z Railway Companies

Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 660 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 4115 Week
» 15408 Month
» 280041 Year
» 1501606 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Locomotives of the Hull & Barnsley Railway
Build Date HBR Class LNER Class First HBR Number Wheels Designer Manufacturer Order Number Works Number Withdrawn
03/1892 G2   69 0-6-0T M. Stirling Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ?? 2783 08/1931
08/1892 G2   67 0-6-0T M. Stirling Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ?? 2781 09/1930
08/1892 G2   68 0-6-0T M. Stirling Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ?? 2782 07/1931
11/1901 F2   102 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 4070 07/1938
12/1901 F2   103 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 4071 12/1936
12/1901 F2   104 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 4072 03/1937
12/1901 F2   105 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 4073 30/08/1948
12/1901 F2   106 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 4074 09/1938
12/1901 F2   107 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 4075 10/1938
12/1901 F2   108 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 4076 02/1937
12/1901 F2   109 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 4077 12/1936
12/1901 F2   110 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 4078 10/1936
12/1901 G3   111 0-6-0T M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company E116 655 09/1937
12/1901 G3   112 0-6-0T M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company E116 656 06/1937
12/1901 G3   113 0-6-0T M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company E116 657 05/1937
01/1902 G3   114 0-6-0T M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company E116 658 05/1937
02/1902 G3   115 0-6-0T M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company E116 659 09/1937
02/1902 G3   116 0-6-0T M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company E116 660 05/1937
02/1907 A   117 0-8-0 M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 899 01/10/1931
03/1907 A   118 0-8-0 M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 900 06/08/1931
03/1907 A   119 0-8-0 M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 901 02/05/1931
03/1907 A   120 0-8-0 M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 902 13/08/1931
04/1907 A   122 0-8-0 M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 904 30/10/1931
05/1907 A   123 0-8-0 M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 905 30/10/1931
05/1907 A   124 0-8-0 M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 906 06/08/1931
06/1907 A   125 0-8-0 M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 907 13/08/1931
06/1907 A   126 0-8-0 M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 908 13/08/1931
08/1907 A   121 0-8-0 M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 903 04/11/1931
09/1907 A   127 0-8-0 M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 942 30/10/1931
10/1907 A   128 0-8-0 M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 943 01/10/1931
10/1907 A   129 0-8-0 M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 944 06/08/1931
10/1907 A   130 0-8-0 M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 945 01/10/1931
11/1907 A   131 0-8-0 M. Stirling Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 946 01/10/1931
01/1908 G3   142 0-6-0T M. Stirling Kitson ?? 4545 06/1938
01/1908 G3   143 0-6-0T M. Stirling Kitson ?? 4546 05/1937
01/1908 G3   144 0-6-0T M. Stirling Kitson ?? 4547 06/1937
02/1908 G3   145 0-6-0T M. Stirling Kitson ?? 4548 05/1937
02/1908 G3   146 0-6-0T M. Stirling Kitson ?? 4549 09/1937
02/1908 G3   147 0-6-0T M. Stirling Kitson ?? 4550 03/1939
02/1908 G3   148 0-6-0T M. Stirling Kitson ?? 4551 07/1937
02/1908 G3   149 0-6-0T M. Stirling Kitson ?? 4552 05/1937
02/1908 G3   150 0-6-0T M. Stirling Kitson ?? 4553 06/1937
03/1908 G3   151 0-6-0T M. Stirling Kitson ?? 4554 01/1949
11/1913 F3   13 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 3008 26/06/1948
12/1913 F3   15 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 3009 21/08/1952
12/1913 F3   18 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 3010 24/11/1952
12/1913 F3   23 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 3011 04/05/1953
01/1914 F3   152 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 3013 18/05/1955
01/1914 F3   27 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 3012 22/10/1956
02/1914 F3   153 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 3014 20/12/1954
02/1914 F3   154 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 3015 05/07/1955
03/1914 F3   155 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 3016 26/05/1952
03/1914 F3   156 0-6-2T M. Stirling   ?? 3017 05/07/1955