z |
|
717 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L436 |
19451 |
04/1944 |
08/1911 |
Z |
|
718 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L436 |
19452 |
06/1946 |
08/1911 |
Z |
|
719 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L436 |
19453 |
04/1944 |
08/1911 |
Z |
|
720 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L436 |
19454 |
08/11/1947 |
08/1911 |
Z |
|
722 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L437 |
19456 |
03/1947 |
08/1911 |
T |
|
764 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
22/11/1948 |
08/1911 |
T1 |
|
764 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
22/11/1948 |
08/1911 |
T |
|
767 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
13/01/1951 |
08/1911 |
T1 |
|
767 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
13/01/1951 |
08/1911 |
T |
|
769 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
21/12/1946 |
08/1911 |
T1 |
|
769 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
21/12/1946 |
09/1911 |
Z |
|
721 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L436 |
19455 |
02/1944 |
09/1911 |
Z |
|
727 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L437 |
19457 |
01/1943 |
09/1911 |
Z |
|
728 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L437 |
19458 |
11/1945 |
09/1911 |
Z |
|
729 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L437 |
19459 |
11/1945 |
09/1911 |
T |
|
770 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
28/12/1949 |
09/1911 |
T1 |
|
770 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
28/12/1949 |
09/1911 |
T |
|
771 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
12/02/1949 |
09/1911 |
T1 |
|
771 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
12/02/1949 |
09/1911 |
T |
|
772 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
22/03/1949 |
09/1911 |
T1 |
|
772 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
22/03/1949 |
09/1911 |
T |
|
773 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
21/12/1950 |
09/1911 |
T1 |
|
773 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
21/12/1950 |
10/1911 |
Z |
|
732 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L437 |
19460 |
12/1946 |
10/1911 |
Z |
|
733 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L437 |
19461 |
08/1945 |
10/1911 |
Z |
|
734 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L437 |
19462 |
09/1944 |
10/1911 |
Z |
|
735 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L437 |
19463 |
06/1945 |
10/1911 |
T |
|
774 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
16/05/1949 |
10/1911 |
T1 |
|
774 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
16/05/1949 |
10/1911 |
T |
|
781 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
29/08/1949 |
10/1911 |
T1 |
|
781 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
29/08/1949 |
10/1911 |
T |
|
783 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
16/10/1950 |
10/1911 |
T1 |
|
783 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
16/10/1950 |
11/1911 |
Z |
|
736 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L437 |
19464 |
04/1946 |
11/1911 |
T |
|
789 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
02/08/1947 |
11/1911 |
T1 |
|
789 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
02/08/1947 |
11/1911 |
T |
|
793 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
01/10/1949 |
11/1911 |
T1 |
|
793 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
01/10/1949 |
11/1911 |
T |
|
794 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
07/02/1948 |
11/1911 |
T1 |
|
794 |
0-8-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
411A |
|
07/02/1948 |
12/1911 |
Z |
|
737 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
North British |
L437 |
19465 |
12/1945 |
12/1911 |
|
|
782 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
21/12/1946 |
12/1911 |
|
|
786 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
18/09/1937 |
02/1912 |
|
|
787 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
21/12/1946 |
02/1912 |
|
|
788 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/09/1937 |
02/1912 |
|
|
791 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/10/1937 |
03/1912 |
|
|
795 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/12/1945 |
03/1912 |
|
|
796 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
18/12/1945 |
05/1912 |
|
|
797 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/11/1937 |
06/1912 |
|
|
798 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/10/1945 |
06/1912 |
|
|
799 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/11/1937 |
09/1912 |
|
|
813 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
431 |
|
18/03/1944 |
09/1912 |
|
|
815 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
431 |
|
31/05/1947 |
10/1912 |
|
|
817 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
431 |
|
06/04/1946 |
10/1912 |
|
|
819 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
431 |
|
21/12/1946 |
11/1912 |
|
|
820 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
431 |
|
27/12/1947 |
11/1912 |
|
|
821 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
431 |
|
02/11/1946 |
11/1912 |
|
|
822 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
431 |
|
05/02/1944 |
12/1912 |
|
|
823 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
431 |
|
21/10/1944 |
12/1912 |
|
|
824 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
431 |
|
27/04/1946 |
02/1913 |
T2 |
|
1247 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
15/07/1963 |
02/1913 |
T2 |
|
1248 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
12/11/1964 |
02/1913 |
T2 |
|
1249 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
04/12/1963 |
02/1913 |
T2 |
|
1250 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
07/06/1965 |
02/1913 |
T2 |
|
1251 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
09/09/1967 |
03/1913 |
T2 |
|
1252 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
08/06/1964 |
03/1913 |
T2 |
|
1253 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
29/05/1967 |
03/1913 |
T2 |
|
1254 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
18/10/1965 |
03/1913 |
T2 |
|
1257 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
17/06/1964 |
03/1913 |
|
|
825 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
431 |
|
26/02/1944 |
04/1913 |
T2 |
|
1261 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
05/06/1966 |
04/1913 |
T2 |
|
1262 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
18/06/1963 |
04/1913 |
T2 |
|
1271 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
25/02/1964 |
05/1913 |
T2 |
|
1276 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
15/07/1963 |
05/1913 |
T2 |
|
1278 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
21/05/1965 |
05/1913 |
T2 |
|
1279 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
15/07/1963 |
05/1913 |
T2 |
|
1280 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
03/12/1963 |
05/1913 |
T2 |
|
1283 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
17/05/1965 |
06/1913 |
T2 |
|
1264 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
18/01/1965 |
06/1913 |
T2 |
|
1284 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
09/03/1964 |
06/1913 |
T2 |
|
1285 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
441A |
|
27/04/1965 |
06/1913 |
T2 |
|
1288 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
451A |
|
26/06/1966 |
06/1913 |
T2 |
|
1291 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
451A |
|
07/06/1965 |
06/1913 |
T2 |
|
1292 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
451A |
|
14/11/1965 |
06/1913 |
T2 |
|
1293 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
451A |
|
04/09/1966 |
07/1913 |
T2 |
|
1294 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
451A |
|
29/04/1963 |
07/1913 |
T2 |
|
1311 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
451A |
|
10/06/1963 |
07/1913 |
T2 |
|
1335 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
451A |
|
16/05/1967 |
08/1913 |
T2 |
|
1361 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
451A |
|
31/08/1964 |
08/1913 |
T2 |
|
1362 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
451A |
|
31/12/1966 |
09/1913 |
T2 |
|
1363 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
451A |
|
15/07/1963 |
10/1913 |
D |
|
2143 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
21/06/1960 |
10/1913 |
D |
|
2144 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/11/1958 |
11/1913 |
D |
|
2145 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/11/1959 |
11/1913 |
D |
|
2146 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/01/1960 |
12/1913 |
D |
|
2147 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/05/1960 |
12/1913 |
D |
|
2148 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/01/1960 |
12/1913 |
D |
|
2149 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/12/1959 |
12/1913 |
D |
|
2151 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/05/1960 |
12/1913 |
D |
|
2152 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/02/1960 |
12/1913 |
D |
|
2153 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
14/06/1960 |
12/1913 |
D |
|
2154 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/06/1960 |
01/1914 |
D |
|
2150 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/02/1960 |
02/1914 |
D |
|
2155 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
30/07/1958 |
02/1914 |
D |
|
2156 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/11/1958 |
02/1914 |
D |
|
2157 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
29/10/1958 |
03/1914 |
D |
|
2158 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
21/04/1958 |
03/1914 |
D |
|
2159 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
18/11/1958 |
03/1914 |
D |
|
2160 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/12/1959 |
04/1914 |
D |
|
2161 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/11/1957 |
04/1914 |
D |
|
2162 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
13/06/1960 |
05/1914 |
Z |
|
2163 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/1946 |
05/1914 |
Z |
|
2164 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
27/12/1948 |
06/1914 |
Z |
|
2165 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/1947 |
06/1914 |
Z |
|
2166 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
30/08/1948 |
06/1914 |
Z |
|
2167 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
26/06/1948 |
06/1914 |
Z |
|
2168 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/1947 |
06/1914 |
Z |
|
2169 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/07/1948 |
06/1914 |
Z |
|
2170 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/1943 |
07/1914 |
Z |
|
2171 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/1942 |
08/1914 |
Z |
|
2172 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/1944 |
08/1914 |
|
|
2173 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/02/1961 |
09/1914 |
|
|
2174 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
19/12/1960 |
09/1914 |
|
|
2175 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/10/1961 |
09/1914 |
|
|
2176 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
24/08/1961 |
09/1914 |
|
|
2177 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
24/11/1959 |
09/1914 |
|
|
2178 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/04/1962 |
09/1914 |
|
|
2179 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
30/01/1961 |
09/1914 |
|
|
2180 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/02/1960 |
09/1914 |
|
|
2181 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/10/1961 |
10/1914 |
|
|
2182 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/12/1958 |
10/1914 |
|
|
2183 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/12/1958 |
10/1914 |
|
|
2184 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/10/1960 |
10/1914 |
|
|
2185 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
31/08/1961 |
10/1914 |
|
|
2186 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/10/1961 |
10/1914 |
|
|
2187 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/10/1961 |
11/1914 |
|
|
2188 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/11/1960 |
11/1914 |
|
|
2189 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
24/10/1960 |
11/1914 |
|
|
2190 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/04/1962 |
11/1914 |
|
|
2191 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
11/08/1961 |
11/1914 |
|
|
2192 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
26/02/1962 |
12/1914 |
Z |
|
2193 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
30/08/1948 |
12/1914 |
Z |
|
2194 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/1944 |
12/1914 |
Z |
|
2195 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/1947 |
02/1915 |
Z |
|
2196 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/07/1948 |
02/1915 |
Z |
|
2197 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
24/07/1948 |
03/1915 |
Z |
|
2198 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
24/07/1948 |
03/1915 |
Z |
|
2199 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
06/1944 |
03/1915 |
Z |
|
2200 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/1946 |
04/1915 |
Z |
|
2201 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
09/1947 |
05/1915 |
Z |
|
2202 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/1943 |
06/1915 |
Z |
|
2203 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
24/07/1948 |
06/1915 |
Z |
|
2204 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
30/08/1948 |
11/1916 |
Z |
|
2205 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/1945 |
11/1916 |
Z |
|
2206 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/11/1947 |
01/1917 |
Z |
|
2207 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/11/1948 |
02/1917 |
Z |
|
2208 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/03/1948 |
04/1917 |
Z |
|
2209 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/1944 |
04/1917 |
T2 |
|
2213 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
01/06/1964 |
05/1917 |
Z |
|
2210 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/07/1948 |
05/1917 |
T2 |
|
2214 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
07/11/1965 |
06/1917 |
Z |
|
2211 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/11/1947 |
06/1917 |
T2 |
|
2215 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
16/05/1960 |
06/1917 |
T2 |
|
2216 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
15/07/1963 |
06/1917 |
T2 |
|
2217 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
29/04/1963 |
06/1917 |
T2 |
|
2218 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
19/08/1963 |
06/1917 |
T2 |
|
2219 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
01/07/1963 |
06/1917 |
T2 |
|
2220 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
10/11/1966 |
06/1917 |
T2 |
|
2221 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
05/04/1965 |
06/1917 |
T2 |
|
2222 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
04/09/1966 |
07/1917 |
T2 |
|
2223 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
15/07/1963 |
08/1917 |
T2 |
|
2224 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
08/12/1966 |
08/1917 |
T2 |
|
2225 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
18/09/1964 |
09/1917 |
T2 |
|
2226 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
13/04/1964 |
10/1917 |
T2 |
|
2227 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
02/01/1966 |
10/1917 |
T2 |
|
2228 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
16/10/1963 |
10/1917 |
T2 |
|
2229 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
05/12/1965 |
11/1917 |
T2 |
|
2230 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
09/09/1967 |
12/1917 |
T2 |
|
2231 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
16/03/1964 |
12/1917 |
T2 |
|
2232 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
111A |
|
27/12/1965 |
06/1918 |
|
|
2212 |
4-4-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/1945 |
08/1918 |
T2 |
|
2233 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
131A |
|
08/08/1963 |
09/1918 |
T2 |
|
2234 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
131A |
|
12/04/1965 |
10/1918 |
T2 |
|
2235 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
131A |
|
18/11/1963 |
10/1918 |
T2 |
|
2236 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
131A |
|
17/06/1964 |
11/1918 |
T2 |
|
2237 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
131A |
|
07/06/1967 |
12/1918 |
T2 |
|
2238 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
131A |
|
09/09/1967 |
12/1918 |
T2 |
|
2239 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
131A |
|
29/04/1963 |
12/1918 |
T2 |
|
2240 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
131A |
|
31/05/1967 |
12/1918 |
T2 |
|
2241 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
131A |
|
11/10/1965 |
12/1918 |
T2 |
|
2242 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
131A |
|
16/03/1964 |
05/1919 |
T2 |
|
2243 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
141A |
|
12/08/1963 |
05/1919 |
T2 |
|
2244 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
141A |
|
06/04/1964 |
05/1919 |
T2 |
|
2245 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
141A |
|
16/09/1964 |
05/1919 |
T2 |
|
2246 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
141A |
|
27/07/1964 |
06/1919 |
T2 |
|
2247 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
141A |
|
17/05/1965 |
06/1919 |
T2 |
|
2248 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
141A |
|
14/12/1966 |
06/1919 |
T2 |
|
2249 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
141A |
|
31/07/1966 |
07/1919 |
T2 |
|
2250 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
141A |
|
01/07/1967 |
07/1919 |
T2 |
|
2251 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
141A |
|
02/07/1963 |
08/1919 |
T2 |
|
2252 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
141A |
|
11/09/1966 |
10/1919 |
T3 |
|
901 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/12/1962 |
10/1919 |
T3 |
|
902 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
10/12/1962 |
10/1919 |
T3 |
|
903 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/12/1962 |
11/1919 |
T2 |
|
2253 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
1 |
05/06/1966 |
11/1919 |
T3 |
|
904 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/12/1962 |
11/1919 |
T3 |
|
905 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/12/1962 |
12/1919 |
T2 |
|
2254 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
2 |
06/04/1965 |
12/1919 |
T2 |
|
2255 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
3 |
11/07/1966 |
12/1919 |
S3 |
|
840 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
19/10/1960 |
12/1919 |
S3 |
|
841 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/11/1959 |
12/1919 |
S3 |
|
842 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/09/1960 |
12/1919 |
S3 |
|
843 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/04/1964 |
12/1919 |
S3 |
|
844 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/09/1961 |
02/1920 |
T2 |
|
2256 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
4 |
23/01/1967 |
02/1920 |
T2 |
|
2257 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
5 |
17/05/1965 |
02/1920 |
T2 |
|
2258 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
6 |
15/04/1964 |
02/1920 |
T2 |
|
2259 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
7 |
15/07/1963 |
02/1920 |
T2 |
|
2260 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
8 |
13/02/1966 |
02/1920 |
T2 |
|
2261 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
9 |
15/07/1963 |
02/1920 |
T2 |
|
2262 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
10 |
07/06/1965 |
03/1920 |
T2 |
|
2263 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
11 |
05/02/1967 |
03/1920 |
T2 |
|
2264 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
12 |
05/06/1966 |
03/1920 |
T2 |
|
2265 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
13 |
18/05/1964 |
03/1920 |
T2 |
|
2266 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
14 |
16/11/1964 |
03/1920 |
T2 |
|
2267 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
15 |
13/01/1964 |
03/1920 |
T2 |
|
2268 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
16 |
15/04/1963 |
03/1920 |
S3 |
|
846 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
15/04/1963 |
03/1920 |
S3 |
|
847 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/09/1963 |
04/1920 |
T2 |
|
2269 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
17 |
22/06/1967 |
04/1920 |
T2 |
|
2270 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
18 |
14/06/1965 |
04/1920 |
T2 |
|
2271 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
19 |
29/04/1963 |
04/1920 |
S3 |
|
845 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/01/1958 |
04/1920 |
S3 |
|
848 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/02/1960 |
04/1920 |
S3 |
|
849 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/12/1960 |
05/1920 |
D |
|
1517 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
24/06/1960 |
05/1920 |
T2 |
|
2272 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
20 |
01/07/1967 |
05/1920 |
T2 |
|
2273 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
21 |
29/04/1963 |
05/1920 |
T2 |
|
2274 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
22 |
07/08/1967 |
05/1920 |
T2 |
|
2275 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
23 |
17/05/1965 |
05/1920 |
T2 |
|
2276 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
24 |
30/09/1963 |
05/1920 |
T2 |
|
2277 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
25 |
25/09/1963 |
05/1920 |
T2 |
|
2278 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
26 |
05/06/1966 |
06/1920 |
D |
|
1518 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/11/1958 |
06/1920 |
D |
|
1519 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/10/1958 |
06/1920 |
D |
|
1520 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/02/1960 |
06/1920 |
D |
|
1523 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/05/1960 |
06/1920 |
D |
|
1528 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/05/1960 |
06/1920 |
D |
|
1529 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
21/10/1957 |
06/1920 |
D |
|
1531 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
30/12/1959 |
06/1920 |
T2 |
|
2279 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
27 |
24/04/1967 |
06/1920 |
T2 |
|
2280 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
28 |
05/06/1967 |
06/1920 |
T2 |
|
2281 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
29 |
12/11/1964 |
06/1920 |
T2 |
|
2282 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
30 |
07/04/1964 |
06/1920 |
T2 |
|
2283 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
31 |
31/12/1966 |
06/1920 |
S3 |
|
906 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/10/1960 |
07/1920 |
T2 |
|
2284 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
32 |
23/12/1963 |
07/1920 |
T2 |
|
2285 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
33 |
15/07/1963 |
07/1920 |
T2 |
|
2286 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
34 |
18/10/1965 |
08/1920 |
T2 |
|
2287 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
35 |
17/05/1965 |
08/1920 |
S3 |
|
908 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/09/1961 |
08/1920 |
S3 |
|
909 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/09/1961 |
08/1920 |
S3 |
|
911 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/09/1961 |
09/1920 |
T2 |
|
2288 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
36 |
26/06/1966 |
09/1920 |
T2 |
|
2289 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
37 |
05/06/1966 |
09/1920 |
S3 |
|
914 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/09/1961 |
09/1920 |
S3 |
|
915 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/09/1961 |
09/1920 |
S3 |
|
920 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
12/05/1961 |
10/1920 |
T2 |
|
2290 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
38 |
29/04/1963 |
10/1920 |
T2 |
|
2291 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
39 |
08/11/1963 |
10/1920 |
T2 |
|
2292 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
40 |
15/07/1963 |
10/1920 |
|
|
2303 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/03/1959 |
10/1920 |
|
|
2304 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
21/08/1961 |
10/1920 |
|
|
2305 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/01/1959 |
10/1920 |
|
|
2306 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/10/1961 |
10/1920 |
S3 |
|
921 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/09/1962 |
11/1920 |
T2 |
|
2293 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
41 |
31/12/1966 |
11/1920 |
T2 |
|
2294 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
42 |
01/01/1964 |
11/1920 |
T2 |
|
2295 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
43 |
29/04/1963 |
11/1920 |
|
|
2307 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/1960 |
11/1920 |
|
|
2308 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
26/07/1961 |
11/1920 |
|
|
2309 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/02/1961 |
11/1920 |
|
|
2310 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
08/11/1961 |
11/1920 |
S3 |
|
922 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
29/06/1964 |
11/1920 |
S3 |
|
923 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/09/1961 |
12/1920 |
T2 |
|
2296 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
44 |
02/10/1966 |
12/1920 |
T2 |
|
2297 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
45 |
05/06/1966 |
12/1920 |
T2 |
|
2298 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
46 |
22/06/1967 |
12/1920 |
|
|
2311 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
30/06/1958 |
12/1920 |
|
|
2312 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
24/01/1961 |
12/1920 |
S3 |
|
924 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/09/1963 |
12/1920 |
S3 |
|
925 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
13/06/1942 |
12/1920 |
S3 |
|
926 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
29/06/1964 |
12/1920 |
S3 |
|
927 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/09/1961 |
01/1921 |
T2 |
|
2299 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
47 |
15/12/1964 |
01/1921 |
T2 |
|
2300 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
48 |
18/12/1961 |
01/1921 |
S3 |
|
928 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/09/1961 |
02/1921 |
S3 |
|
929 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/10/1960 |
02/1921 |
S3 |
|
930 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/09/1961 |
03/1921 |
T2 |
|
2301 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
49 |
01/07/1967 |
03/1921 |
T2 |
|
2302 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Armstrong Whitworth |
E4 |
50 |
30/10/1966 |
03/1921 |
S3 |
|
931 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
29/09/1959 |
03/1921 |
S3 |
|
932 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
07/03/1960 |
03/1921 |
S3 |
|
933 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
31/10/1960 |
04/1921 |
S3 |
|
934 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/09/1961 |
04/1921 |
S3 |
|
936 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/10/1959 |
05/1921 |
S3 |
|
937 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
25/09/1961 |
06/1921 |
D |
|
1499 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
24/06/1960 |
06/1921 |
D |
|
1501 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/06/1960 |
06/1921 |
S3 |
|
942 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
03/07/1961 |
06/1921 |
S3 |
|
943 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
30/11/1959 |
07/1921 |
D |
|
1502 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
02/06/1958 |
07/1921 |
D |
|
1503 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
19/11/1958 |
08/1921 |
D |
|
1524 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/06/1960 |
08/1921 |
D |
|
1525 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
04/11/1958 |
09/1921 |
D |
|
1526 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/06/1960 |
09/1921 |
D |
|
1527 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
21/06/1960 |
10/1921 |
D |
|
1327 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/12/1959 |
11/1921 |
D |
|
1329 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
01/10/1958 |
11/1921 |
P3 |
|
2338 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1144 |
01/07/1967 |
12/1921 |
D |
|
1330 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
30/05/1960 |
12/1921 |
D |
|
1521 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
13/01/1958 |
12/1921 |
P3 |
|
2339 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1145 |
22/05/1967 |
12/1921 |
P3 |
|
2340 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1146 |
04/10/1965 |
12/1921 |
P3 |
|
2341 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1147 |
06/08/1962 |
12/1921 |
P3 |
|
2342 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1148 |
23/12/1963 |
12/1921 |
P3 |
|
2343 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1149 |
05/02/1967 |
02/1922 |
D |
|
1326 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
05/11/1958 |
02/1922 |
D |
|
1328 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
16/09/1958 |
03/1922 |
D |
|
1500 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
20/11/1958 |
03/1922 |
P3 |
|
2344 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1150 |
18/06/1959 |
03/1922 |
P3 |
|
2345 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1151 |
06/06/1962 |
03/1922 |
P3 |
|
2346 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1152 |
29/05/1961 |
04/1922 |
|
|
2313 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
391 |
26/09/1961 |
04/1922 |
|
|
2314 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
392 |
21/08/1961 |
04/1922 |
|
|
2315 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
393 |
29/02/1960 |
04/1922 |
|
|
2316 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
394 |
23/09/1963 |
04/1922 |
|
|
2317 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
395 |
19/12/1960 |
04/1922 |
|
|
2318 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
396 |
04/04/1960 |
04/1922 |
|
|
2319 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
397 |
20/06/1961 |
04/1922 |
|
|
2320 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
398 |
27/02/1960 |
04/1922 |
|
|
2321 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
399 |
02/10/1961 |
04/1922 |
|
|
2322 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
400 |
16/10/1961 |
04/1922 |
P3 |
|
2347 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1153 |
14/02/1967 |
05/1922 |
D |
|
1522 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
19/11/1958 |
05/1922 |
D |
|
1530 |
4-4-4T |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
|
23/06/1960 |
05/1922 |
|
|
2323 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
401 |
07/11/1960 |
05/1922 |
|
|
2324 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
402 |
09/05/1960 |
05/1922 |
|
|
2325 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
403 |
16/10/1961 |
05/1922 |
|
|
2326 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
404 |
16/07/1962 |
05/1922 |
|
|
2327 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
405 |
02/10/1961 |
05/1922 |
|
|
2328 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
406 |
22/10/1958 |
05/1922 |
P3 |
|
2348 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1154 |
12/10/1964 |
05/1922 |
P3 |
|
2349 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1155 |
14/01/1963 |
05/1922 |
P3 |
|
2350 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1156 |
31/01/1967 |
06/1922 |
|
|
2329 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
407 |
07/10/1963 |
06/1922 |
|
|
2330 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
408 |
23/08/1961 |
06/1922 |
|
|
2331 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
409 |
23/11/1960 |
06/1922 |
|
|
2332 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
410 |
24/08/1959 |
06/1922 |
|
|
2333 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
411 |
31/07/1961 |
06/1922 |
P3 |
|
2351 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1157 |
30/10/1966 |
06/1922 |
P3 |
|
2352 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1158 |
07/08/1966 |
06/1922 |
P3 |
|
2353 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1159 |
25/03/1963 |
06/1922 |
P3 |
|
2354 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1160 |
16/03/1964 |
06/1922 |
P3 |
|
2355 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1161 |
29/10/1962 |
06/1922 |
P3 |
|
2356 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1162 |
12/10/1964 |
06/1922 |
P3 |
|
2357 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1163 |
09/09/1967 |
08/1922 |
|
|
2334 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
412 |
22/06/1959 |
08/1922 |
|
|
2335 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
413 |
16/10/1961 |
08/1922 |
P3 |
|
2358 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1164 |
12/06/1967 |
08/1922 |
P3 |
|
2359 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1165 |
04/02/1963 |
08/1922 |
P3 |
|
2360 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1166 |
09/09/1967 |
09/1922 |
|
|
2336 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
414 |
02/10/1961 |
09/1922 |
P3 |
|
2361 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1167 |
01/04/1963 |
10/1922 |
|
|
2337 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Armstrong Whitworth |
?? |
415 |
28/09/1961 |
10/1922 |
P3 |
|
2362 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1168 |
09/12/1963 |
11/1922 |
S3 |
|
2363 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1172 |
29/06/1964 |
11/1922 |
S3 |
|
2364 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1173 |
21/07/1964 |
12/1922 |
S3 |
|
2365 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1174 |
25/09/1961 |
12/1922 |
|
|
2400 |
4-6-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1170 |
13/04/1937 |
30/12/1922 |
|
|
2401 |
4-6-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1171 |
03/07/1936 |
04/01/1923 |
S3 |
|
2366 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1175 |
29/06/1964 |
17/01/1923 |
S3 |
|
2367 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1176 |
29/06/1964 |
19/02/1923 |
S3 |
|
2368 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1177 |
20/08/1962 |
08/03/1923 |
S3 |
|
2369 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1178 |
15/08/1960 |
12/03/1923 |
S3 |
|
2370 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1179 |
27/10/1959 |
28/03/1923 |
S3 |
|
2371 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1180 |
01/02/1960 |
17/04/1923 |
S3 |
|
2372 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1181 |
25/09/1961 |
04/05/1923 |
S3 |
|
2373 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1182 |
29/06/1964 |
19/05/1923 |
S3 |
|
2374 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1183 |
04/07/1961 |
23/05/1923 |
S3 |
|
2375 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1184 |
17/01/1961 |
29/05/1923 |
S3 |
|
2376 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1185 |
25/09/1961 |
06/1923 |
P3 |
|
2383 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1192 |
07/06/1967 |
06/1923 |
P3 |
|
2384 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1193 |
24/08/1959 |
06/1923 |
P3 |
|
2385 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1194 |
06/05/1963 |
06/1923 |
P3 |
|
2386 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1195 |
09/12/1963 |
06/1923 |
P3 |
|
2387 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1196 |
10/02/1964 |
06/06/1923 |
S3 |
|
2377 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1186 |
29/06/1964 |
29/06/1923 |
S3 |
|
2378 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1187 |
03/07/1963 |
30/06/1923 |
S3 |
|
2379 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1188 |
25/09/1961 |
07/1923 |
P3 |
|
2388 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1197 |
06/05/1963 |
07/1923 |
P3 |
|
2389 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1198 |
23/12/1963 |
31/07/1923 |
S3 |
|
2380 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1189 |
25/09/1961 |
08/1923 |
P3 |
|
2390 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1199 |
07/08/1967 |
16/08/1923 |
S3 |
|
2381 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1190 |
25/09/1961 |
31/08/1923 |
S3 |
|
2382 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1191 |
17/06/1963 |
09/1923 |
P3 |
|
2391 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1200 |
31/07/1966 |
09/1923 |
P3 |
|
2392 |
0-6-0 |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1201 |
09/09/1967 |
18/09/1923 |
|
|
985 |
0-4-0T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
03/10/1952 |
29/09/1923 |
S3 |
|
1371 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1207 |
29/06/1964 |
03/10/1923 |
|
|
986 |
0-4-0T |
T. Worsdell |
|
?? |
|
25/01/1952 |
19/10/1923 |
S3 |
|
1372 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1208 |
09/09/1963 |
19/10/1923 |
S3 |
|
1373 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1209 |
01/08/1960 |
23/10/1923 |
S3 |
|
1374 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1210 |
29/06/1964 |
30/10/1923 |
S3 |
|
1375 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1211 |
02/11/1959 |
31/10/1923 |
S3 |
|
1376 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1212 |
25/09/1961 |
10/11/1923 |
S3 |
|
1377 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1213 |
15/09/1961 |
15/11/1923 |
S3 |
|
1378 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1214 |
16/09/1963 |
21/11/1923 |
S3 |
|
1379 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1215 |
29/05/1961 |
29/11/1923 |
S3 |
|
1380 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1216 |
29/06/1964 |
04/12/1923 |
S3 |
|
1381 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1217 |
16/09/1963 |
13/12/1923 |
S3 |
|
1382 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1218 |
25/01/1960 |
20/12/1923 |
S3 |
|
1383 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1219 |
24/07/1961 |
01/01/1924 |
S3 |
|
1384 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1220 |
08/06/1964 |
01/01/1924 |
S3 |
|
1385 |
4-6-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1221 |
16/09/1963 |
11/03/1924 |
|
|
2402 |
4-6-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1222 |
25/07/1936 |
18/03/1924 |
T3 |
|
625 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1226 |
03/12/1962 |
19/03/1924 |
T3 |
|
624 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1225 |
03/12/1962 |
24/03/1924 |
|
|
2403 |
4-6-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1223 |
21/05/1937 |
25/03/1924 |
|
|
2404 |
4-6-2 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1224 |
06/02/1937 |
01/04/1924 |
T3 |
|
626 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1227 |
26/11/1962 |
03/04/1924 |
T3 |
|
628 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1228 |
26/11/1962 |
08/04/1924 |
T3 |
|
629 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1229 |
03/12/1962 |
16/04/1924 |
T3 |
|
630 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1230 |
03/12/1962 |
30/04/1924 |
T3 |
|
632 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1232 |
03/12/1962 |
03/05/1924 |
T3 |
|
631 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1231 |
17/12/1962 |
03/05/1924 |
T3 |
|
633 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1233 |
17/12/1962 |
08/05/1924 |
T3 |
|
634 |
0-8-0 |
V. Raven |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1234 |
17/12/1962 |
11/1925 |
X |
|
1656 |
4-8-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1295 |
01/10/1958 |
11/1925 |
X |
|
1657 |
4-8-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1296 |
21/02/1955 |
11/1925 |
X |
|
1658 |
4-8-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1297 |
12/01/1959 |
11/1925 |
|
|
500 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
1621 |
04/09/1961 |
11/1925 |
|
|
512 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
1624 |
15/12/1958 |
11/1925 |
|
|
516 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
1626 |
23/10/1961 |
11/1925 |
|
|
524 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
1627 |
01/01/1959 |
12/1925 |
X |
|
1659 |
4-8-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1298 |
12/06/1961 |
12/1925 |
X |
|
1660 |
4-8-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1299 |
22/10/1956 |
12/1925 |
|
|
542 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
1630 |
16/08/1960 |
12/1925 |
|
|
566 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
1631 |
17/12/1962 |
12/1925 |
|
|
571 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
1633 |
18/05/1959 |
12/1925 |
|
|
574 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
1634 |
01/02/1960 |
12/1925 |
|
|
576 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
1635 |
15/08/1960 |
12/1925 |
|
|
581 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
1636 |
02/04/1962 |
10/1949 |
|
|
69001 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2082 |
23/09/1963 |
11/1949 |
|
|
69002 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2083 |
01/10/1962 |
11/1949 |
|
|
69003 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2084 |
28/12/1963 |
11/1949 |
|
|
69004 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2085 |
23/09/1963 |
11/1949 |
|
|
69005 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2086 |
10/1964 |
11/1949 |
|
|
69006 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2087 |
09/12/1963 |
11/1949 |
|
|
69007 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2088 |
01/10/1962 |
12/1949 |
|
|
69008 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2089 |
09/12/1963 |
12/1949 |
|
|
69009 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2090 |
18/09/1963 |
12/1949 |
|
|
69010 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2091 |
01/10/1962 |
12/1949 |
|
|
69011 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2092 |
09/12/1963 |
12/1949 |
|
|
69012 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2093 |
21/02/1961 |
12/1949 |
|
|
69013 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2094 |
22/01/1962 |
12/1949 |
|
|
69014 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2095 |
19/02/1962 |
12/1949 |
|
|
69015 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2096 |
14/09/1961 |
01/1951 |
|
|
69016 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2097 |
26/10/1964 |
01/1951 |
|
|
69017 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2098 |
30/04/1962 |
01/1951 |
|
|
69018 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2099 |
08/10/1962 |
01/1951 |
|
|
69019 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2100 |
09/12/1963 |
01/1951 |
|
|
69020 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2101 |
28/12/1963 |
04/1951 |
|
|
69021 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2149 |
30/09/1963 |
04/1951 |
|
|
69022 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2150 |
31/12/1962 |
04/1951 |
|
|
69023 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2151 |
10/1964 |
04/1951 |
|
|
69024 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2152 |
23/09/1963 |
04/1951 |
|
|
69025 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2153 |
28/12/1963 |
05/1951 |
|
|
69026 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2154 |
30/04/1962 |
05/1951 |
|
|
69027 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2155 |
22/10/1962 |
05/1951 |
|
|
69028 |
0-6-0T |
W. Worsdell |
Darlington Works |
?? |
2156 |
26/10/1964 |