z Railway Companies

Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 1103 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3748 Week
» 6330 Month
» 270963 Year
» 1492528 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Locomotives of the
Build Date MLSR Class LNER Class First MLSR Number Wheels Designer Manufacturer Order Number Works Number Withdrawn
09/1891     7 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   13/08/1956
07/1892     670 0-6-0 T. Parker Kitson ?? 3452 08/1938
07/1892     671 0-6-0 T. Parker Kitson ?? 3453 09/1933
07/1892     672 0-6-0 T. Parker Kitson ?? 3454 07/1933
08/1892     47 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   18/07/1949
08/1892     673 0-6-0 T. Parker Kitson ?? 3455 10/1958
08/1892     674 0-6-0 T. Parker Kitson ?? 3456 07/1933
08/1892     675 0-6-0 T. Parker Kitson ?? 3457 09/10/1950
09/1892     676 0-6-0 T. Parker Kitson ?? 3458 09/1933
09/1892     677 0-6-0 T. Parker Kitson ?? 3459 11/1935
09/1892     678 0-6-0 T. Parker Kitson ?? 3460 05/1944
09/1892     679 0-6-0 T. Parker Kitson ?? 3461 09/1935
09/1892     680 0-6-0 T. Parker Kitson ?? 3462 25/08/1952
10/1892     681 0-6-0 T. Parker Kitson ?? 3463 09/1935
11/1892     171 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   25/08/1951
03/1893     639 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   03/1933
04/1893     640 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   07/1943
05/1893     641 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   10/1938
06/1893     642 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   08/1933
08/1893     518 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3552 05/11/1955
08/1893     643 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   29/12/1952
09/1893     519 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3553 26/05/1956
09/1893     520 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3554 16/06/1956
09/1893     521 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3555 11/1936
09/1893     522 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3556 19/11/1955
10/1893     523 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3557 12/12/1959
10/1893     524 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3558 10/09/1960
10/1893     525 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3559 14/11/1958
10/1893     526 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3560 23/07/1956
10/1893     527 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3561 08/01/1958
10/1893     528 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3562 22/12/1959
11/1893     529 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3563 17/11/1960
11/1893     530 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3564 14/02/1955
11/1893     531 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3565 12/1938
11/1893     532 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3566 12/12/1959
12/1893     533 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3567 25/11/1960
12/1893     534 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3568 26/01/1960
12/1893     644 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   06/1938
01/1894     535 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3569 26/01/1960
01/1894     537 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3570 03/08/1958
01/1894     538 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3571 17/10/1958
02/1894     539 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3572 26/05/1956
02/1894     540 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3573 27/06/1955
02/1894     541 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3574 26/11/1960
02/1894     542 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3575 19/11/1955
03/1894     543 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3576 22/12/1959
03/1894     544 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3577 20/11/1956
03/1894     545 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3578 19/11/1955
03/1894     546 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3579 13/06/1955
03/1894     547 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3580 22/11/1955
03/1894     548 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3581 31/08/1958
08/1894     744 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3615 25/07/1955
08/1894     745 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3616 12/06/1958
08/1894     746 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3617 03/08/1958
09/1894     747 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3618 05/11/1955
09/1894     748 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3619 26/11/1960
09/1894     749 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3620 11/07/1955
10/1894     750 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3621 23/04/1955
10/1894     751 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3622 20/02/1954
10/1894     752 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3623 02/10/1959
11/1894     753 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3624 04/11/1955
11/1894     754 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3625 01/1914
12/1894     755 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3626 01/1914
05/1895     536 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   29/11/1960
09/1895     200 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   29/01/1960
12/1895     756 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   10/1938
01/1896     754 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3813 12/1938
01/1896     755 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3814 08/01/1958
02/1896     17 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3866 10/1956
02/1896     18 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3867 02/1936
02/1896     757 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   08/08/1958
02/1896     786 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3704 03/1935
03/1896     758 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   11/1937
03/1896     787 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3705 28/03/1959
03/1896     788 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3706 10/05/1958
03/1896     789 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3707 12/12/1959
03/1896     790 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3708 01/1939
03/1896     791 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3709 06/1933
04/1896     759 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   12/12/1959
04/1896     792 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3710 26/12/1959
04/1896     793 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3711 19/04/1958
04/1896     794 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3712 16/02/1953
05/1896     760 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   29/01/1960
05/1896     761 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   03/08/1958
05/1896     795 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3713 28/04/1952
05/1896     796 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3714 08/1935
06/1896     762 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   16/12/1955
06/1896     797 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3715 08/08/1959
06/1896     798 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3716 29/12/1956
06/1896     799 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3717 05/12/1959
06/1896     800 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3718 11/1938
07/1896     801 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3719 12/1937
07/1896     802 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3720 22/09/1952
07/1896     803 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3721 08/10/1958
07/1896     804 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3722 09/1937
07/1896     805 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3723 22/09/1956
07/1896     806 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3724 05/1933
07/1896     807 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3725 03/1958
08/1896     808 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3726 11/12/1958
09/1896     201 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   06/12/1960
09/1896     809 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3727 13/12/1958
09/1896     810 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3728 12/1934
09/1896     811 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3729 12/03/1958
10/1896     202 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   02/10/1959
10/1896     812 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3730 10/12/1956
10/1896     813 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3731 09/1934
10/1896     814 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3732 06/1935
11/1896     815 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3733 16/03/1953
11/1896     816 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3734 08/1935
11/1896     817 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3735 09/1938
11/1896     818 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3736 10/12/1947
11/1896     819 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3737 24/03/1952
12/1896     203 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   12/04/1958
12/1896     820 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3738 02/1947
12/1896     821 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3739 06/12/1956
12/1896     822 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3740 10/1936
12/1896     823 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3741 13/06/1953
12/1896     824 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3742 09/06/1952
01/1897     825 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3743 02/1939
01/1897     826 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3744 08/1933
01/1897     827 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3745 15/02/1958
01/1897     828 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3746 26/08/1961
01/1897     829 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3747 10/1938
01/1897     830 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3748 07/1938
02/1897     831 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3749 12/12/1959
02/1897     832 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3750 21/12/1957
02/1897     833 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3751 01/1935
02/1897     834 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3752 10/1938
02/1897     835 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3753 07/06/1958
02/1897     836 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3754 27/10/1952
02/1897     837 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3755 13/12/1956
02/1897     838 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3756 22/12/1952
03/1897     839 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3757 16/05/1953
03/1897     840 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3758 01/1935
03/1897     841 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3759 24/03/1956
03/1897     842 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3760 08/1938
03/1897     843 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3761 10/1938
03/1897     844 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3762 02/1935
04/1897     845 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3763 06/1937
04/1897     846 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3764 12/12/1959
04/1897     847 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3765 06/09/1958
04/1897     848 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3766 15/12/1952
05/1897     849 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3767 13/02/1960
05/1897     850 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3768 28/06/1958
05/1897     851 0-6-0 T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3769 06/10/1956
02/1898     204 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   11/02/1956
02/1898     205 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   03/1943
03/1898     763 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3967 19/11/1955
03/1898     764 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3968 12/03/1955
04/1898     206 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   03/06/1958
05/1898     207 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   11/03/1957
05/1898     765 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3969 03/08/1958
05/1898     766 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3970 08/11/1955
05/1898     767 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3971 10/12/1960
05/1898     768 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3972 17/02/1960
07/1898     769 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3973 23/11/1960
07/1898     770 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3974 18/11/1955
07/1898     771 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3975 04/02/1952
07/1898     772 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3976 07/10/1957
08/1898     773 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3977 21/03/1955
08/1898     774 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3978 01/1939
08/1898     775 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3979 20/01/1960
03/1899     894 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   05/11/1956
03/1899     895 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   12/12/1959
04/1899     896 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   06/10/1959
05/1899     897 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   08/10/1956
06/1899     898 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   24/06/1959
06/1899     899 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   26/11/1956
07/1899     900 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   08/11/1954
08/1899     901 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   24/09/1956
09/1899     902 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   14/12/1957
09/1899     903 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   17/09/1959
10/1899     904 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   09/01/1957
11/1899     905 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   21/09/1957
11/1899     906 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   12/02/1955
11/1899     907 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   26/01/1957
12/1899     908 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   11/02/1959
12/1899     909 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   02/01/1956
01/1900     910 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   09/07/1956
02/1900     911 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   14/09/1957
03/1900     912 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   11/12/1954
03/1900     913 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   06/08/1956
04/1900     914 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   14/03/1955
04/1900     925 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4185 31/08/1958
04/1900     926 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4186 18/01/1957
04/1900     927 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4187 16/10/1956
05/1900     915 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   17/03/1956
05/1900     928 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4188 11/06/1955
05/1900     929 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4189 14/11/1955
05/1900     930 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4190 12/02/1960
05/1900     931 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4191 21/04/1958
05/1900     932 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4192 23/02/1957
05/1900     933 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4193 11/11/1955
05/1900     934 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4194 10/11/1956
05/1900     935 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4195 28/04/1956
06/1900     916 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   12/05/1956
06/1900     917 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   12/12/1959
06/1900     936 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4196 19/03/1960
06/1900     937 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4197 08/06/1959
06/1900     938 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4198 31/08/1958
07/1900     918 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   06/08/1959
07/1900     939 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4199 09/07/1956
07/1900     940 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4200 13/08/1955
09/1900     919 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   11/01/1960
10/1900     920 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   12/12/1959
11/1900     921 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   25/10/1956
12/1900     922 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   09/1957
12/1900     923 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   14/12/1957
12/1900     924 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   25/01/1957
02/1901     74 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   16/02/1953
02/1901     75 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   14/12/1956
02/1901     941 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4248 09/02/1957
02/1901     942 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4249 11/08/1956
02/1901     943 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4250 04/11/1955
02/1901     944 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4251 02/05/1955
03/1901     76 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   08/1947
03/1901     77 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   03/1958
03/1901     945 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4252 02/02/1957
03/1901     946 0-6-2T T. Parker Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4253 10/09/1960
04/1901     79 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   01/1939
04/1901     80 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   07/12/1956
05/1901     81 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   26/09/1959
05/1901     82 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   11/10/1958
06/1901     83 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   24/11/1952
06/1901     84 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   04/1937
06/1901     90 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   22/12/1956
06/1901     94 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   06/12/1956
07/1901     95 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   24/11/1956
08/1901     96 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   12/05/1952
08/1901     97 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   03/10/1959
08/1901     98 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   03/12/1956
09/1901     99 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   10/08/1957
10/1901     100 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   28/02/1959
10/1901     101 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   25/08/1952
11/1901     103 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   22/09/1952
12/1901     116 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   30/03/1953
12/1901     117 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   11/01/1958
01/1902     118 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   14/05/1960
01/1902     119 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   04/08/1952
02/1902     120 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   12/12/1959
02/1902     122 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   02/06/1958
03/1902     130 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   30/03/1953
03/1902     131 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   22/03/1958
04/1902     121 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   03/02/1948
04/1902     124 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   26/08/1961
05/1902     132 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   17/12/1956
05/1902     134 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   17/11/1952
06/1902     141 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   07/07/1956
06/1902     172 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   28/11/1947
06/1902     175 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   12/1958
07/1902     176 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   08/11/1958
08/1902     123 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   12/05/1956
08/1902     125 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   13/12/1958
09/1902     126 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   26/04/1958
10/1902     174 0-6-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   04/11/1947