z Railway Companies

Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 953 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6929 Week
» 13063 Month
» 240947 Year
» 1462512 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
London, Midland & Scottish Railway and Constituent Companies
Company CME Date Incorporated Date Amalgamated Locomotives
LMS London, Midland & Scottish Railway   1923-01-01 1947-12-31  
CR Caledonian Railway        
FR Furness Railway     1922-12-31  
GSWR Glasgow and South Western Railway     1922-12-31  
HR Highland Railway     1922-12-31  
LYR Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway        
LNWR London and North Western Railway        
MCR Maryport & Carlisle Railway   1836-00-00 1923-01-01  
MR Midland Railway        
NSR North Staffordshire Railway        
SDJR Somerset & Dorset Joint Railway