07/1883 |
Y14 |
|
610 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y14 |
|
10/1929 |
07/1883 |
Y14 |
|
611 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y14 |
|
08/1926 |
07/1883 |
Y14 |
|
612 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y14 |
|
01/1932 |
08/1883 |
Y14 |
|
613 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y14 |
|
06/1931 |
08/1883 |
Y14 |
|
614 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y14 |
|
09/1926 |
09/1883 |
Y14 |
|
615 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y14 |
|
10/1926 |
09/1883 |
Y14 |
|
616 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y14 |
|
07/1929 |
09/1883 |
Y14 |
|
617 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y14 |
|
10/1926 |
10/1883 |
Y14 |
|
618 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y14 |
|
07/1929 |
10/1883 |
Y14 |
|
619 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y14 |
|
05/1922 |
03/1884 |
Y14 |
|
620 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
10/1926 |
03/1884 |
Y14 |
|
621 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
07/1932 |
03/1884 |
Y14 |
|
622 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
10/1926 |
03/1884 |
Y14 |
|
623 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
07/1933 |
03/1884 |
Y14 |
|
624 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
05/1922 |
03/1884 |
Y14 |
|
625 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
06/1932 |
03/1884 |
Y14 |
|
626 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
10/1922 |
03/1884 |
Y14 |
|
627 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
11/1933 |
03/1884 |
Y14 |
|
628 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
12/1931 |
03/1884 |
Y14 |
|
629 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
09/1926 |
04/1884 |
Y14 |
|
37 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3146 |
08/1923 |
04/1884 |
Y14 |
|
38 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3147 |
09/1932 |
04/1884 |
Y14 |
|
39 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3148 |
03/1933 |
04/1884 |
Y14 |
|
40 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3149 |
10/1922 |
04/1884 |
Y14 |
|
41 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3150 |
06/1934 |
05/1884 |
Y14 |
|
119 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3151 |
09/1929 |
05/1884 |
Y14 |
|
120 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3152 |
02/1928 |
05/1884 |
Y14 |
|
121 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3153 |
03/1933 |
05/1884 |
Y14 |
|
122 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3154 |
01/1930 |
05/1884 |
Y14 |
|
123 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3155 |
07/1922 |
05/1884 |
Y14 |
|
124 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3156 |
07/1933 |
05/1884 |
Y14 |
|
592 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3157 |
08/1928 |
05/1884 |
Y14 |
|
630 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
06/1929 |
05/1884 |
Y14 |
|
631 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
12/1933 |
05/1884 |
Y14 |
|
632 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
05/1922 |
06/1884 |
Y14 |
|
593 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3158 |
12/1926 |
06/1884 |
Y14 |
|
594 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3159 |
07/1926 |
06/1884 |
Y14 |
|
595 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3160 |
06/1929 |
06/1884 |
Y14 |
|
633 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
08/1926 |
06/1884 |
Y14 |
|
634 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
01/1929 |
06/1884 |
Y14 |
|
635 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
04/1936 |
07/1884 |
Y14 |
|
596 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3161 |
11/1932 |
07/1884 |
Y14 |
|
597 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3162 |
04/1928 |
07/1884 |
Y14 |
|
598 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3163 |
09/1926 |
07/1884 |
Y14 |
|
599 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3164 |
05/1931 |
07/1884 |
Y14 |
|
636 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
05/1929 |
07/1884 |
Y14 |
|
637 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
05/1922 |
07/1884 |
Y14 |
|
638 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
06/1936 |
07/1884 |
M15 |
|
650 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
M15 |
|
06/1927 |
07/1884 |
M15 |
|
651 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
M15 |
|
12/1914 |
08/1884 |
Y14 |
|
639 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
K15 |
|
06/1928 |
08/1884 |
M15 |
|
652 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
M15 |
|
10/1913 |
09/1884 |
M15 |
|
653 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
M15 |
|
08/1923 |
09/1884 |
M15 |
|
654 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
M15 |
|
11/1927 |
09/1884 |
M15 |
|
655 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
M15 |
|
10/1926 |
11/1884 |
M15 |
|
656 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
M15 |
|
12/1922 |
11/1884 |
M15 |
|
657 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
M15 |
|
05/1926 |
11/1884 |
M15 |
|
658 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
M15 |
|
06/1914 |
11/1884 |
M15 |
|
659 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
M15 |
|
09/1925 |
12/1884 |
M15 |
|
660 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
01/1926 |
01/1885 |
M15 |
|
661 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
09/1913 |
02/1885 |
Y14 |
|
680 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N16 |
|
06/1932 |
02/1885 |
Y14 |
|
681 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N16 |
|
10/1932 |
02/1885 |
Y14 |
|
682 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N16 |
|
01/1932 |
02/1885 |
Y14 |
|
683 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N16 |
|
11/1931 |
02/1885 |
Y14 |
|
684 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N16 |
|
06/1932 |
02/1885 |
Y14 |
|
685 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N16 |
|
10/1929 |
02/1885 |
Y14 |
|
686 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N16 |
|
06/1928 |
02/1885 |
Y14 |
|
687 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N16 |
|
05/1922 |
02/1885 |
Y14 |
|
688 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N16 |
|
08/1923 |
02/1885 |
Y14 |
|
689 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N16 |
|
06/1936 |
03/1885 |
M15 |
|
662 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
11/1926 |
03/1885 |
M15 |
|
663 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
09/1925 |
04/1885 |
M15 |
|
664 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
09/1915 |
05/1885 |
M15 |
|
665 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
08/1926 |
06/1885 |
M15 |
|
666 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
03/1926 |
07/1885 |
M15 |
|
667 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
12/1922 |
07/1885 |
M15 |
|
668 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
03/1926 |
07/1885 |
M15 |
|
669 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
09/1926 |
08/1885 |
M15 |
|
670 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
09/1927 |
09/1885 |
M15 |
|
671 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
12/1922 |
10/1885 |
M15 |
|
672 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
09/1913 |
10/1885 |
M15 |
|
674 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
02/1926 |
11/1885 |
Y14 |
|
690 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P17 |
|
06/1938 |
11/1885 |
Y14 |
|
691 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P17 |
|
03/1929 |
12/1885 |
M15 |
|
673 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
12/1914 |
12/1885 |
M15 |
|
675 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
08/1927 |
12/1885 |
Y14 |
|
692 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P17 |
|
04/1929 |
12/1885 |
Y14 |
|
693 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P17 |
|
07/1928 |
12/1885 |
Y14 |
|
696 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P17 |
|
03/1938 |
01/1886 |
M15 |
|
676 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
02/1926 |
01/1886 |
Y14 |
|
694 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P17 |
|
10/1931 |
01/1886 |
Y14 |
|
695 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P17 |
|
03/1922 |
01/1886 |
Y14 |
|
697 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P17 |
|
10/1929 |
02/1886 |
M15 |
|
677 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
04/1925 |
02/1886 |
M15 |
|
679 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
07/1925 |
02/1886 |
Y14 |
|
698 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P17 |
|
10/1936 |
03/1886 |
M15 |
|
678 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E16 |
|
11/1929 |
03/1886 |
Y14 |
|
699 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P17 |
|
07/1934 |
04/1886 |
Y14 |
|
800 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
M18 |
|
10/1935 |
04/1886 |
Y14 |
|
801 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
M18 |
|
01/1935 |
05/1886 |
T18 |
|
276 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T18 |
|
07/1937 |
05/1886 |
Y14 |
|
802 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
M18 |
|
01/1929 |
05/1886 |
Y14 |
|
803 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
M18 |
|
12/1935 |
05/1886 |
Y14 |
|
804 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
M18 |
|
05/1922 |
06/1886 |
T18 |
|
275 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T18 |
|
06/1938 |
06/1886 |
T18 |
|
277 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T18 |
|
07/1938 |
06/1886 |
T18 |
|
278 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T18 |
|
10/1936 |
06/1886 |
T18 |
|
279 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T18 |
|
05/1937 |
06/1886 |
T18 |
|
280 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T18 |
|
07/1936 |
06/1886 |
T18 |
|
281 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T18 |
|
|
06/1886 |
T18 |
|
282 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T18 |
|
02/1940 |
07/1886 |
T18 |
|
283 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T18 |
|
07/1939 |
07/1886 |
T18 |
|
284 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T18 |
|
05/1937 |
07/1886 |
Y14 |
|
805 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
M18 |
|
04/1928 |
07/1886 |
Y14 |
|
806 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
M18 |
|
10/1939 |
07/1886 |
Y14 |
|
807 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
M18 |
|
03/1929 |
08/1886 |
Y14 |
|
808 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
M18 |
|
05/1922 |
08/1886 |
Y14 |
|
809 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
M18 |
|
08/1936 |
09/1886 |
|
|
791 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O18 |
|
11/1924 |
09/1886 |
|
|
800 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O18 |
|
02/1927 |
10/1886 |
|
|
792 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O18 |
|
10/1926 |
10/1886 |
|
|
793 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O18 |
|
08/1923 |
11/1886 |
|
|
794 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O18 |
|
06/1925 |
11/1886 |
|
|
795 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O18 |
|
06/1927 |
11/1886 |
Y14 |
|
810 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X18 |
|
01/1929 |
12/1886 |
|
|
796 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O18 |
|
10/1924 |
12/1886 |
Y14 |
|
811 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X18 |
|
03/1922 |
12/1886 |
Y14 |
|
812 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X18 |
|
02/1929 |
12/1886 |
Y14 |
|
813 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X18 |
|
02/1951 |
12/1886 |
Y14 |
|
814 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X18 |
|
08/1938 |
01/1887 |
|
|
797 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O18 |
|
05/1927 |
01/1887 |
|
|
798 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O18 |
|
03/1927 |
01/1887 |
|
|
799 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O18 |
|
03/1926 |
01/1887 |
Y14 |
|
815 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X18 |
|
06/1936 |
01/1887 |
Y14 |
|
816 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X18 |
|
01/1930 |
02/1887 |
T18 |
|
285 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
10/1939 |
02/1887 |
T18 |
|
286 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
09/1939 |
02/1887 |
Y14 |
|
817 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X18 |
|
03/1936 |
02/1887 |
Y14 |
|
818 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X18 |
|
11/1938 |
02/1887 |
Y14 |
|
819 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X18 |
|
04/1938 |
03/1887 |
T18 |
|
287 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
10/1936 |
03/1887 |
T18 |
|
288 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
19/04/1954 |
03/1887 |
T18 |
|
289 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
02/1951 |
04/1887 |
T18 |
|
290 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
28/01/1952 |
04/1887 |
T18 |
|
291 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
02/1939 |
04/1887 |
T18 |
|
292 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
10/1936 |
04/1887 |
T18 |
|
294 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
07/1937 |
05/1887 |
T18 |
|
293 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
14/06/1954 |
05/1887 |
T18 |
|
295 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
12/1938 |
06/1887 |
T18 |
|
297 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
05/1939 |
06/1887 |
T18 |
|
298 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
07/1951 |
09/1887 |
T18 |
|
299 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
06/1937 |
09/1887 |
T18 |
|
300 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
04/1939 |
09/1887 |
T18 |
|
301 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
08/1939 |
09/1887 |
T18 |
|
302 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
05/1939 |
09/1887 |
T18 |
|
303 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
10/1936 |
09/1887 |
T18 |
|
304 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
05/1951 |
09/1887 |
Y14 |
|
820 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
D20 |
|
07/1928 |
09/1887 |
Y14 |
|
821 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
D20 |
|
05/1949 |
09/1887 |
Y14 |
|
822 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
D20 |
|
10/1922 |
09/1887 |
Y14 |
|
823 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
D20 |
|
05/1937 |
09/1887 |
Y14 |
|
824 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
D20 |
|
01/1936 |
09/1887 |
Y14 |
|
825 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
D20 |
|
29/05/1948 |
09/1887 |
Y14 |
|
826 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
D20 |
|
09/1929 |
09/1887 |
Y14 |
|
827 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
D20 |
|
02/1929 |
09/1887 |
Y14 |
|
828 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
D20 |
|
12/1949 |
09/1887 |
Y14 |
|
829 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
D20 |
|
08/1936 |
10/1887 |
T18 |
|
296 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K19 |
|
24/11/1952 |
10/1887 |
Y14 |
|
527 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U20 |
|
02/1951 |
10/1887 |
Y14 |
|
528 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U20 |
|
02/1930 |
11/1887 |
Y14 |
|
529 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U20 |
|
12/1931 |
11/1887 |
Y14 |
|
530 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U20 |
|
04/1951 |
11/1887 |
Y14 |
|
531 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U20 |
|
08/1928 |
01/1888 |
Y14 |
|
532 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U20 |
|
08/04/1957 |
01/1888 |
Y14 |
|
533 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U20 |
|
05/1928 |
01/1888 |
Y14 |
|
534 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U20 |
|
05/1929 |
01/1888 |
Y14 |
|
535 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U20 |
|
03/1936 |
01/1888 |
Y14 |
|
536 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U20 |
|
08/1923 |
06/1888 |
T18 |
|
307 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H21 |
|
09/1952 |
06/1888 |
T18 |
|
308 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H21 |
|
10/1936 |
07/1888 |
T18 |
|
309 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H21 |
|
20/11/1950 |
07/1888 |
T18 |
|
310 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H21 |
|
03/1952 |
07/1888 |
T18 |
|
311 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H21 |
|
10/1950 |
07/1888 |
T18 |
|
312 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H21 |
|
01/1939 |
08/1888 |
T18 |
|
313 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H21 |
|
06/1952 |
08/1888 |
T18 |
|
314 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H21 |
|
07/1937 |
08/1888 |
T18 |
|
316 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H21 |
|
07/1937 |
10/1888 |
Y14 |
|
537 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R21 |
|
08/1923 |
10/1888 |
Y14 |
|
538 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R21 |
|
12/1938 |
10/1888 |
Y14 |
|
539 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R21 |
|
06/1936 |
10/1888 |
Y14 |
|
540 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R21 |
|
09/1949 |
10/1888 |
Y14 |
|
541 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R21 |
|
09/1936 |
10/1888 |
Y14 |
|
830 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R21 |
|
08/1947 |
10/1888 |
Y14 |
|
831 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R21 |
|
11/1936 |
10/1888 |
Y14 |
|
832 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R21 |
|
08/1923 |
10/1888 |
Y14 |
|
833 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R21 |
|
05/12/1955 |
10/1888 |
Y14 |
|
834 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R21 |
|
11/1947 |
11/1888 |
T18 |
|
315 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H21 |
|
02/1937 |
11/1888 |
T18 |
|
317 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T21 |
|
06/1937 |
11/1888 |
T18 |
|
318 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T21 |
|
03/1937 |
11/1888 |
T18 |
|
319 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T21 |
|
17/10/1955 |
11/1888 |
T18 |
|
320 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T21 |
|
04/1950 |
11/1888 |
T18 |
|
321 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T21 |
|
04/06/1951 |
12/1888 |
T18 |
|
322 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T21 |
|
04/1950 |
12/1888 |
T18 |
|
323 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T21 |
|
02/1951 |
12/1888 |
T18 |
|
324 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T21 |
|
28/04/1952 |
12/1888 |
T18 |
|
325 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T21 |
|
07/1937 |
12/1888 |
T18 |
|
326 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T21 |
|
07/1937 |
02/1889 |
E22 |
|
150 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E22 |
|
06/1937 |
02/1889 |
E22 |
|
151 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E22 |
|
07/1937 |
02/1889 |
E22 |
|
152 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E22 |
|
10/1935 |
02/1889 |
E22 |
|
153 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E22 |
|
09/1931 |
02/1889 |
E22 |
|
154 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E22 |
|
04/1932 |
02/1889 |
E22 |
|
155 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E22 |
|
23/11/1953 |
03/1889 |
E22 |
|
156 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E22 |
|
08/1937 |
03/1889 |
E22 |
|
157 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E22 |
|
11/1947 |
03/1889 |
E22 |
|
158 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E22 |
|
03/1932 |
06/1889 |
E22 |
|
159 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E22 |
|
05/1937 |
07/1889 |
Y14 |
|
835 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T22 |
|
09/1936 |
07/1889 |
Y14 |
|
836 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T22 |
|
16/09/1962 |
07/1889 |
Y14 |
|
837 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T22 |
|
07/1951 |
07/1889 |
Y14 |
|
838 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T22 |
|
07/1934 |
07/1889 |
Y14 |
|
839 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T22 |
|
07/1936 |
07/1889 |
Y14 |
|
840 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T22 |
|
08/1949 |
07/1889 |
Y14 |
|
841 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T22 |
|
06/1936 |
07/1889 |
Y14 |
|
842 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T22 |
|
11/1934 |
07/1889 |
Y14 |
|
843 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T22 |
|
06/1949 |
07/1889 |
Y14 |
|
844 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T22 |
|
08/1936 |
10/1889 |
Y14 |
|
845 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R23 |
|
12/1938 |
10/1889 |
Y14 |
|
846 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R23 |
|
07/1950 |
10/1889 |
Y14 |
|
847 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R23 |
|
02/06/1952 |
10/1889 |
Y14 |
|
848 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R23 |
|
01/1950 |
10/1889 |
Y14 |
|
849 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R23 |
|
29/05/1948 |
10/1889 |
Y14 |
|
850 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R23 |
|
02/1951 |
10/1889 |
Y14 |
|
851 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R23 |
|
10/1936 |
10/1889 |
Y14 |
|
852 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R23 |
|
26/05/1956 |
10/1889 |
Y14 |
|
853 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R23 |
|
12/1949 |
10/1889 |
Y14 |
|
854 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
R23 |
|
09/1949 |
10/1889 |
Y14 |
|
855 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T23 |
|
25/11/1950 |
10/1889 |
Y14 |
|
856 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T23 |
|
10/1936 |
11/1889 |
Y14 |
|
857 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T23 |
|
25/11/1950 |
11/1889 |
Y14 |
|
858 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T23 |
|
03/1923 |
11/1889 |
Y14 |
|
859 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T23 |
|
06/1939 |
11/1889 |
Y14 |
|
860 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T23 |
|
11/1949 |
11/1889 |
Y14 |
|
861 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T23 |
|
09/1936 |
11/1889 |
Y14 |
|
862 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T23 |
|
11/1938 |
11/1889 |
Y14 |
|
863 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T23 |
|
10/1936 |
11/1889 |
Y14 |
|
864 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
T23 |
|
04/1939 |
11/1889 |
Y14 |
|
865 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y23 |
|
06/1949 |
12/1889 |
Y14 |
|
866 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y23 |
|
02/1951 |
12/1889 |
Y14 |
|
867 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y23 |
|
05/1937 |
12/1889 |
Y14 |
|
868 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y23 |
|
12/1934 |
12/1889 |
Y14 |
|
869 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y23 |
|
23/04/1951 |
12/1889 |
Y14 |
|
870 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y23 |
|
10/1934 |
12/1889 |
Y14 |
|
871 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y23 |
|
09/1949 |
12/1889 |
Y14 |
|
872 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y23 |
|
13/01/1948 |
12/1889 |
Y14 |
|
873 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y23 |
|
12/1934 |
12/1889 |
Y14 |
|
874 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y23 |
|
25/11/1948 |
03/1890 |
R24 |
|
327 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R24 |
|
07/05/1958 |
03/1890 |
R24 |
|
328 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R24 |
|
03/06/1958 |
03/1890 |
R24 |
|
329 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R24 |
|
22/06/1956 |
03/1890 |
R24 |
|
330 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R24 |
|
10/1954 |
03/1890 |
R24 |
|
331 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R24 |
|
08/04/1958 |
04/1890 |
R24 |
|
332 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R24 |
|
07/05/1958 |
04/1890 |
R24 |
|
333 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R24 |
|
09/1939 |
04/1890 |
R24 |
|
334 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R24 |
|
14/05/1956 |
04/1890 |
R24 |
|
335 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R24 |
|
19/09/1960 |
04/1890 |
R24 |
|
336 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R24 |
|
03/08/1959 |
04/1890 |
R24 |
|
337 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S24 |
|
16/09/1962 |
05/1890 |
R24 |
|
338 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S24 |
|
13/01/1961 |
05/1890 |
R24 |
|
339 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S24 |
|
16/08/1960 |
05/1890 |
R24 |
|
340 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S24 |
|
06/02/1961 |
05/1890 |
R24 |
|
341 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S24 |
|
03/01/1957 |
05/1890 |
R24 |
|
342 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S24 |
|
23/01/1956 |
05/1890 |
R24 |
|
343 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S24 |
|
11/11/1953 |
05/1890 |
R24 |
|
344 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S24 |
|
10/1940 |
05/1890 |
R24 |
|
345 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S24 |
|
06/06/1960 |
05/1890 |
R24 |
|
346 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S24 |
|
02/02/1961 |
08/1890 |
Y14 |
|
875 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U25 |
|
03/1952 |
08/1890 |
Y14 |
|
876 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U25 |
|
06/02/1948 |
08/1890 |
Y14 |
|
877 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U25 |
|
28/03/1955 |
08/1890 |
Y14 |
|
878 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U25 |
|
27/11/1948 |
08/1890 |
Y14 |
|
879 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U25 |
|
04/1929 |
09/1890 |
Y14 |
|
880 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U25 |
|
01/1950 |
09/1890 |
Y14 |
|
881 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U25 |
|
08/1949 |
09/1890 |
Y14 |
|
882 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U25 |
|
07/1922 |
09/1890 |
Y14 |
|
883 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U25 |
|
22/05/1959 |
09/1890 |
Y14 |
|
884 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
U25 |
|
07/1922 |
09/1890 |
Y14 |
|
885 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y25 |
|
05/1922 |
10/1890 |
Y14 |
|
886 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y25 |
|
12/04/1960 |
10/1890 |
Y14 |
|
887 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y25 |
|
13/12/1958 |
10/1890 |
Y14 |
|
888 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y25 |
|
01/12/1958 |
10/1890 |
Y14 |
|
889 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y25 |
|
10/1935 |
10/1890 |
Y14 |
|
890 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y25 |
|
02/1935 |
11/1890 |
R24 |
|
397 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A26 |
|
22/03/1954 |
11/1890 |
R24 |
|
398 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A26 |
|
28/09/1959 |
11/1890 |
R24 |
|
399 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A26 |
|
14/12/1956 |
11/1890 |
R24 |
|
400 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A26 |
|
01/04/1957 |
11/1890 |
R24 |
|
401 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A26 |
|
18/10/1960 |
11/1890 |
R24 |
|
402 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A26 |
|
05/1937 |
11/1890 |
Y14 |
|
891 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y25 |
|
01/1935 |
11/1890 |
Y14 |
|
892 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y25 |
|
05/1949 |
11/1890 |
Y14 |
|
893 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y25 |
|
08/1949 |
11/1890 |
Y14 |
|
894 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
Y25 |
|
29/05/1948 |
12/1890 |
R24 |
|
403 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A26 |
|
25/07/1955 |
12/1890 |
R24 |
|
404 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A26 |
|
05/1937 |
12/1890 |
R24 |
|
405 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A26 |
|
09/01/1957 |
12/1890 |
R24 |
|
406 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A26 |
|
07/1937 |
12/1890 |
R24 |
|
407 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B26 |
|
29/04/1957 |
12/1890 |
R24 |
|
408 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B26 |
|
01/03/1956 |
12/1890 |
R24 |
|
409 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B26 |
|
18/02/1958 |
01/1891 |
R24 |
|
410 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B26 |
|
06/08/1958 |
01/1891 |
R24 |
|
411 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B26 |
|
17/08/1959 |
01/1891 |
R24 |
|
412 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B26 |
|
17/08/1956 |
01/1891 |
R24 |
|
413 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B26 |
|
06/1937 |
01/1891 |
R24 |
|
414 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B26 |
|
17/03/1961 |
01/1891 |
R24 |
|
415 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B26 |
|
05/12/1955 |
01/1891 |
R24 |
|
416 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B26 |
|
06/1937 |
02/1891 |
T26 |
|
417 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T26 |
|
01/1930 |
03/1891 |
T26 |
|
418 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T26 |
|
09/1934 |
03/1891 |
T26 |
|
419 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T26 |
|
05/1926 |
03/1891 |
T26 |
|
423 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T26 |
|
07/1926 |
03/1891 |
T26 |
|
424 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T26 |
|
01/1929 |
03/1891 |
T26 |
|
425 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T26 |
|
02/1927 |
03/1891 |
T26 |
|
426 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T26 |
|
10/1926 |
04/1891 |
T26 |
|
420 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T26 |
|
03/1927 |
04/1891 |
T26 |
|
421 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T26 |
|
11/1938 |
04/1891 |
T26 |
|
422 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T26 |
|
09/1929 |
04/1891 |
T26 |
|
427 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y26 |
|
26/09/1955 |
04/1891 |
T26 |
|
428 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y26 |
|
05/1929 |
04/1891 |
T26 |
|
429 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y26 |
|
10/1929 |
04/1891 |
T26 |
|
430 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y26 |
|
04/1926 |
04/1891 |
T26 |
|
431 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y26 |
|
06/1926 |
04/1891 |
T26 |
|
432 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y26 |
|
07/1929 |
04/1891 |
T26 |
|
434 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y26 |
|
12/1933 |
04/1891 |
T26 |
|
435 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y26 |
|
03/1928 |
05/1891 |
T26 |
|
433 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y26 |
|
04/1927 |
05/1891 |
T26 |
|
436 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y26 |
|
06/1929 |
05/1891 |
T26 |
|
437 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A27 |
|
02/1927 |
05/1891 |
T26 |
|
438 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A27 |
|
05/1926 |
05/1891 |
T26 |
|
440 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A27 |
|
06/1929 |
05/1891 |
T26 |
|
441 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A27 |
|
06/1937 |
06/1891 |
T26 |
|
439 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A27 |
|
08/1927 |
06/1891 |
T26 |
|
442 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A27 |
|
12/1927 |
06/1891 |
T26 |
|
443 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A27 |
|
10/1931 |
06/1891 |
T26 |
|
444 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A27 |
|
06/1934 |
06/1891 |
T26 |
|
445 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A27 |
|
01/1927 |
06/1891 |
T26 |
|
446 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A27 |
|
04/1926 |
09/1891 |
Y14 |
|
895 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
L28 |
|
05/1949 |
09/1891 |
Y14 |
|
896 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
L28 |
|
03/1939 |
09/1891 |
Y14 |
|
897 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
L28 |
|
03/1951 |
09/1891 |
Y14 |
|
898 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
L28 |
|
09/1949 |
09/1891 |
Y14 |
|
899 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
L28 |
|
01/1938 |
09/1891 |
Y14 |
|
900 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
L28 |
|
12/1934 |
10/1891 |
Y14 |
|
901 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
L28 |
|
18/02/1952 |
10/1891 |
Y14 |
|
902 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
L28 |
|
12/03/1948 |
10/1891 |
Y14 |
|
903 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
L28 |
|
02/1938 |
10/1891 |
Y14 |
|
904 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
L28 |
|
18/02/1948 |
10/1891 |
Y14 |
|
905 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N28 |
|
03/1939 |
10/1891 |
Y14 |
|
906 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N28 |
|
09/1951 |
10/1891 |
Y14 |
|
907 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N28 |
|
25/11/1950 |
10/1891 |
Y14 |
|
908 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N28 |
|
08/1947 |
11/1891 |
Y14 |
|
909 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N28 |
|
01/1935 |
11/1891 |
Y14 |
|
910 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N28 |
|
10/1956 |
11/1891 |
Y14 |
|
911 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N28 |
|
16/08/1958 |
11/1891 |
Y14 |
|
912 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N28 |
|
10/1938 |
11/1891 |
Y14 |
|
913 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N28 |
|
04/1951 |
11/1891 |
Y14 |
|
914 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
N28 |
|
05/04/1951 |
11/1891 |
Y14 |
|
915 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P28 |
|
10/12/1951 |
11/1891 |
Y14 |
|
916 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P28 |
|
04/1937 |
11/1891 |
Y14 |
|
917 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P28 |
|
03/1939 |
11/1891 |
Y14 |
|
918 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P28 |
|
11/1949 |
12/1891 |
Y14 |
|
919 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P28 |
|
06/1936 |
12/1891 |
Y14 |
|
920 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P28 |
|
06/02/1948 |
12/1891 |
Y14 |
|
921 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P28 |
|
15/04/1948 |
12/1891 |
Y14 |
|
922 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P28 |
|
24/10/1949 |
12/1891 |
Y14 |
|
923 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P28 |
|
10/1934 |
12/1891 |
Y14 |
|
924 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
P28 |
|
25/11/1950 |
12/1891 |
Y14 |
|
925 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S28 |
|
11/1949 |
12/1891 |
Y14 |
|
926 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S28 |
|
05/1949 |
12/1891 |
Y14 |
|
927 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S28 |
|
12/1949 |
12/1891 |
Y14 |
|
928 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S28 |
|
20/08/1956 |
12/1891 |
Y14 |
|
929 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S28 |
|
12/03/1948 |
12/1891 |
Y14 |
|
930 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S28 |
|
01/1935 |
01/1892 |
Y14 |
|
931 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S28 |
|
02/1950 |
01/1892 |
Y14 |
|
932 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S28 |
|
01/08/1962 |
01/1892 |
Y14 |
|
933 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S28 |
|
03/1936 |
01/1892 |
Y14 |
|
934 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S28 |
|
17/03/1948 |
02/1892 |
R24 |
|
347 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P29 |
|
16/06/1959 |
02/1892 |
R24 |
|
348 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P29 |
|
14/12/1953 |
03/1892 |
R24 |
|
349 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P29 |
|
03/10/1960 |
03/1892 |
R24 |
|
350 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P29 |
|
20/06/1958 |
03/1892 |
R24 |
|
351 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P29 |
|
28/10/1959 |
03/1892 |
R24 |
|
352 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P29 |
|
18/08/1958 |
03/1892 |
R24 |
|
353 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P29 |
|
14/02/1961 |
03/1892 |
R24 |
|
354 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P29 |
|
08/10/1955 |
03/1892 |
R24 |
|
355 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P29 |
|
16/12/1958 |
03/1892 |
R24 |
|
356 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P29 |
|
14/07/1953 |
04/1892 |
R24 |
|
357 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R29 |
|
30/08/1954 |
04/1892 |
R24 |
|
358 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R29 |
|
20/08/1959 |
04/1892 |
R24 |
|
359 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R29 |
|
21/02/1958 |
04/1892 |
R24 |
|
360 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R29 |
|
20/06/1958 |
04/1892 |
R24 |
|
361 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R29 |
|
10/09/1961 |
04/1892 |
R24 |
|
362 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R29 |
|
10/1940 |
05/1892 |
R24 |
|
363 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R29 |
|
16/01/1956 |
05/1892 |
R24 |
|
364 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R29 |
|
01/1931 |
05/1892 |
R24 |
|
365 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R29 |
|
12/08/1958 |
05/1892 |
R24 |
|
366 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R29 |
|
16/09/1962 |
08/1892 |
Y14 |
|
936 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X28 |
|
04/1937 |
08/1892 |
Y14 |
|
937 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X28 |
|
04/07/1955 |
08/1892 |
Y14 |
|
938 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X28 |
|
10/1934 |
08/1892 |
Y14 |
|
939 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X28 |
|
02/1936 |
08/1892 |
Y14 |
|
940 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X28 |
|
25/11/1950 |
08/1892 |
Y14 |
|
941 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X28 |
|
18/12/1959 |
09/1892 |
T26 |
|
447 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Z30 |
|
09/1926 |
09/1892 |
T26 |
|
448 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Z30 |
|
01/1930 |
09/1892 |
T26 |
|
449 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Z30 |
|
02/1930 |
09/1892 |
T26 |
|
450 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Z30 |
|
05/1927 |
09/1892 |
T26 |
|
451 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Z30 |
|
02/1929 |
09/1892 |
Y14 |
|
942 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X28 |
|
01/10/1956 |
09/1892 |
Y14 |
|
943 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X28 |
|
21/05/1951 |
09/1892 |
Y14 |
|
944 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X28 |
|
02/1935 |
10/1892 |
T26 |
|
452 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Z30 |
|
09/1929 |
10/1892 |
T26 |
|
453 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Z30 |
|
03/1935 |
10/1892 |
T26 |
|
454 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Z30 |
|
06/1928 |
10/1892 |
T26 |
|
455 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Z30 |
|
03/1934 |
11/1892 |
T26 |
|
456 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Z30 |
|
12/1928 |
11/1892 |
T26 |
|
457 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A31 |
|
06/1931 |
11/1892 |
T26 |
|
458 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A31 |
|
08/1937 |
11/1892 |
T26 |
|
459 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A31 |
|
03/1935 |
11/1892 |
T26 |
|
460 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A31 |
|
04/1929 |
11/1892 |
T26 |
|
461 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A31 |
|
09/1931 |
11/1892 |
T26 |
|
462 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A31 |
|
05/1937 |
11/1892 |
T26 |
|
463 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A31 |
|
02/01/1956 |
11/1892 |
T26 |
|
464 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A31 |
|
12/1933 |
11/1892 |
Y14 |
|
945 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X28 |
|
25/11/1950 |
12/1892 |
T26 |
|
465 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A31 |
|
07/1928 |
12/1892 |
T26 |
|
466 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A31 |
|
29/11/1954 |
12/1892 |
T26 |
|
467 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C31 |
|
04/1937 |
12/1892 |
T26 |
|
468 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C31 |
|
08/1929 |
12/1892 |
T26 |
|
469 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C31 |
|
06/1929 |
12/1892 |
T26 |
|
470 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C31 |
|
05/1934 |
12/1892 |
T26 |
|
471 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C31 |
|
09/1929 |
12/1892 |
T26 |
|
472 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C31 |
|
05/1938 |
1893 |
N31 |
|
979 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H33 |
763 |
1913 |
1893 |
N31 |
|
980 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H33 |
764 |
09/1923 |
1893 |
N31 |
|
981 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H33 |
765 |
04/1925 |
1893 |
N31 |
|
982 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H33 |
766 |
1910 |
1893 |
N31 |
|
983 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H33 |
767 |
01/1925 |
1893 |
N31 |
|
984 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H33 |
768 |
02/1925 |
1893 |
N31 |
|
985 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H33 |
769 |
12/1923 |
1893 |
N31 |
|
986 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H33 |
770 |
1922 |
1893 |
N31 |
|
987 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H33 |
771 |
04/1925 |
1893 |
N31 |
|
988 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H33 |
772 |
1911 |
01/1893 |
T26 |
|
473 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C31 |
|
12/1935 |
01/1893 |
T26 |
|
474 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C31 |
|
04/1929 |
01/1893 |
T26 |
|
475 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C31 |
|
05/1931 |
01/1893 |
T26 |
|
476 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C31 |
|
03/1937 |
01/1893 |
N31 |
|
999 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N31 |
722 |
1920 |
02/1893 |
E22 |
|
245 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B32 |
|
01/1931 |
02/1893 |
E22 |
|
246 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B32 |
|
12/1930 |
02/1893 |
E22 |
|
247 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B32 |
|
06/02/1948 |
03/1893 |
E22 |
|
248 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B32 |
|
05/1936 |
03/1893 |
E22 |
|
249 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B32 |
|
07/1937 |
03/1893 |
E22 |
|
250 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B32 |
|
22/10/1956 |
03/1893 |
E22 |
|
251 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B32 |
|
12/1931 |
03/1893 |
E22 |
|
252 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B32 |
|
08/1935 |
04/1893 |
C32 |
|
1090 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
C32 |
|
10/1936 |
04/1893 |
C32 |
|
1091 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
C32 |
|
07/1938 |
04/1893 |
E22 |
|
253 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B32 |
|
05/1949 |
04/1893 |
E22 |
|
254 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B32 |
|
06/1937 |
05/1893 |
C32 |
|
1092 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C32 |
|
12/03/1948 |
05/1893 |
C32 |
|
1093 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C32 |
|
13/05/1948 |
05/1893 |
C32 |
|
1094 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
C32 |
|
11/1947 |
06/1893 |
C32 |
|
1095 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C32 |
|
13/05/1948 |
06/1893 |
C32 |
|
1096 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
C32 |
|
08/1947 |
06/1893 |
C32 |
|
1097 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C32 |
|
18/02/1948 |
06/1893 |
C32 |
|
1098 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
C32 |
|
12/1937 |
06/1893 |
C32 |
|
1099 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
C32 |
|
12/1947 |
11/1893 |
C32 |
|
1070 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
O33 |
|
04/1947 |
11/1893 |
C32 |
|
1071 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
O33 |
|
11/1947 |
12/1893 |
C32 |
|
1072 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
O33 |
|
03/1947 |
12/1893 |
C32 |
|
1073 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
O33 |
|
11/1938 |
12/1893 |
C32 |
|
1074 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
O33 |
|
02/1937 |
12/1893 |
C32 |
|
1075 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O33 |
|
03/1950 |
1894 |
N31 |
|
977 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E34 |
821 |
01/1924 |
1894 |
N31 |
|
978 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E34 |
822 |
07/1924 |
01/1894 |
C32 |
|
1076 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
O33 |
|
03/1937 |
01/1894 |
C32 |
|
1077 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
O33 |
|
08/1947 |
01/1894 |
C32 |
|
1078 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O33 |
|
01/1950 |
01/1894 |
C32 |
|
1079 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O33 |
|
08/04/1953 |
02/1894 |
C32 |
|
1080 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
R33 |
|
12/1938 |
02/1894 |
C32 |
|
1081 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R33 |
|
04/12/1950 |
02/1894 |
C32 |
|
1082 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
R33 |
|
08/1947 |
03/1894 |
C32 |
|
1083 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
R33 |
|
02/1938 |
03/1894 |
C32 |
|
1084 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
R33 |
|
05/1938 |
04/1894 |
C32 |
|
1085 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
R33 |
|
11/1947 |
04/1894 |
C32 |
|
1086 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
R33 |
|
04/1938 |
04/1894 |
C32 |
|
1087 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
R33 |
|
10/1938 |
04/1894 |
C32 |
|
1088 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
R33 |
|
11/1947 |
04/1894 |
C32 |
|
1089 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
R33 |
|
11/1947 |
04/1894 |
R24 |
|
367 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N33 |
|
02/11/1959 |
04/1894 |
R24 |
|
368 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N33 |
|
31/01/1955 |
04/1894 |
R24 |
|
369 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N33 |
|
03/02/1961 |
05/1894 |
R24 |
|
370 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N33 |
|
05/05/1958 |
05/1894 |
R24 |
|
371 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N33 |
|
21/04/1956 |
05/1894 |
R24 |
|
372 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N33 |
|
09/11/1953 |
05/1894 |
R24 |
|
373 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N33 |
|
11/02/1962 |
06/1894 |
R24 |
|
374 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N33 |
|
25/07/1961 |
06/1894 |
R24 |
|
375 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N33 |
|
21/06/1957 |
06/1894 |
R24 |
|
376 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N33 |
|
10/09/1961 |
06/1894 |
N31 |
|
989 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L33 |
773 |
1910 |
06/1894 |
N31 |
|
990 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L33 |
774 |
1910 |
06/1894 |
N31 |
|
991 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L33 |
775 |
1910 |
06/1894 |
N31 |
|
992 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L33 |
776 |
1922 |
07/1894 |
N31 |
|
993 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L33 |
777 |
08/1923 |
07/1894 |
N31 |
|
994 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L33 |
778 |
1916 |
07/1894 |
N31 |
|
995 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L33 |
779 |
1922 |
07/1894 |
N31 |
|
996 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L33 |
780 |
1912 |
07/1894 |
N31 |
|
997 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L33 |
781 |
1911 |
07/1894 |
N31 |
|
998 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L33 |
782 |
03/1925 |
09/1894 |
N31 |
|
969 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E34 |
813 |
1909 |
09/1894 |
N31 |
|
970 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E34 |
814 |
12/1923 |
09/1894 |
N31 |
|
971 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E34 |
815 |
1908 |
09/1894 |
N31 |
|
972 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E34 |
816 |
1909 |
09/1894 |
N31 |
|
973 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E34 |
817 |
03/1925 |
09/1894 |
N31 |
|
974 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E34 |
818 |
1910 |
09/1894 |
N31 |
|
975 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E34 |
819 |
1909 |
09/1894 |
N31 |
|
976 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E34 |
820 |
08/1923 |
10/1894 |
T26 |
|
477 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I34 |
|
13/12/1954 |
10/1894 |
T26 |
|
478 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I34 |
|
30/05/1955 |
10/1894 |
T26 |
|
479 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I34 |
|
03/1938 |
10/1894 |
T26 |
|
480 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I34 |
|
01/1935 |
10/1894 |
T26 |
|
481 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I34 |
|
06/1935 |
11/1894 |
T26 |
|
482 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I34 |
|
09/1929 |
11/1894 |
T26 |
|
483 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I34 |
|
06/1929 |
11/1894 |
T26 |
|
484 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I34 |
|
03/1936 |
11/1894 |
T26 |
|
485 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I34 |
|
01/1940 |
11/1894 |
T26 |
|
486 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I34 |
|
06/1931 |
12/1894 |
T26 |
|
487 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
X34 |
|
12/1929 |
12/1894 |
T26 |
|
488 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
X34 |
|
12/1928 |
12/1894 |
T26 |
|
489 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
X34 |
|
03/1936 |
01/1895 |
T26 |
|
490 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
X34 |
|
07/12/1959 |
01/1895 |
T26 |
|
491 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
X34 |
|
01/1935 |
01/1895 |
T26 |
|
492 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
X34 |
|
30/07/1956 |
01/1895 |
T26 |
|
493 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
X34 |
|
07/1929 |
01/1895 |
T26 |
|
494 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
X34 |
|
20/11/1956 |
01/1895 |
T26 |
|
495 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
X34 |
|
05/1928 |
01/1895 |
T26 |
|
496 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
X34 |
|
04/03/1958 |
05/1895 |
C32 |
|
1060 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
G35 |
|
06/1947 |
05/1895 |
C32 |
|
1061 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G35 |
|
29/05/1948 |
05/1895 |
C32 |
|
1062 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
G35 |
|
11/1947 |
05/1895 |
C32 |
|
1063 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
G35 |
|
11/1947 |
05/1895 |
C32 |
|
1064 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
G35 |
|
11/1947 |
05/1895 |
C32 |
|
1065 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
G35 |
|
03/1938 |
05/1895 |
C32 |
|
1066 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
G35 |
|
08/1947 |
05/1895 |
C32 |
|
1067 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G35 |
|
12/1950 |
05/1895 |
C32 |
|
1068 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G35 |
|
03/1949 |
05/1895 |
C32 |
|
1069 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
G35 |
|
03/1937 |
10/1895 |
R24 |
|
377 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F36 |
|
20/12/1958 |
10/1895 |
R24 |
|
378 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F36 |
|
25/07/1961 |
10/1895 |
R24 |
|
379 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F36 |
|
05/05/1958 |
10/1895 |
R24 |
|
380 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F36 |
|
16/09/1962 |
10/1895 |
R24 |
|
381 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F36 |
|
20/10/1959 |
11/1895 |
R24 |
|
382 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F36 |
|
13/01/1961 |
11/1895 |
R24 |
|
383 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F36 |
|
04/1956 |
11/1895 |
R24 |
|
384 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F36 |
|
10/01/1961 |
11/1895 |
R24 |
|
385 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F36 |
|
14/07/1958 |
12/1895 |
R24 |
|
386 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F36 |
|
15/08/1956 |
12/1895 |
R24 |
|
387 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y36 |
|
03/10/1960 |
12/1895 |
R24 |
|
388 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y36 |
|
10/1940 |
12/1895 |
R24 |
|
389 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y36 |
|
06/08/1962 |
12/1895 |
R24 |
|
390 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y36 |
|
05/09/1962 |
01/1896 |
R24 |
|
391 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y36 |
|
18/08/1957 |
01/1896 |
R24 |
|
392 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y36 |
|
08/05/1958 |
01/1896 |
R24 |
|
393 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y36 |
|
02/06/1960 |
01/1896 |
R24 |
|
394 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y36 |
|
10/09/1961 |
01/1896 |
N31 |
|
959 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N37 |
903 |
12/1923 |
01/1896 |
N31 |
|
960 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N37 |
904 |
1911 |
01/1896 |
N31 |
|
961 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N37 |
905 |
1911 |
01/1896 |
N31 |
|
962 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N37 |
906 |
1910 |
02/1896 |
R24 |
|
395 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y36 |
|
04/12/1960 |
02/1896 |
R24 |
|
396 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
Y36 |
|
29/11/1954 |
02/1896 |
N31 |
|
963 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N37 |
907 |
07/1924 |
02/1896 |
N31 |
|
964 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N37 |
908 |
02/1924 |
02/1896 |
N31 |
|
965 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N37 |
909 |
1921 |
02/1896 |
N31 |
|
966 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N37 |
910 |
1909 |
02/1896 |
N31 |
|
967 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N37 |
911 |
1912 |
02/1896 |
N31 |
|
968 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
N37 |
912 |
1912 |
04/1896 |
R24 |
|
265 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C37 |
|
01/08/1960 |
04/1896 |
R24 |
|
266 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C37 |
|
19/01/1959 |
04/1896 |
R24 |
|
267 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C37 |
|
06/10/1960 |
04/1896 |
R24 |
|
268 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C37 |
|
12/03/1958 |
05/1896 |
R24 |
|
269 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C37 |
|
10/11/1960 |
05/1896 |
R24 |
|
270 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C37 |
|
16/01/1961 |
05/1896 |
R24 |
|
271 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C37 |
|
18/01/1960 |
06/1896 |
R24 |
|
272 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C37 |
|
10/1940 |
06/1896 |
R24 |
|
273 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C37 |
|
28/09/1959 |
06/1896 |
R24 |
|
274 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C37 |
|
10/1940 |
07/1896 |
T26 |
|
497 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L37 |
|
02/12/1957 |
08/1896 |
T26 |
|
498 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L37 |
|
01/1935 |
08/1896 |
T26 |
|
499 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L37 |
|
03/1935 |
08/1896 |
T26 |
|
500 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L37 |
|
06/1936 |
09/1896 |
T26 |
|
501 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L37 |
|
10/1938 |
09/1896 |
T26 |
|
502 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L37 |
|
01/1939 |
09/1896 |
T26 |
|
503 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L37 |
|
02/01/1956 |
10/1896 |
T26 |
|
504 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L37 |
|
11/1938 |
10/1896 |
T26 |
|
505 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L37 |
|
02/1931 |
10/1896 |
T26 |
|
506 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L37 |
|
04/04/1955 |
1897 |
N31 |
|
602 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O41 |
937 |
1909 |
1897 |
N31 |
|
603 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O41 |
938 |
1910 |
1897 |
N31 |
|
604 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O41 |
939 |
03/1925 |
1897 |
N31 |
|
605 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O41 |
940 |
1909 |
1897 |
N31 |
|
606 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O41 |
941 |
1910 |
1897 |
N31 |
|
607 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O41 |
942 |
1913 |
1897 |
N31 |
|
608 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O41 |
943 |
1909 |
01/1897 |
N31 |
|
946 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O41 |
944 |
1915 |
01/1897 |
N31 |
|
947 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O41 |
945 |
1914 |
01/1897 |
N31 |
|
948 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
O41 |
946 |
1922 |
07/1897 |
N31 |
|
949 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H40 |
927 |
1912 |
07/1897 |
N31 |
|
950 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H40 |
928 |
1909 |
07/1897 |
N31 |
|
951 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H40 |
929 |
02/1924 |
07/1897 |
N31 |
|
952 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H40 |
930 |
1912 |
07/1897 |
N31 |
|
953 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H40 |
931 |
1909 |
07/1897 |
N31 |
|
954 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H40 |
932 |
1909 |
07/1897 |
N31 |
|
955 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H40 |
933 |
1909 |
08/1897 |
N31 |
|
956 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H40 |
934 |
1910 |
08/1897 |
N31 |
|
957 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H40 |
935 |
1909 |
08/1897 |
N31 |
|
958 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H40 |
936 |
1911 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
542 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G42 |
947 |
1910 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
543 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G42 |
948 |
1920 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
544 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G42 |
949 |
1912 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
545 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G42 |
950 |
1914 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
546 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G42 |
951 |
1909 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
547 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G42 |
952 |
1911 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
548 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G42 |
953 |
1922 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
549 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G42 |
954 |
1909 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
550 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G42 |
955 |
1910 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
551 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G42 |
956 |
1911 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
562 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K43 |
957 |
1911 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
563 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K43 |
958 |
1910 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
564 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K43 |
959 |
1914 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
565 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K43 |
960 |
1909 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
566 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K43 |
961 |
1909 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
567 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K43 |
962 |
1911 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
568 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K43 |
963 |
1910 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
569 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K43 |
964 |
1910 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
570 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K43 |
965 |
1909 |
1898 |
N31 |
|
571 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
K43 |
966 |
1909 |
12/1898 |
|
|
1100 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
S44 |
|
07/1931 |
12/1898 |
|
|
1101 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
S44 |
|
02/1933 |
12/1898 |
|
|
1102 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
S44 |
|
01/1930 |
12/1898 |
|
|
1103 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
S44 |
|
10/1929 |
01/1899 |
|
|
1104 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
S44 |
|
01/1931 |
01/1899 |
|
|
1105 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
S44 |
|
01/1938 |
01/1899 |
|
|
1106 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
S44 |
|
07/1931 |
02/1899 |
|
|
1107 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
S44 |
|
10/1931 |
02/1899 |
|
|
1108 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
S44 |
|
08/1930 |
02/1899 |
|
|
1109 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
S44 |
|
06/1933 |
03/1899 |
R24 |
|
255 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H45 |
|
05/1937 |
03/1899 |
R24 |
|
256 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H45 |
|
26/04/1958 |
03/1899 |
R24 |
|
257 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H45 |
|
13/08/1955 |
03/1899 |
R24 |
|
258 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H45 |
|
06/1958 |
03/1899 |
R24 |
|
259 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H45 |
|
05/1937 |
03/1899 |
R24 |
|
260 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H45 |
|
21/05/1956 |
04/1899 |
R24 |
|
261 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H45 |
|
01/10/1959 |
04/1899 |
R24 |
|
262 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H45 |
|
01/05/1958 |
04/1899 |
R24 |
|
263 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H45 |
|
30/01/1956 |
04/1899 |
R24 |
|
264 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H45 |
|
29/09/1955 |
05/1899 |
Y14 |
|
507 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
I45 |
|
01/1935 |
05/1899 |
Y14 |
|
508 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
I45 |
|
08/1949 |
05/1899 |
Y14 |
|
509 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
I45 |
|
25/11/1950 |
05/1899 |
Y14 |
|
510 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
I45 |
|
02/01/1956 |
05/1899 |
Y14 |
|
511 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
I45 |
|
05/03/1951 |
05/1899 |
Y14 |
|
512 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
I45 |
|
10/03/1958 |
05/1899 |
Y14 |
|
513 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
I45 |
|
08/1920 |
05/1899 |
Y14 |
|
514 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
I45 |
|
08/02/1958 |
06/1899 |
Y14 |
|
515 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
I45 |
|
16/11/1959 |
06/1899 |
Y14 |
|
516 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
I45 |
|
15/10/1956 |
06/1899 |
Y14 |
|
517 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S45 |
|
12/1949 |
06/1899 |
Y14 |
|
518 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S45 |
|
04/1937 |
06/1899 |
Y14 |
|
519 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S45 |
|
12/1934 |
06/1899 |
Y14 |
|
520 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S45 |
|
09/1950 |
06/1899 |
Y14 |
|
521 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S45 |
|
06/1939 |
07/1899 |
Y14 |
|
640 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X45 |
|
10/10/1960 |
07/1899 |
Y14 |
|
641 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X45 |
|
08/10/1958 |
07/1899 |
Y14 |
|
642 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X45 |
|
19/05/1958 |
07/1899 |
Y14 |
|
643 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X45 |
|
07/12/1959 |
07/1899 |
Y14 |
|
644 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X45 |
|
20/10/1958 |
08/1899 |
Y14 |
|
645 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X45 |
|
01/08/1962 |
08/1899 |
Y14 |
|
646 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X45 |
|
19/12/1960 |
08/1899 |
Y14 |
|
647 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X45 |
|
13/04/1959 |
09/1899 |
Y14 |
|
523 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S45 |
|
19/07/1958 |
09/1899 |
Y14 |
|
648 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X45 |
|
07/03/1960 |
09/1899 |
Y14 |
|
649 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
X45 |
|
14/12/1959 |
19/09/1899 |
Y14 |
|
522 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S45 |
|
03/1936 |
10/1899 |
|
|
1110 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
F47 |
|
04/1932 |
10/1899 |
|
|
1111 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
F47 |
|
05/1930 |
10/1899 |
|
|
1112 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
F47 |
|
12/1931 |
10/1899 |
Y14 |
|
524 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S45 |
|
03/1936 |
10/1899 |
Y14 |
|
525 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S45 |
|
10/1935 |
10/1899 |
Y14 |
|
526 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
S45 |
|
11/1951 |
11/1899 |
|
|
1113 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
F47 |
|
02/1931 |
11/1899 |
|
|
1114 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
F47 |
|
09/1931 |
11/1899 |
|
|
1115 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
F47 |
|
07/1931 |
11/1899 |
|
|
1116 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
F47 |
|
12/1933 |
11/1899 |
|
|
1117 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
F47 |
|
02/1933 |
11/1899 |
|
|
1118 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
F47 |
|
01/1930 |
11/1899 |
|
|
1119 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
F47 |
|
04/1933 |
12/1899 |
R24 |
|
199 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G47 |
|
07/1937 |
12/1899 |
R24 |
|
200 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G47 |
|
07/03/1955 |
12/1899 |
R24 |
|
201 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G47 |
|
07/1937 |
12/1899 |
R24 |
|
202 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G47 |
|
07/1937 |
12/1899 |
R24 |
|
203 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G47 |
|
04/01/1960 |
12/1899 |
R24 |
|
204 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G47 |
|
28/07/1955 |
12/1899 |
R24 |
|
205 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G47 |
|
05/1937 |
12/1899 |
R24 |
|
206 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G47 |
|
20/01/1958 |
01/1900 |
R24 |
|
207 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G47 |
|
18/11/1955 |
01/1900 |
R24 |
|
208 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G47 |
|
12/01/1957 |
03/1900 |
S46 |
|
1900 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
05/1947 |
04/1900 |
S46 |
|
1890 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
25/06/1951 |
04/1900 |
S46 |
|
1891 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
04/02/1952 |
04/1900 |
S46 |
|
1892 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
12/02/1951 |
05/1900 |
|
|
1120 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
R48 |
|
11/1929 |
05/1900 |
|
|
1121 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
R48 |
|
02/1930 |
05/1900 |
|
|
1122 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
R48 |
|
12/1932 |
05/1900 |
|
|
1123 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
R48 |
|
08/1938 |
05/1900 |
|
|
1124 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
R48 |
|
09/1934 |
05/1900 |
|
|
1125 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
R48 |
|
06/1931 |
05/1900 |
|
|
1126 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
R48 |
|
12/1933 |
05/1900 |
|
|
1127 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
R48 |
|
01/1931 |
05/1900 |
S46 |
|
1893 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
06/1948 |
05/1900 |
S46 |
|
1894 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
19/11/1951 |
06/1900 |
|
|
1128 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
R48 |
|
02/1930 |
06/1900 |
|
|
1129 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
R48 |
|
12/1932 |
06/1900 |
R24 |
|
189 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S48 |
|
06/11/1959 |
06/1900 |
S46 |
|
1895 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
21/04/1952 |
06/1900 |
S46 |
|
1896 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
21/04/1952 |
06/1900 |
S46 |
|
1897 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
10/1950 |
07/1900 |
S46 |
|
1898 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
22/09/1952 |
07/1900 |
S46 |
|
1899 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
07/10/1957 |
07/1900 |
R24 |
|
190 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S48 |
|
11/10/1955 |
07/1900 |
R24 |
|
191 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S48 |
|
11/05/1957 |
07/1900 |
R24 |
|
192 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S48 |
|
02/11/1959 |
07/1900 |
R24 |
|
193 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S48 |
|
16/09/1962 |
07/1900 |
R24 |
|
194 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S48 |
|
01/10/1959 |
07/1900 |
R24 |
|
195 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S48 |
|
28/10/1959 |
08/1900 |
R24 |
|
196 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S48 |
|
05/03/1958 |
08/1900 |
R24 |
|
197 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S48 |
|
10/1940 |
08/1900 |
R24 |
|
198 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S48 |
|
04/07/1958 |
09/1900 |
F48 |
|
1150 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
03/03/1958 |
09/1900 |
J16 |
|
1150 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
03/03/1958 |
09/1900 |
F48 |
|
1151 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
29/01/1958 |
09/1900 |
J16 |
|
1151 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
29/01/1958 |
09/1900 |
F48 |
|
1152 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
01/09/1959 |
09/1900 |
J16 |
|
1152 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
01/09/1959 |
09/1900 |
F48 |
|
1153 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
22/08/1960 |
09/1900 |
J16 |
|
1153 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
22/08/1960 |
10/1900 |
F48 |
|
1154 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
27/10/1958 |
10/1900 |
J16 |
|
1154 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
27/10/1958 |
10/1900 |
F48 |
|
1155 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
06/11/1959 |
10/1900 |
J16 |
|
1155 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
06/11/1959 |
10/1900 |
F48 |
|
1156 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
22/08/1960 |
10/1900 |
J16 |
|
1156 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
22/08/1960 |
10/1900 |
F48 |
|
1157 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
10/09/1961 |
10/1900 |
J16 |
|
1157 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
10/09/1961 |
11/1900 |
F48 |
|
1158 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
03/06/1958 |
11/1900 |
J16 |
|
1158 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
03/06/1958 |
11/1900 |
F48 |
|
1159 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
27/01/1958 |
11/1900 |
J16 |
|
1159 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
F48 |
|
27/01/1958 |
11/1900 |
F48 |
|
1160 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
21/03/1955 |
11/1900 |
J16 |
|
1160 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
21/03/1955 |
11/1900 |
F48 |
|
1161 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
28/11/1960 |
11/1900 |
J16 |
|
1161 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
28/11/1960 |
11/1900 |
F48 |
|
1162 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
07/12/1959 |
11/1900 |
J16 |
|
1162 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
07/12/1959 |
11/1900 |
F48 |
|
1163 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
21/03/1961 |
11/1900 |
J16 |
|
1163 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
21/03/1961 |
12/1900 |
|
|
1130 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
L50 |
|
02/1932 |
12/1900 |
|
|
1131 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
L50 |
|
06/1934 |
12/1900 |
|
|
1132 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
L50 |
|
02/1932 |
12/1900 |
|
|
1133 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
L50 |
|
04/1929 |
12/1900 |
F48 |
|
1164 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
04/01/1960 |
12/1900 |
J16 |
|
1164 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
04/01/1960 |
01/1901 |
|
|
1134 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
L50 |
|
09/1936 |
01/1901 |
|
|
1135 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
L50 |
|
06/1931 |
01/1901 |
F48 |
|
1165 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
15/09/1958 |
01/1901 |
J16 |
|
1165 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
15/09/1958 |
01/1901 |
F48 |
|
1166 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
07/03/1955 |
01/1901 |
J16 |
|
1166 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
07/03/1955 |
01/1901 |
F48 |
|
1167 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
09/05/1955 |
01/1901 |
J16 |
|
1167 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
09/05/1955 |
01/1901 |
F48 |
|
1168 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
17/09/1958 |
01/1901 |
J16 |
|
1168 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
17/09/1958 |
02/1901 |
|
|
1136 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
L50 |
|
12/1931 |
02/1901 |
|
|
1137 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
L50 |
|
08/1934 |
02/1901 |
|
|
1138 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
L50 |
|
03/1931 |
02/1901 |
|
|
1139 |
0-4-4T |
J. Holden |
|
L50 |
|
12/1938 |
02/1901 |
F48 |
|
1169 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
10/03/1960 |
02/1901 |
J16 |
|
1169 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H50 |
|
10/03/1960 |
04/1901 |
S46 |
|
1880 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
17/12/1959 |
05/1901 |
S46 |
|
1881 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
08/1950 |
05/1901 |
S46 |
|
1882 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
03/11/1958 |
05/1901 |
S46 |
|
1883 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
11/03/1957 |
05/1901 |
S46 |
|
1884 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
01/04/1958 |
05/1901 |
S46 |
|
1885 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
18/08/1957 |
06/1901 |
R24 |
|
160 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R50 |
|
05/05/1958 |
06/1901 |
R24 |
|
161 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R50 |
|
15/10/1958 |
06/1901 |
R24 |
|
162 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R50 |
|
16/09/1962 |
06/1901 |
R24 |
|
163 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R50 |
|
07/01/1957 |
06/1901 |
R24 |
|
164 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R50 |
|
25/07/1955 |
06/1901 |
S46 |
|
1886 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
28/09/1959 |
06/1901 |
S46 |
|
1887 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
13/10/1958 |
06/1901 |
S46 |
|
1888 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
01/01/1957 |
06/1901 |
S46 |
|
1889 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
27/08/1951 |
07/1901 |
R24 |
|
165 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R50 |
|
26/06/1961 |
07/1901 |
R24 |
|
166 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R50 |
|
17/09/1961 |
07/1901 |
R24 |
|
167 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R50 |
|
10/1940 |
08/1901 |
R24 |
|
168 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R50 |
|
10/1940 |
08/1901 |
R24 |
|
169 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R50 |
|
27/11/1958 |
09/1901 |
F48 |
|
1170 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
22/02/1961 |
09/1901 |
J16 |
|
1170 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
22/02/1961 |
09/1901 |
F48 |
|
1171 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
11/02/1962 |
09/1901 |
J16 |
|
1171 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
11/02/1962 |
09/1901 |
F48 |
|
1172 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
29/09/1958 |
09/1901 |
J16 |
|
1172 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
29/09/1958 |
10/1901 |
F48 |
|
1173 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
13/05/1957 |
10/1901 |
J16 |
|
1173 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
13/05/1957 |
10/1901 |
F48 |
|
1174 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
21/03/1955 |
10/1901 |
J16 |
|
1174 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
21/03/1955 |
10/1901 |
F48 |
|
1175 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
13/04/1959 |
10/1901 |
J16 |
|
1175 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
13/04/1959 |
10/1901 |
F48 |
|
1176 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
10/08/1959 |
10/1901 |
J16 |
|
1176 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
10/08/1959 |
10/1901 |
F48 |
|
1177 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
17/04/1959 |
10/1901 |
J16 |
|
1177 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
17/04/1959 |
10/1901 |
F48 |
|
1178 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
14/11/1961 |
10/1901 |
J16 |
|
1178 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
14/11/1961 |
10/1901 |
F48 |
|
1179 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
12/05/1958 |
10/1901 |
J16 |
|
1179 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
L52 |
|
12/05/1958 |
11/1901 |
F48 |
|
1180 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
11/01/1960 |
11/1901 |
J16 |
|
1180 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
11/01/1960 |
11/1901 |
F48 |
|
1181 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
21/04/1959 |
11/1901 |
J16 |
|
1181 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
21/04/1959 |
11/1901 |
F48 |
|
1182 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
11/02/1962 |
11/1901 |
J16 |
|
1182 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
11/02/1962 |
11/1901 |
F48 |
|
1183 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
04/01/1960 |
11/1901 |
J16 |
|
1183 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
04/01/1960 |
11/1901 |
F48 |
|
1184 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
05/05/1958 |
11/1901 |
J16 |
|
1184 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
05/05/1958 |
12/1901 |
F48 |
|
1185 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
05/05/1958 |
12/1901 |
J16 |
|
1185 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
05/05/1958 |
12/1901 |
F48 |
|
1186 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
17/03/1960 |
12/1901 |
J16 |
|
1186 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
17/03/1960 |
12/1901 |
F48 |
|
1187 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
28/01/1957 |
12/1901 |
J16 |
|
1187 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
28/01/1957 |
12/1901 |
F48 |
|
1188 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
17/04/1959 |
12/1901 |
J16 |
|
1188 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
17/04/1959 |
02/1902 |
F48 |
|
1189 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
22/08/1960 |
02/1902 |
J16 |
|
1189 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P52 |
|
22/08/1960 |
03/1902 |
S46 |
|
1870 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
10/02/1958 |
03/1902 |
S46 |
|
1871 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
04/08/1958 |
03/1902 |
S46 |
|
1872 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
27/08/1956 |
03/1902 |
S46 |
|
1873 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
10/03/1960 |
03/1902 |
S46 |
|
1874 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
19/09/1955 |
04/1902 |
S46 |
|
1875 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
21/05/1957 |
04/1902 |
S46 |
|
1876 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
07/07/1952 |
04/1902 |
S46 |
|
1877 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
25/06/1951 |
05/1902 |
C32 |
|
1040 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D53 |
|
29/05/1948 |
05/1902 |
C32 |
|
1041 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
D53 |
|
04/1947 |
05/1902 |
C32 |
|
1042 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D53 |
|
22/07/1948 |
05/1902 |
C32 |
|
1043 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
D53 |
|
11/1947 |
05/1902 |
C32 |
|
1044 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
D53 |
|
04/1947 |
05/1902 |
S46 |
|
1878 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
23/11/1959 |
05/1902 |
S46 |
|
1879 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
22/09/1958 |
06/1902 |
C32 |
|
1045 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
D53 |
|
08/1947 |
06/1902 |
C32 |
|
1046 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
D53 |
|
11/1947 |
06/1902 |
C32 |
|
1047 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
|
D53 |
|
07/1947 |
06/1902 |
C32 |
|
1048 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D53 |
|
18/07/1949 |
06/1902 |
C32 |
|
1049 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D53 |
|
10/1949 |
06/1902 |
T26 |
|
1250 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S50 |
|
18/06/1956 |
06/1902 |
T26 |
|
1251 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S50 |
|
28/02/1955 |
06/1902 |
T26 |
|
1252 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S50 |
|
22/08/1955 |
06/1902 |
T26 |
|
1253 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S50 |
|
01/1935 |
06/1902 |
T26 |
|
1254 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S50 |
|
07/03/1955 |
07/1902 |
T26 |
|
1255 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S50 |
|
08/1935 |
07/1902 |
T26 |
|
1256 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S50 |
|
10/1931 |
07/1902 |
T26 |
|
1257 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S50 |
|
13/05/1957 |
08/1902 |
T26 |
|
1258 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S50 |
|
06/1937 |
08/1902 |
T26 |
|
1259 |
2-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S50 |
|
17/03/1958 |
09/1902 |
F48 |
|
1190 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
13/04/1959 |
09/1902 |
J16 |
|
1190 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
13/04/1959 |
09/1902 |
F48 |
|
1191 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
16/09/1962 |
09/1902 |
J16 |
|
1191 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
16/09/1962 |
09/1902 |
F48 |
|
1192 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
04/05/1959 |
09/1902 |
J16 |
|
1192 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
04/05/1959 |
09/1902 |
F48 |
|
1193 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
02/05/1955 |
09/1902 |
J16 |
|
1193 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
02/05/1955 |
09/1902 |
F48 |
|
1194 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
23/11/1959 |
09/1902 |
J16 |
|
1194 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
23/11/1959 |
10/1902 |
F48 |
|
1195 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
26/10/1959 |
10/1902 |
J16 |
|
1195 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
26/10/1959 |
10/1902 |
F48 |
|
1196 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
04/01/1960 |
10/1902 |
J16 |
|
1196 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
04/01/1960 |
10/1902 |
F48 |
|
1197 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
06/09/1954 |
10/1902 |
J16 |
|
1197 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
06/09/1954 |
10/1902 |
F48 |
|
1198 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
07/03/1960 |
10/1902 |
J16 |
|
1198 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
07/03/1960 |
11/1902 |
F48 |
|
1199 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
19/12/1960 |
11/1902 |
J16 |
|
1199 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B54 |
|
19/12/1960 |
11/1902 |
F48 |
|
1200 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
11/1944 |
11/1902 |
J16 |
|
1200 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
11/1944 |
12/1902 |
F48 |
|
1201 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
10/02/1960 |
12/1902 |
J16 |
|
1201 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
10/02/1960 |
12/1902 |
F48 |
|
1202 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
10/01/1955 |
12/1902 |
J16 |
|
1202 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
10/01/1955 |
12/1902 |
F48 |
|
1203 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
21/04/1959 |
12/1902 |
J16 |
|
1203 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
21/04/1959 |
12/1902 |
F48 |
|
1204 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
10/09/1961 |
12/1902 |
J16 |
|
1204 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
10/09/1961 |
01/1903 |
F48 |
|
1205 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
17/03/1960 |
01/1903 |
J16 |
|
1205 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
17/03/1960 |
01/1903 |
F48 |
|
1206 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
16/03/1961 |
01/1903 |
J16 |
|
1206 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
16/03/1961 |
02/1903 |
F48 |
|
1207 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
22/04/1959 |
02/1903 |
J16 |
|
1207 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
22/04/1959 |
02/1903 |
F48 |
|
1208 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
04/01/1960 |
02/1903 |
J16 |
|
1208 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
04/01/1960 |
02/1903 |
F48 |
|
1209 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
16/11/1959 |
02/1903 |
J16 |
|
1209 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P54 |
|
16/11/1959 |
05/1903 |
S46 |
|
1860 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
21/03/1955 |
05/1903 |
S46 |
|
1861 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
12/11/1956 |
05/1903 |
S46 |
|
1862 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
23/09/1957 |
06/1903 |
|
|
140 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P55 |
|
03/1932 |
06/1903 |
|
|
141 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P55 |
|
29/12/1955 |
06/1903 |
|
|
142 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P55 |
|
20/12/1956 |
06/1903 |
|
|
143 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P55 |
|
23/11/1955 |
06/1903 |
|
|
144 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P55 |
|
21/11/1955 |
06/1903 |
S46 |
|
1863 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
11/11/1958 |
06/1903 |
S46 |
|
1864 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
25/11/1957 |
07/1903 |
|
|
145 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P55 |
|
21/04/1958 |
07/1903 |
|
|
146 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P55 |
|
01/1930 |
07/1903 |
|
|
147 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P55 |
|
04/11/1957 |
08/1903 |
|
|
148 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P55 |
|
08/1931 |
08/1903 |
|
|
149 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P55 |
|
05/1931 |
09/1903 |
S46 |
|
1865 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
25/07/1955 |
09/1903 |
S46 |
|
1866 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
09/1945 |
10/1903 |
C53 |
|
135 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C53 |
|
30/11/1953 |
10/1903 |
S46 |
|
1867 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
28/04/1952 |
10/1903 |
S46 |
|
1868 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
28/10/1957 |
11/1903 |
C53 |
|
136 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C53 |
|
09/03/1953 |
11/1903 |
S46 |
|
1869 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
24/08/1959 |
12/1903 |
|
|
1850 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
17/10/1955 |
12/1903 |
|
|
1851 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
15/10/1956 |
12/1903 |
|
|
1852 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
13/10/1958 |
12/1903 |
|
|
1853 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
24/11/1959 |
01/1904 |
|
|
1854 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
22/09/1958 |
02/1904 |
|
|
1855 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
18/06/1957 |
03/1904 |
|
|
1856 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
02/1951 |
03/1904 |
|
|
1857 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
08/10/1957 |
03/1904 |
|
|
1858 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
12/12/1955 |
04/1904 |
|
|
1859 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
11/1946 |
05/1904 |
S56 |
|
51 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S56 |
|
14/07/1958 |
05/1904 |
S56 |
|
52 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S56 |
|
18/08/1958 |
05/1904 |
S56 |
|
53 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S56 |
|
30/10/1961 |
05/1904 |
S56 |
|
54 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S56 |
|
10/1940 |
05/1904 |
S56 |
|
55 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S56 |
|
16/09/1962 |
06/1904 |
S56 |
|
56 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S56 |
|
10/1940 |
06/1904 |
S56 |
|
57 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S56 |
|
14/02/1961 |
06/1904 |
S56 |
|
58 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S56 |
|
10/1940 |
06/1904 |
S56 |
|
59 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S56 |
|
01/01/1959 |
06/1904 |
S56 |
|
60 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S56 |
|
03/05/1962 |
08/1904 |
S56 |
|
81 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P57 |
|
10/1940 |
08/1904 |
S56 |
|
82 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P57 |
|
24/02/1958 |
08/1904 |
S56 |
|
83 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P57 |
|
26/11/1959 |
08/1904 |
S56 |
|
84 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P57 |
|
01/01/1959 |
08/1904 |
S56 |
|
85 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P57 |
|
28/07/1958 |
09/1904 |
S56 |
|
86 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P57 |
|
08/05/1958 |
09/1904 |
S56 |
|
87 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P57 |
|
24/11/1960 |
09/1904 |
S56 |
|
88 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P57 |
|
10/1940 |
09/1904 |
S56 |
|
89 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P57 |
|
16/09/1962 |
09/1904 |
S56 |
|
90 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P57 |
|
01/01/1959 |
10/1904 |
|
|
781 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D58 |
|
10/1956 |
11/1904 |
|
|
782 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D58 |
|
06/05/1958 |
11/1904 |
|
|
783 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D58 |
|
07/03/1955 |
11/1904 |
|
|
784 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D58 |
|
14/03/1955 |
11/1904 |
|
|
785 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D58 |
|
15/08/1955 |
11/1904 |
|
|
786 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D58 |
|
05/02/1957 |
11/1904 |
|
|
787 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D58 |
|
20/12/1957 |
11/1904 |
|
|
788 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D58 |
|
17/12/1956 |
12/1904 |
|
|
789 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D58 |
|
10/03/1958 |
12/1904 |
|
|
790 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D58 |
|
06/11/1956 |
04/1905 |
|
|
1210 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G58 |
|
05/06/1962 |
04/1905 |
|
|
1211 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G58 |
|
07/12/1959 |
04/1905 |
|
|
1212 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G58 |
|
25/08/1958 |
05/1905 |
|
|
1213 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G58 |
|
01/01/1960 |
05/1905 |
|
|
1214 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G58 |
|
17/08/1960 |
05/1905 |
|
|
1215 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G58 |
|
05/04/1960 |
05/1905 |
|
|
1216 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G58 |
|
04/07/1960 |
05/1905 |
|
|
1217 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G58 |
|
06/08/1962 |
05/1905 |
|
|
1218 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G58 |
|
22/09/1958 |
06/1905 |
|
|
1219 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G58 |
|
21/02/1955 |
07/1905 |
|
|
91 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R58 |
|
16/12/1957 |
07/1905 |
|
|
92 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R58 |
|
04/1933 |
07/1905 |
|
|
93 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R58 |
|
05/1932 |
07/1905 |
|
|
94 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R58 |
|
16/12/1957 |
08/1905 |
|
|
95 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R58 |
|
27/09/1955 |
09/1905 |
|
|
96 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R58 |
|
23/11/1955 |
09/1905 |
|
|
97 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R58 |
|
12/1929 |
09/1905 |
|
|
98 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R58 |
|
11/1929 |
10/1905 |
|
|
100 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R58 |
|
27/09/1955 |
10/1905 |
|
|
99 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R58 |
|
05/1932 |
11/1905 |
|
|
101 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C59 |
|
11/1929 |
11/1905 |
|
|
102 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C59 |
|
02/1931 |
11/1905 |
|
|
103 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C59 |
|
06/12/1955 |
11/1905 |
|
|
104 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C59 |
|
10/01/1957 |
11/1905 |
|
|
105 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C59 |
|
03/1935 |
11/1905 |
|
|
106 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C59 |
|
02/1933 |
01/1906 |
|
|
108 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C59 |
|
18/02/1957 |
01/1906 |
|
|
110 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C59 |
|
10/1956 |
01/1906 |
|
|
1220 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S59 |
|
22/04/1960 |
01/1906 |
|
|
1221 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S59 |
|
11/02/1958 |
01/1906 |
|
|
1222 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S59 |
|
02/12/1957 |
01/1906 |
|
|
1223 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S59 |
|
08/10/1958 |
01/1906 |
|
|
1224 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S59 |
|
19/04/1955 |
02/1906 |
|
|
107 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C59 |
|
12/1929 |
02/1906 |
|
|
109 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C59 |
|
04/07/1955 |
02/1906 |
|
|
1225 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S59 |
|
04/02/1958 |
02/1906 |
|
|
1226 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S59 |
|
16/09/1962 |
02/1906 |
|
|
1227 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S59 |
|
11/02/1962 |
03/1906 |
|
|
1228 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S59 |
|
05/03/1962 |
03/1906 |
|
|
1229 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S59 |
|
29/11/1954 |
05/1906 |
Y14 |
|
552 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
A60 |
|
26/10/1961 |
05/1906 |
Y14 |
|
553 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
A60 |
|
28/09/1959 |
06/1906 |
Y14 |
|
554 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
A60 |
|
07/12/1959 |
06/1906 |
Y14 |
|
555 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
A60 |
|
06/08/1962 |
06/1906 |
Y14 |
|
556 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
A60 |
|
22/05/1959 |
06/1906 |
Y14 |
|
557 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
A60 |
|
18/03/1960 |
06/1906 |
Y14 |
|
558 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
A60 |
|
08/09/1958 |
06/1906 |
Y14 |
|
559 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
A60 |
|
11/02/1962 |
07/1906 |
|
|
236 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I60 |
|
28/08/1951 |
07/1906 |
|
|
237 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I60 |
|
09/1929 |
07/1906 |
|
|
238 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I60 |
|
07/1929 |
07/1906 |
Y14 |
|
560 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
A60 |
|
31/10/1961 |
07/1906 |
Y14 |
|
561 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
A60 |
|
10/02/1960 |
07/1906 |
|
|
780 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I60 |
|
05/05/1958 |
08/1906 |
|
|
239 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I60 |
|
11/1929 |
08/1906 |
|
|
240 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I60 |
|
06/1937 |
08/1906 |
|
|
241 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I60 |
|
10/1933 |
09/1906 |
|
|
242 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I60 |
|
10/1937 |
09/1906 |
|
|
243 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I60 |
|
12/1934 |
09/1906 |
|
|
244 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I60 |
|
04/02/1952 |
11/1906 |
|
|
1840 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
16/07/1956 |
11/1906 |
|
|
1841 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
25/10/1955 |
11/1906 |
|
|
1842 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
01/01/1957 |
11/1906 |
|
|
1843 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
28/11/1955 |
11/1906 |
|
|
1844 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
24/03/1958 |
11/1906 |
|
|
1845 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
01/01/1957 |
12/1906 |
|
|
1846 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
31/10/1955 |
12/1906 |
|
|
1847 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
06/05/1957 |
01/1907 |
|
|
1848 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
12/12/1955 |
01/1907 |
|
|
1849 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
24/09/1948 |
02/1907 |
|
|
572 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A62 |
|
03/1933 |
03/1907 |
|
|
573 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A62 |
|
07/1951 |
03/1907 |
|
|
574 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A62 |
|
03/09/1951 |
03/1907 |
|
|
575 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A62 |
|
01/1931 |
03/1907 |
|
|
576 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A62 |
|
05/1937 |
04/1907 |
|
|
577 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A62 |
|
01/1931 |
04/1907 |
|
|
578 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A62 |
|
14/08/1951 |
04/1907 |
|
|
579 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A62 |
|
11/1950 |
04/1907 |
|
|
580 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A62 |
|
07/1937 |
05/1907 |
|
|
581 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A62 |
|
08/06/1956 |
05/1907 |
|
|
582 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D63 |
|
03/1936 |
05/1907 |
|
|
583 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D63 |
|
05/1937 |
05/1907 |
|
|
584 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D63 |
|
13/01/1953 |
05/1907 |
|
|
585 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D63 |
|
03/1933 |
06/1907 |
|
|
586 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D63 |
|
24/04/1948 |
06/1907 |
|
|
587 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D63 |
|
10/1933 |
06/1907 |
|
|
588 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D63 |
|
04/1950 |
06/1907 |
|
|
589 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D63 |
|
05/1955 |
07/1907 |
|
|
590 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D63 |
|
05/05/1958 |
07/1907 |
|
|
591 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D63 |
|
03/1933 |
08/1907 |
|
|
211 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G63 |
|
08/1934 |
08/1907 |
|
|
212 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G63 |
|
12/1933 |
09/1907 |
|
|
213 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G63 |
|
12/1933 |
09/1907 |
|
|
214 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G63 |
|
15/08/1955 |
09/1907 |
|
|
215 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G63 |
|
05/1935 |
09/1907 |
|
|
216 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G63 |
|
03/1934 |
09/1907 |
|
|
217 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G63 |
|
04/1935 |
10/1907 |
|
|
218 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G63 |
|
03/1933 |
10/1907 |
|
|
219 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G63 |
|
12/12/1951 |
10/1907 |
|
|
220 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G63 |
|
05/1934 |
11/1907 |
|
|
111 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H63 |
|
24/04/1948 |
11/1907 |
|
|
221 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H63 |
|
06/1934 |
11/1907 |
|
|
222 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H63 |
|
27/08/1951 |
11/1907 |
|
|
223 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H63 |
|
02/1935 |
11/1907 |
|
|
224 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H63 |
|
02/1935 |
11/1907 |
|
|
225 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H63 |
|
05/1935 |
11/1907 |
|
|
232 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H63 |
|
15/01/1951 |
12/1907 |
|
|
233 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H63 |
|
09/04/1951 |
12/1907 |
|
|
234 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H63 |
|
04/1933 |
12/1907 |
|
|
235 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H63 |
|
06/1935 |
03/1908 |
|
|
1830 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
10/02/1958 |
03/1908 |
|
|
1831 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
22/10/1957 |
03/1908 |
|
|
1832 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
06/08/1948 |
04/1908 |
|
|
1833 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
24/03/1958 |
04/1908 |
|
|
1834 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
01/01/1957 |
05/1908 |
|
|
1835 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
02/12/1958 |
05/1908 |
|
|
1836 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
17/12/1956 |
06/1908 |
|
|
1837 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
28/04/1958 |
07/1908 |
|
|
1838 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
26/11/1956 |
07/1908 |
|
|
1839 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
24/11/1959 |
08/1908 |
|
|
170 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S64 |
|
19/09/1955 |
09/1908 |
C53 |
|
137 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C64 |
|
09/1949 |
09/1908 |
C53 |
|
138 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C64 |
|
01/1942 |
09/1908 |
|
|
171 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S64 |
|
04/1948 |
09/1908 |
|
|
172 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S64 |
|
24/04/1948 |
09/1908 |
|
|
173 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S64 |
|
24/04/1948 |
09/1908 |
|
|
174 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S64 |
|
24/04/1948 |
10/1908 |
C53 |
|
139 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
C64 |
|
31/08/1953 |
10/1908 |
|
|
175 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S64 |
|
01/08/1951 |
10/1908 |
|
|
176 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S64 |
|
04/1943 |
10/1908 |
|
|
177 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S64 |
|
24/04/1948 |
10/1908 |
|
|
178 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S64 |
|
24/04/1948 |
11/1908 |
|
|
179 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S64 |
|
17/12/1956 |
11/1908 |
|
|
180 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A65 |
|
13/12/1954 |
11/1908 |
|
|
181 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A65 |
|
11/1935 |
12/1908 |
|
|
182 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A65 |
|
01/1931 |
12/1908 |
|
|
183 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A65 |
|
10/1934 |
12/1908 |
|
|
184 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A65 |
|
01/08/1951 |
01/1909 |
|
|
185 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A65 |
|
22/07/1953 |
01/1909 |
|
|
186 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A65 |
|
12/03/1951 |
02/1909 |
|
|
187 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A65 |
|
18/08/1952 |
02/1909 |
|
|
188 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A65 |
|
21/11/1955 |
02/1909 |
|
|
189 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A65 |
|
24/04/1948 |
03/1909 |
|
|
71 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I65 |
|
24/04/1948 |
03/1909 |
|
|
72 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I65 |
|
24/04/1948 |
03/1909 |
|
|
73 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I65 |
|
03/1935 |
03/1909 |
|
|
74 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I65 |
|
12/01/1953 |
04/1909 |
|
|
75 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I65 |
|
04/1950 |
04/1909 |
|
|
76 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I65 |
|
08/12/1952 |
04/1909 |
|
|
77 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I65 |
|
24/04/1948 |
04/1909 |
|
|
78 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I65 |
|
22/07/1953 |
05/1909 |
|
|
79 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I65 |
|
18/08/1955 |
05/1909 |
|
|
80 |
2-4-2T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I65 |
|
02/1936 |
06/1909 |
Y65 |
|
1300 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
|
Y65 |
|
08/1938 |
06/1909 |
|
|
1820 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
01/01/1959 |
06/1909 |
|
|
1821 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
28/07/1958 |
07/1909 |
Y65 |
|
1301 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
|
Y65 |
|
04/1943 |
09/1909 |
|
|
1822 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
24/10/1955 |
11/1909 |
Y65 |
|
1302 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
|
A67 |
|
05/1931 |
11/1909 |
Y65 |
|
1303 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
|
A67 |
|
04/1939 |
11/1909 |
Y65 |
|
1304 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
|
A67 |
|
03/1944 |
11/1909 |
Y65 |
|
1305 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
|
A67 |
|
04/1943 |
11/1909 |
|
|
1823 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
05/12/1955 |
11/1909 |
|
|
1824 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
29/05/1957 |
11/1909 |
|
|
1825 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
09/09/1957 |
12/1909 |
Y65 |
|
1306 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
|
A67 |
|
04/1931 |
12/1909 |
Y65 |
|
1307 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
|
A67 |
|
06/1943 |
12/1909 |
Y65 |
|
1308 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A67 |
|
08/11/1948 |
12/1909 |
Y65 |
|
1309 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
|
A67 |
|
01/1931 |
12/1909 |
|
|
1826 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
10/1956 |
12/1909 |
|
|
1827 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
21/10/1957 |
12/1909 |
|
|
1828 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
07/03/1955 |
12/1909 |
|
|
1829 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
09/06/1958 |
01/1910 |
Y65 |
|
1310 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A67 |
|
08/11/1948 |
01/1910 |
Y65 |
|
1311 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
|
A67 |
|
09/1931 |
03/1910 |
|
|
1810 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
09/03/1953 |
03/1910 |
|
|
1811 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
01/01/1959 |
03/1910 |
|
|
1812 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
23/11/1948 |
04/1910 |
C53 |
|
130 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
I67 |
|
23/02/1953 |
04/1910 |
|
|
1813 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
23/12/1957 |
04/1910 |
|
|
1814 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
11/04/1955 |
05/1910 |
|
|
1815 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
05/03/1958 |
06/1910 |
|
|
1816 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
17/12/1956 |
06/1910 |
|
|
1817 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
13/10/1958 |
06/1910 |
|
|
1818 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
18/05/1959 |
06/1910 |
|
|
1819 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
28/01/1952 |
07/1910 |
|
|
1800 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
17/04/1950 |
07/1910 |
|
|
1801 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
01/04/1958 |
08/1910 |
|
|
1802 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
07/10/1957 |
08/1910 |
|
|
1803 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
03/1949 |
08/1910 |
|
|
1804 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
11/1946 |
09/1910 |
|
|
1805 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
28/10/1957 |
09/1910 |
|
|
1806 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
04/01/1960 |
10/1910 |
|
|
1230 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T67 |
|
16/11/1959 |
10/1910 |
|
|
1807 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
12/05/1952 |
10/1910 |
|
|
1808 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
15/09/1958 |
11/1910 |
|
|
1231 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T67 |
|
25/04/1962 |
11/1910 |
|
|
1232 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T67 |
|
16/09/1962 |
11/1910 |
|
|
1233 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T67 |
|
11/02/1962 |
11/1910 |
|
|
1234 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T67 |
|
02/02/1960 |
11/1910 |
|
|
1235 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T67 |
|
01/11/1954 |
11/1910 |
|
|
1809 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
12/06/1948 |
12/1910 |
|
|
1236 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T67 |
|
17/04/1962 |
12/1910 |
|
|
1237 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T67 |
|
01/12/1958 |
01/1911 |
|
|
1238 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T67 |
|
29/05/1961 |
01/1911 |
|
|
1239 |
0-6-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
T67 |
|
02/01/1961 |
02/1911 |
|
|
1790 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
01/01/1957 |
03/1911 |
|
|
1791 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
23/09/1948 |
03/1911 |
|
|
1792 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
03/09/1951 |
04/1911 |
|
|
1793 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
05/02/1960 |
04/1911 |
G69 |
|
61 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G69 |
|
25/07/1955 |
04/1911 |
G69 |
|
62 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G69 |
|
31/10/1957 |
04/1911 |
G69 |
|
63 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G69 |
|
17/08/1955 |
05/1911 |
|
|
1794 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
06/06/1957 |
05/1911 |
G69 |
|
64 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G69 |
|
13/12/1955 |
05/1911 |
G69 |
|
65 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G69 |
|
19/11/1956 |
05/1911 |
G69 |
|
66 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G69 |
|
28/05/1956 |
05/1911 |
G69 |
|
67 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G69 |
|
14/11/1955 |
05/1911 |
G69 |
|
68 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G69 |
|
08/05/1958 |
06/1911 |
G69 |
|
69 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G69 |
|
21/04/1958 |
06/1911 |
G69 |
|
70 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
G69 |
|
18/03/1958 |
07/1911 |
|
|
1795 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
28/09/1959 |
07/1911 |
|
|
1796 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
28/11/1955 |
07/1911 |
|
|
1797 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
01/01/1957 |
08/1911 |
|
|
1798 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
04/02/1957 |
08/1911 |
|
|
1799 |
4-4-0 |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
01/01/1959 |
10/1911 |
G69 |
|
1 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A71 |
|
13/05/1958 |
10/1911 |
G69 |
|
2 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A71 |
|
14/03/1958 |
11/1911 |
G69 |
|
3 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A71 |
|
14/11/1955 |
11/1911 |
G69 |
|
4 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A71 |
|
13/12/1955 |
11/1911 |
G69 |
|
5 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A71 |
|
17/08/1956 |
12/1911 |
S69 |
|
1500 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S69 |
|
23/06/1948 |
12/1911 |
G69 |
|
6 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A71 |
|
16/01/1956 |
12/1911 |
G69 |
|
7 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A71 |
|
17/08/1955 |
01/1912 |
G69 |
|
10 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A71 |
|
30/12/1955 |
01/1912 |
G69 |
|
8 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A71 |
|
08/1953 |
01/1912 |
G69 |
|
9 |
2-4-2T |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A71 |
|
07/11/1955 |
02/1912 |
S69 |
|
1501 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S69 |
|
20/05/1953 |
02/1912 |
S69 |
|
1502 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S69 |
|
30/04/1954 |
02/1912 |
Y14 |
|
562 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
B70 |
|
05/09/1962 |
02/1912 |
Y14 |
|
563 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
B70 |
|
14/04/1960 |
03/1912 |
S69 |
|
1503 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S69 |
|
20/05/1951 |
03/1912 |
Y14 |
|
564 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
B70 |
|
16/09/1962 |
03/1912 |
Y14 |
|
565 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
B70 |
|
18/11/1959 |
03/1912 |
Y14 |
|
566 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
B70 |
|
16/09/1962 |
03/1912 |
Y14 |
|
567 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
B70 |
|
16/09/1962 |
04/1912 |
Y14 |
|
568 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
B70 |
|
28/07/1958 |
04/1912 |
Y14 |
|
569 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
B70 |
|
03/02/1959 |
05/1912 |
S69 |
|
1504 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
S69 |
|
16/06/1950 |
05/1912 |
Y14 |
|
570 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
B70 |
|
30/09/1959 |
05/1912 |
Y14 |
|
571 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
B70 |
|
01/08/1962 |
06/1912 |
C72 |
|
41 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
C72 |
|
10/1940 |
06/1912 |
C72 |
|
42 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
C72 |
|
24/02/1959 |
06/1912 |
C72 |
|
43 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
C72 |
|
17/04/1959 |
07/1912 |
C72 |
|
44 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
C72 |
|
22/04/1959 |
07/1912 |
C72 |
|
45 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
C72 |
|
06/11/1959 |
08/1912 |
C72 |
|
46 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
C72 |
|
10/09/1961 |
08/1912 |
C72 |
|
47 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
C72 |
|
16/11/1959 |
09/1912 |
C72 |
|
48 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
C72 |
|
28/11/1960 |
09/1912 |
C72 |
|
49 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
C72 |
|
06/11/1959 |
09/1912 |
C72 |
|
50 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
C72 |
|
10/09/1961 |
12/1912 |
S69 |
|
1506 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
?? |
|
07/1913 |
02/1913 |
|
|
1505 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A73 |
|
25/03/1952 |
03/1913 |
|
|
1507 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A73 |
|
26/02/1953 |
03/1913 |
|
|
1508 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A73 |
|
30/04/1953 |
04/1913 |
|
|
1509 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A73 |
|
15/10/1948 |
04/1913 |
|
|
1510 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A73 |
|
06/1949 |
05/1913 |
|
|
1511 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A73 |
|
05/05/1952 |
06/1913 |
|
|
1512 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A73 |
|
01/01/1957 |
06/1913 |
S69 |
|
1513 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A73 |
|
18/02/1953 |
06/1913 |
|
|
1514 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
A73 |
|
07/10/1959 |
06/1913 |
Y14 |
|
542 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
G73 |
|
07/12/1959 |
06/1913 |
Y14 |
|
543 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
G73 |
|
17/06/1960 |
06/1913 |
Y14 |
|
544 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
G73 |
|
05/12/1959 |
06/1913 |
Y14 |
|
545 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
G73 |
|
17/03/1960 |
07/1913 |
B74 |
|
227 |
0-4-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
?? |
1554 |
19/09/1955 |
07/1913 |
Y14 |
|
546 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
G73 |
|
08/02/1960 |
08/1913 |
Y14 |
|
547 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
G73 |
|
01/09/1959 |
08/1913 |
Y14 |
|
548 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
G73 |
|
05/09/1962 |
08/1913 |
Y14 |
|
549 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
G73 |
|
08/02/1960 |
09/1913 |
Y14 |
|
550 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
G73 |
|
26/10/1961 |
09/1913 |
Y14 |
|
551 |
0-6-0 |
T. Worsdell |
Stratford Works |
G73 |
|
15/08/1960 |
11/1913 |
|
|
1515 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E75 |
|
12/11/1951 |
11/1913 |
|
|
1516 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E75 |
|
14/07/1958 |
11/1913 |
|
|
1517 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E75 |
|
21/10/1948 |
12/1913 |
S69 |
|
1518 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E75 |
|
12/1947 |
12/1913 |
|
|
1519 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
E75 |
|
23/12/1957 |
12/1913 |
C72 |
|
21 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
G75 |
|
04/12/1960 |
12/1913 |
C72 |
|
22 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
G75 |
|
24/08/1959 |
12/1913 |
C72 |
|
23 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
G75 |
|
10/09/1961 |
12/1913 |
C72 |
|
24 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
G75 |
|
11/10/1960 |
12/1913 |
C72 |
|
25 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
G75 |
|
19/05/1958 |
12/1913 |
C72 |
|
26 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
G75 |
|
28/09/1959 |
12/1913 |
C72 |
|
27 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
G75 |
|
28/07/1958 |
01/1914 |
C72 |
|
28 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
G75 |
|
11/03/1960 |
01/1914 |
C72 |
|
29 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
G75 |
|
24/11/1959 |
02/1914 |
C72 |
|
30 |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
G75 |
|
04/04/1960 |
04/1914 |
|
|
1520 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R75 |
|
24/06/1957 |
04/1914 |
S69 |
|
1521 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R75 |
|
15/07/1952 |
04/1914 |
S69 |
|
1522 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R75 |
|
08/1947 |
05/1914 |
|
|
1523 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R75 |
|
21/03/1955 |
05/1914 |
S69 |
|
1524 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R75 |
|
05/11/1953 |
06/1914 |
C53 |
|
127 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P75 |
|
21/05/1951 |
06/1914 |
C53 |
|
128 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P75 |
|
01/1955 |
06/1914 |
C53 |
|
131 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
P75 |
|
19/07/1955 |
06/1914 |
|
|
1525 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R75 |
|
06/08/1951 |
06/1914 |
S69 |
|
1526 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R75 |
|
26/10/1951 |
08/1914 |
S69 |
|
1527 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R75 |
|
09/1947 |
08/1914 |
S69 |
|
1528 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R75 |
|
01/07/1953 |
09/1914 |
S69 |
|
1529 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
R75 |
|
03/02/1950 |
09/1914 |
B74 |
|
226 |
0-4-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
?? |
1583 |
23/04/1956 |
10/1914 |
B74 |
|
228 |
0-4-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
?? |
1584 |
23/10/1957 |
11/1914 |
|
|
1530 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
M77 |
|
09/11/1959 |
11/1914 |
S69 |
|
1531 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
M77 |
|
11/1947 |
12/1914 |
S69 |
|
1532 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
M77 |
|
01/07/1953 |
12/1914 |
|
|
1533 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
M77 |
|
03/11/1959 |
01/1915 |
L77 |
|
1000 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
L77 |
|
03/02/1959 |
02/1915 |
L77 |
|
1001 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
L77 |
|
05/05/1958 |
02/1915 |
S69 |
|
1534 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
M77 |
|
06/1945 |
03/1915 |
|
|
1535 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
M77 |
|
11/12/1959 |
05/1915 |
S69 |
|
1536 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B78 |
|
30/12/1949 |
07/1915 |
|
|
1537 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B78 |
|
22/04/1957 |
07/1915 |
|
|
1538 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B78 |
|
01/01/1957 |
08/1916 |
|
|
1140 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
T77 |
|
11/10/1960 |
08/1916 |
|
|
1141 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
T77 |
|
01/01/1959 |
08/1916 |
|
|
1142 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
T77 |
|
17/01/1961 |
09/1916 |
|
|
1143 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
T77 |
|
13/01/1961 |
10/1916 |
|
|
1144 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
T77 |
|
25/01/1960 |
11/1916 |
|
|
1145 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
T77 |
|
03/08/1961 |
11/1916 |
|
|
1146 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
T77 |
|
09/05/1960 |
11/1916 |
|
|
1147 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
T77 |
|
16/09/1962 |
12/1916 |
|
|
1148 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
T77 |
|
09/11/1959 |
01/1917 |
|
|
1149 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
T77 |
|
01/04/1960 |
06/1917 |
S69 |
|
1539 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B78 |
|
10/11/1954 |
07/1917 |
|
|
1540 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
B78 |
|
28/10/1957 |
12/1917 |
|
|
1260 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
H80 |
|
29/08/1960 |
12/1917 |
|
|
1261 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
H80 |
|
24/08/1959 |
01/1918 |
|
|
1262 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
H80 |
|
19/01/1959 |
03/1918 |
|
|
1263 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
H80 |
|
11/10/1960 |
09/1918 |
|
|
1264 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
H80 |
|
16/09/1962 |
11/1918 |
|
|
1265 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
X80 |
|
14/12/1959 |
11/1918 |
|
|
1266 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
X80 |
|
13/01/1961 |
12/1918 |
|
|
1267 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
X80 |
|
10/09/1961 |
01/1919 |
|
|
1268 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
X80 |
|
14/12/1959 |
03/1919 |
|
|
1269 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
X80 |
|
10/09/1961 |
03/1920 |
|
|
1561 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H82 |
|
30/09/1958 |
04/1920 |
|
|
1270 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
D81 |
|
14/12/1959 |
04/1920 |
|
|
1562 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H82 |
|
08/08/1955 |
04/1920 |
S69 |
|
1563 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H82 |
|
10/04/1953 |
04/1920 |
|
|
1564 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H82 |
|
24/11/1958 |
05/1920 |
|
|
1565 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H82 |
|
01/01/1957 |
05/1920 |
|
|
1566 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H82 |
|
26/01/1959 |
05/1920 |
|
|
1567 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H82 |
|
11/11/1958 |
06/1920 |
|
|
1541 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
135 |
01/01/1957 |
06/1920 |
|
|
1568 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H82 |
|
03/08/1959 |
06/1920 |
|
|
1569 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H82 |
|
01/01/1957 |
06/1920 |
|
|
1570 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Stratford Works |
H82 |
|
31/03/1958 |
07/1920 |
|
|
1542 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
136 |
14/07/1958 |
07/1920 |
S69 |
|
1543 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
137 |
19/06/1953 |
07/1920 |
S69 |
|
1544 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
138 |
09/1947 |
08/1920 |
|
|
1545 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
139 |
01/01/1957 |
09/1920 |
|
|
1250 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
A81 |
|
24/11/1959 |
09/1920 |
|
|
1546 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
140 |
11/05/1959 |
09/1920 |
|
|
1547 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
141 |
13/10/1958 |
10/1920 |
|
|
1251 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
A81 |
|
11/02/1962 |
10/1920 |
|
|
1252 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
A81 |
|
01/01/1959 |
10/1920 |
|
|
1253 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
A81 |
|
06/08/1962 |
10/1920 |
|
|
1550 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
142 |
01/01/1957 |
10/1920 |
S69 |
|
1551 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
145 |
01/1947 |
11/1920 |
|
|
1254 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
A81 |
|
16/01/1961 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1271 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
D81 |
|
10/09/1961 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1272 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
D81 |
|
10/09/1961 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1273 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
D81 |
|
23/09/1960 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1274 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
D81 |
|
13/01/1961 |
12/1920 |
S69 |
|
1552 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
146 |
17/07/1952 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1553 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
147 |
25/08/1958 |
01/1921 |
|
|
1554 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
148 |
15/09/1958 |
01/1921 |
|
|
1555 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
149 |
07/10/1957 |
01/1921 |
B74 |
|
210 |
0-4-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
?? |
1628 |
12/1963 |
01/1921 |
B74 |
|
229 |
0-4-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
?? |
1629 |
08/10/1956 |
02/1921 |
|
|
1556 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
150 |
23/12/1957 |
02/1921 |
|
|
1557 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
151 |
01/01/1957 |
02/1921 |
|
|
1558 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
152 |
13/04/1959 |
02/1921 |
|
|
1559 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
153 |
03/09/1951 |
03/1921 |
C53 |
|
125 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D85 |
|
24/03/1952 |
03/1921 |
C53 |
|
126 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D85 |
|
08/03/1955 |
03/1921 |
C53 |
|
129 |
0-6-0T |
J. Holden |
Stratford Works |
D85 |
|
02/08/1955 |
04/1921 |
S69 |
|
1560 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
154 |
09/05/1952 |
05/1921 |
S69 |
|
1548 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
143 |
12/1946 |
06/1921 |
|
|
1549 |
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
W82 |
144 |
01/01/1959 |
07/1921 |
L77 |
|
1002 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K85 |
|
27/07/1959 |
07/1921 |
L77 |
|
1003 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K85 |
|
27/07/1959 |
09/1921 |
L77 |
|
1004 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K85 |
|
10/08/1959 |
09/1921 |
L77 |
|
1005 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K85 |
|
06/10/1958 |
09/1921 |
L77 |
|
1006 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K85 |
|
11/08/1958 |
10/1921 |
L77 |
|
1007 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K85 |
|
22/07/1958 |
10/1921 |
L77 |
|
1008 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K85 |
|
11/08/1958 |
10/1921 |
L77 |
|
1009 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K85 |
|
28/04/1958 |
11/1921 |
L77 |
|
1010 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K85 |
|
01/01/1959 |
11/1921 |
L77 |
|
1011 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K85 |
|
24/11/1960 |
09/1922 |
|
|
1275 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
M87 |
|
13/01/1961 |
09/1922 |
|
|
1276 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
M87 |
|
02/11/1960 |
09/1922 |
|
|
1277 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
M87 |
|
23/09/1960 |
09/1922 |
|
|
1278 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
M87 |
|
11/1959 |
09/1922 |
|
|
1279 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
M87 |
|
27/06/1960 |
10/1922 |
|
|
1280 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
M87 |
|
06/10/1960 |
10/1922 |
|
|
1281 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
M87 |
|
22/08/1960 |
10/1922 |
|
|
1282 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
M87 |
|
16/09/1962 |
11/1922 |
|
|
1283 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
M87 |
|
12/01/1959 |
11/1922 |
|
|
1284 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
M87 |
|
13/01/1961 |
12/1922 |
|
|
1285 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
Y87 |
|
16/09/1962 |
12/1922 |
|
|
1286 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
Y87 |
|
16/09/1962 |
12/1922 |
|
|
1287 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
Y87 |
|
10/09/1961 |
12/1922 |
|
|
1288 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
Y87 |
|
22/08/1960 |
12/1922 |
|
|
1289 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
Y87 |
|
06/01/1960 |
12/1922 |
|
|
1290 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
Y87 |
|
12/01/1960 |
12/1922 |
|
|
1291 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
Y87 |
|
06/04/1962 |
01/1923 |
|
|
1292 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
Y87 |
|
10/09/1961 |
01/1923 |
|
|
1293 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
Y87 |
|
20/03/1961 |
01/1923 |
|
|
1294 |
0-6-0 |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
Y87 |
|
16/09/1962 |
10/1923 |
C72 |
|
31E |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
I89 |
|
18/08/1958 |
10/1923 |
C72 |
|
32E |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
I89 |
|
17/04/1959 |
10/1923 |
C72 |
|
33E |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
I89 |
|
18/08/1958 |
10/1923 |
C72 |
|
34E |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
I89 |
|
04/12/1960 |
10/1923 |
C72 |
|
35E |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
I89 |
|
18/12/1959 |
11/1923 |
C72 |
|
36E |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
I89 |
|
18/08/1958 |
11/1923 |
C72 |
|
37E |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
I89 |
|
11/10/1960 |
11/1923 |
C72 |
|
38E |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
I89 |
|
02/09/1958 |
11/1923 |
C72 |
|
39E |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
I89 |
|
07/12/1959 |
11/1923 |
C72 |
|
40E |
0-6-0T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
I89 |
|
18/08/1958 |
12/1923 |
L77 |
|
990 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K89 |
|
03/08/1959 |
12/1923 |
L77 |
|
991 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K89 |
|
09/11/1959 |
12/1923 |
L77 |
|
992 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K89 |
|
04/12/1960 |
01/1924 |
L77 |
|
993 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K89 |
|
12/09/1960 |
01/1924 |
L77 |
|
994 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K89 |
|
01/01/1959 |
01/1924 |
L77 |
|
995 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K89 |
|
04/07/1960 |
01/1924 |
L77 |
|
996 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K89 |
|
10/09/1961 |
02/1924 |
L77 |
|
997 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K89 |
|
16/02/1959 |
02/1924 |
L77 |
|
998 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K89 |
|
24/11/1960 |
03/1924 |
L77 |
|
999 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Stratford Works |
K89 |
|
11/09/1962 |
08/1925 |
|
|
409 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
24/11/1959 |
09/1925 |
|
|
421 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
12/02/1959 |
10/1925 |
|
|
426 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
01/12/1958 |
10/1925 |
|
|
456 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
17/04/1959 |
10/1925 |
|
|
457 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
08/06/1959 |
10/1925 |
|
|
907 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3897 |
04/12/1960 |
10/1925 |
|
|
912 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3898 |
03/05/1962 |
10/1925 |
|
|
913 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3899 |
04/12/1960 |
10/1925 |
|
|
916 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3900 |
10/08/1959 |
10/1925 |
|
|
918 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3901 |
10/04/1961 |
10/1925 |
|
|
919 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3902 |
08/06/1959 |
10/1925 |
|
|
935 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3903 |
07/04/1961 |
11/1925 |
|
|
460 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
23/03/1959 |
11/1925 |
|
|
464 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
01/12/1958 |
11/1925 |
|
|
471 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
29/08/1960 |
11/1925 |
|
|
473 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
24/11/1960 |
11/1925 |
|
|
940 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3904 |
19/01/1959 |
11/1925 |
|
|
941 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3905 |
18/05/1959 |
11/1925 |
|
|
947 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3906 |
19/10/1959 |
11/1925 |
|
|
950 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3907 |
04/05/1959 |
12/1925 |
|
|
475 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
23/01/1961 |
12/1925 |
|
|
952 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3908 |
01/11/1960 |
12/1925 |
|
|
964 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3909 |
30/11/1960 |
12/1925 |
|
|
966 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3910 |
29/02/1960 |
12/1925 |
|
|
967 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3911 |
09/03/1959 |
12/1925 |
|
|
968 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3912 |
03/02/1959 |
12/1925 |
|
|
970 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3913 |
10/09/1961 |
12/1925 |
|
|
971 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3914 |
06/04/1959 |
01/1926 |
|
|
826 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
16/09/1962 |
01/1926 |
|
|
987 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3915 |
10/09/1961 |
01/1926 |
|
|
988 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
3916 |
16/09/1962 |
02/1926 |
|
|
827 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
10/08/1959 |
02/1926 |
|
|
828 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
13/01/1959 |
02/1926 |
|
|
829 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
09/03/1959 |
03/1926 |
|
|
830 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
24/11/1960 |
04/1926 |
|
|
832 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
31/03/1959 |
04/1926 |
|
|
833 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
19/05/1959 |
05/1926 |
|
|
834 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
05/01/1959 |
06/1926 |
|
|
837 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
16/09/1962 |
06/1926 |
|
|
838 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
01/12/1958 |
07/1926 |
|
|
850 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
24/11/1960 |
07/1926 |
|
|
851 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
19/05/1958 |
09/1926 |
|
|
852 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
27/01/1959 |
09/1926 |
|
|
853 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
01/11/1960 |
10/1926 |
|
|
865 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
16/09/1962 |
10/1926 |
|
|
866 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
24/11/1960 |
11/1926 |
|
|
867 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
29/08/1960 |
12/1926 |
|
|
868 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
27/07/1959 |
12/1926 |
|
|
870 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
19/05/1959 |
02/1927 |
|
|
873 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
13/01/1961 |
07/1927 |
|
|
2642 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
305 |
04/12/1960 |
07/1927 |
|
|
2643 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
306 |
15/02/1960 |
07/1927 |
|
|
2644 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
307 |
29/08/1960 |
07/1927 |
|
|
2645 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
308 |
04/12/1960 |
07/1927 |
|
|
2646 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
309 |
10/09/1961 |
07/1927 |
|
|
2647 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
310 |
04/12/1960 |
07/1927 |
|
|
2648 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
311 |
24/11/1960 |
08/1927 |
|
|
2649 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
312 |
25/03/1957 |
08/1927 |
|
|
2650 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
313 |
13/01/1961 |
08/1927 |
|
|
2651 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
314 |
04/12/1960 |
08/1927 |
|
|
2652 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
315 |
16/09/1962 |
08/1927 |
|
|
2653 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
316 |
10/09/1961 |
08/1927 |
|
|
2654 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
317 |
24/11/1960 |
08/1927 |
|
|
2655 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
318 |
01/12/1958 |
08/1927 |
|
|
2656 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
319 |
27/04/1961 |
09/1927 |
|
|
2657 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
320 |
16/09/1962 |
09/1927 |
|
|
2658 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
321 |
10/09/1961 |
09/1927 |
|
|
2659 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
322 |
24/11/1960 |
09/1927 |
|
|
2660 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
323 |
04/12/1960 |
09/1927 |
|
|
2661 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
?? |
324 |
04/12/1960 |
11/1927 |
|
|
2600 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
310 |
1669 |
17/03/1961 |
11/1927 |
|
|
2601 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
310 |
1670 |
01/01/1959 |
11/1927 |
|
|
2602 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
310 |
1671 |
18/10/1960 |
11/1927 |
|
|
2603 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
310 |
1672 |
22/06/1959 |
11/1927 |
|
|
2604 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
310 |
1673 |
04/12/1960 |
11/1927 |
|
|
2605 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
310 |
1674 |
27/04/1961 |
11/1927 |
|
|
2632 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
05/10/1959 |
11/1927 |
|
|
2633 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
10/09/1961 |
11/1927 |
|
|
2634 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
12/06/1961 |
11/1927 |
|
|
2635 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
26/06/1961 |
12/1927 |
|
|
2606 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
310 |
1675 |
13/01/1961 |
12/1927 |
|
|
2607 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
310 |
1676 |
01/11/1960 |
12/1927 |
|
|
2608 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
310 |
1677 |
10/09/1961 |
12/1927 |
|
|
2609 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
310 |
1678 |
23/11/1959 |
12/1927 |
|
|
2610 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
311 |
1679 |
04/12/1960 |
12/1927 |
|
|
2636 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
16/02/1959 |
12/1927 |
|
|
2637 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
24/11/1960 |
01/1928 |
|
|
2611 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
311 |
1680 |
10/09/1961 |
01/1928 |
|
|
2612 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
311 |
1681 |
10/09/1961 |
01/1928 |
|
|
2613 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
311 |
1682 |
04/12/1960 |
01/1928 |
|
|
2638 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
10/09/1961 |
01/1928 |
|
|
2639 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
17/01/1961 |
02/1928 |
|
|
2614 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
311 |
1683 |
12/02/1959 |
02/1928 |
|
|
2615 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
311 |
1684 |
01/01/1959 |
02/1928 |
|
|
2616 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
311 |
1685 |
04/12/1960 |
02/1928 |
|
|
2640 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
04/12/1960 |
02/1928 |
|
|
2641 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
04/12/1960 |
03/1928 |
|
|
2617 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
311 |
1686 |
24/11/1960 |
04/1928 |
|
|
2618 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
311 |
1687 |
01/11/1960 |
06/1928 |
|
|
2619 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
312 |
1688 |
04/12/1960 |
06/1928 |
|
|
2620 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
312 |
1689 |
04/12/1960 |
07/1928 |
|
|
2621 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
312 |
1690 |
10/09/1961 |
07/1928 |
|
|
2622 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
312 |
1691 |
10/09/1961 |
07/1928 |
|
|
2623 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
312 |
1692 |
16/09/1962 |
08/1928 |
|
|
|
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
1513 |
6487 |
12/1959 |
08/1928 |
|
|
|
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
1513 |
6488 |
20/09/1961 |
08/1928 |
|
|
|
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
1513 |
6489 |
01/01/1959 |
08/1928 |
|
|
|
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
1513 |
6490 |
01/01/1957 |
08/1928 |
|
|
|
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
1513 |
6492 |
01/01/1959 |
09/1928 |
|
|
|
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
1513 |
6491 |
06/04/1959 |
09/1928 |
|
|
|
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
1513 |
6493 |
28/09/1959 |
09/1928 |
|
|
|
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
1513 |
6494 |
01/01/1957 |
09/1928 |
|
|
|
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
1513 |
6495 |
01/01/1957 |
09/1928 |
|
|
2624 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
312 |
1696 |
04/12/1960 |
09/1928 |
|
|
2625 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
312 |
1697 |
24/11/1960 |
10/1928 |
|
|
|
4-6-0 |
S. Holden |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
1513 |
6496 |
02/03/1959 |
10/1928 |
|
|
2626 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
312 |
1698 |
10/09/1961 |
10/1928 |
|
|
2627 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
312 |
1699 |
04/12/1960 |
11/1928 |
|
|
2628 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
312 |
1701 |
10/09/1961 |
11/1928 |
|
|
2629 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
313 |
1702 |
03/02/1959 |
12/1928 |
|
|
2630 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
313 |
1704 |
10/09/1961 |
12/1928 |
|
|
2631 |
0-6-2T |
A. Hill |
Doncaster Works |
313 |
1706 |
17/10/1960 |