z Railway Companies

Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 262 Today
» 812 Yesterday
» 5911 Week
» 13977 Month
» 155931 Year
» 1040312 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Locomotives of the Highland Railway
Build Date HR Class LMS Class First HR Number Wheels Designer Manufacturer Order Number Works Number Withdrawn
02/1869 R   56 0-6-0T W. Stroudley Lochgorm Works ??   1926
11/1872 R   57 0-6-0T W. Stroudley Lochgorm Works ??   1932
10/1874 R   16 0-6-0T W. Stroudley Lochgorm Works ??   1928
12/1878 O   58 2-4-0T D. Jones Lochgorm Works ??   1928
06/1879 O   59 2-4-0T D. Jones Lochgorm Works ??   1933
12/1879 O   17 2-4-0T D. Jones Lochgorm Works ??   1929
05/1882 L   70 4-4-0 D. Jones Lochgorm Works ??   06/1930
05/1886 E   77 4-4-0 D. Jones Clyde Locomotive Co. ?? 2 1918
06/1886 E   78 4-4-0 D. Jones Clyde Locomotive Co. ?? 3 1923
06/1886 E   79 4-4-0 D. Jones Clyde Locomotive Co. ?? 4 1932
07/1886 E   80 4-4-0 D. Jones Clyde Locomotive Co. ?? 5 1923
07/1886 E   81 4-4-0 D. Jones Clyde Locomotive Co. ?? 6 1923
09/1886 E   82 4-4-0 D. Jones Clyde Locomotive Co. ?? 7 06/1930
10/1886 E   83 4-4-0 D. Jones Clyde Locomotive Co. ?? 8 08/1923
12/1886 E   76 4-4-0 D. Jones Clyde Locomotive Co. ?? 1 1923
05/1890 S   13 0-4-4ST D. Jones Lochgorm Works ??   1929
05/1892 L   85 4-4-0 D. Jones Lochgorm Works ??   08/1923
05/1892 D   89 4-4-0 D. Jones Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4428 08/1930
05/1892 D   90 4-4-0 D. Jones Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4429 1923
06/1892 D   100 4-4-0 D. Jones Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4439 1930
06/1892 D   91 4-4-0 D. Jones Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4430 1923
06/1892 D   92 4-4-0 D. Jones Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4431 06/1930
06/1892 D   93 4-4-0 D. Jones Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4432 1923
06/1892 D   94 4-4-0 D. Jones Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4433 1924
06/1892 D   95 4-4-0 D. Jones Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4434 1930
06/1892 D   96 4-4-0 D. Jones Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4435 1923
06/1892 D   97 4-4-0 D. Jones Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4436 1923
06/1892 D   98 4-4-0 D. Jones Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4437 1930
06/1892 D   99 4-4-0 D. Jones Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4438 1923
09/1892 P   101 4-4-0T D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 2778 07/1934
09/1892 P   102 4-4-0T D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 2779 12/1934
03/1893 L   86 4-4-0 D. Jones Lochgorm Works ??   10/1927
11/1893     11 4-4-0T D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3077 1924
11/1893     14 4-4-0T D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3078 1924
11/1893     15 4-4-0T D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3079 1927
12/1893 L   87 4-4-0 D. Jones Lochgorm Works ??   08/1926
09/1894 I   103 4-6-0 D. Jones Sharp Stewart ?? 4022 07/1934
09/1894 I   104 4-6-0 D. Jones Sharp Stewart ?? 4023 11/1939
09/1894 I   105 4-6-0 D. Jones Sharp Stewart ?? 4024 1933
09/1894 I   106 4-6-0 D. Jones Sharp Stewart ?? 4025 12/1934
09/1894 I   107 4-6-0 D. Jones Sharp Stewart ?? 4026 10/1937
10/1894 I   108 4-6-0 D. Jones Sharp Stewart ?? 4027 1930
10/1894 I   109 4-6-0 D. Jones Sharp Stewart ?? 4028 1929
10/1894 I   110 4-6-0 D. Jones Sharp Stewart ?? 4029 11/1935
10/1894 I   111 4-6-0 D. Jones Sharp Stewart ?? 4030 09/1934
10/1894 I   112 4-6-0 D. Jones Sharp Stewart ?? 4031 02/1940
10/1894 I   113 4-6-0 D. Jones Sharp Stewart ?? 4032 11/1939
10/1894 I   114 4-6-0 D. Jones Sharp Stewart ?? 4033 09/1936
11/1894 I   115 4-6-0 D. Jones Sharp Stewart ?? 4034 1933
11/1894 I   116 4-6-0 D. Jones Sharp Stewart ?? 4035 06/1936
11/1894 I   117 4-6-0 D. Jones Sharp Stewart ?? 4036 11/1939
04/1895 L   88 4-4-0 D. Jones Lochgorm Works ??   1926
07/1896 B   119 4-4-0 D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3392 03/1948
07/1896 B   120 4-4-0 D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3393 12/1940
07/1896 B   126 4-4-0 D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3399 08/1938
07/1896 B   127 4-4-0 D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3400 1930
08/1896 B   121 4-4-0 D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3394 03/1940
08/1896 B   122 4-4-0 D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3395 12/1940
08/1896 B   123 4-4-0 D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3396 02/1934
08/1896 B   124 4-4-0 D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3397 09/1938
08/1896 B   125 4-4-0 D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3398 04/1950
08/1896 B   128 4-4-0 D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3401 1930
09/1896 B   129 4-4-0 D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3402 1931
09/1896 B   130 4-4-0 D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3403 02/1937
09/1896 B   131 4-4-0 D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3404 08/1941
09/1896 B   132 4-4-0 D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3405 04/1947
09/1896 B   133 4-4-0 D. Jones Dübs & Co ?? 3406 12/1934
08/1897 L   5 4-4-0 D. Jones Lochgorm Works ??   1929
11/1897 L   6 4-4-0 D. Jones Lochgorm Works ??   1929
07/1898 C   1 4-4-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3686 02/1949
07/1898 C   2 4-4-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3687 02/1953
07/1898 C   3 4-4-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3688 05/1952
07/1898 L   7 4-4-0 D. Jones Lochgorm Works ??   06/1930
02/1899 C   4 4-4-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3689 10/1946
02/1899 C   5 4-4-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3690 10/1948
02/1899 C   6 4-4-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3691 12/1939
02/1899 C   7 4-4-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3692 02/1949
02/1899 C   8 4-4-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3693 10/1950
07/1899 C   9 4-4-0 P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   09/1944
08/1899 C   10 4-4-0 P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   07/1947
11/1899 C   11 4-4-0 P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   12/1931
02/1900     134 0-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3842 06/1949
02/1900     135 0-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3843 02/1950
02/1900     136 0-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3844 01/1952
02/1900     137 0-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3845 03/1946
02/1900     138 0-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3846 02/1951
02/1900     139 0-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3847 12/1951
04/1900 C   12 4-4-0 P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   07/1947
06/1900 C   13 4-4-0 P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   04/1950
06/1900     140 4-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3848 08/1939
06/1900     141 4-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3849 09/1937
06/1900     142 4-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3850 02/1939
06/1900     143 4-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3851 02/1946
06/1900     144 4-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3852 02/1936
06/1900     145 4-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 3853 05/1930
08/1900 C   14 4-4-0 P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   12/1949
02/1901 C   15 4-4-0 P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   10/1936
02/1901 C   16 4-4-0 P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   04/1947
02/1901 C   17 4-4-0 P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   12/1933
12/1901 L   48 4-4-0 D. Jones Lochgorm Works ??   1928
07/1902     146 4-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 4244 09/1946
07/1902     147 4-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 4245 11/1943
07/1902     148 4-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 4246 04/1937
07/1902     149 4-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 4247 01/1940
08/1902     18 0-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 4240 02/1949
08/1902     19 0-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 4241 12/1946
08/1902     20 0-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 4242 02/1936
08/1902     21 0-6-0 P. Drummond Dübs & Co ?? 4243 11/1949
10/1903     22 0-6-0T P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   1930
10/1903     23 0-6-0T P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   1932
05/1904     24 0-6-0T P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   1930
03/1905       0-4-4T P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   07/1956
03/1905     25 0-4-4T P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   22/06/1956
09/1905     40 0-4-4T P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   12/1930
12/1905       0-4-4T P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   16/01/1957
12/1905     45 0-4-4T P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   16/01/1957
02/1906     46 0-4-4T P. Drummond Lochgorm Works ??   10/1945
04/1906 C   38 4-4-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 17398 12/1933
07/1906 C   41 4-4-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 17399 05/1948
07/1906 C   47 4-4-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 17400 09/1948
07/1907     36 0-6-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 17896 07/1947
07/1907     55 0-6-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 17897 12/1946
05/1908     61 4-4-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 18269 05/1936
05/1908     63 4-4-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 18270 12/1932
05/1908     66 4-4-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 18271 10/1935
05/1908     68 4-4-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 18272 04/1934
1909     39 0-6-4T P. Drummond North British ?? 18805 12/1936
1909     64 0-6-4T P. Drummond North British ?? 18806 10/1934
1909     65 0-6-4T P. Drummond North British ?? 18807 08/1933
1909     69 0-6-4T P. Drummond North British ?? 18808 10/1932
05/1909     60 4-4-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 18803 10/1932
05/1909     62 4-4-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 18804 03/1937
03/1910     30 4-6-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 19011 01/1945
1911     29 0-6-4T P. Drummond North British ?? 19013 10/1932
1911     31 0-6-4T P. Drummond North British ?? 19014 11/1934
1911     42 0-6-4T P. Drummond North British ?? 19015 11/1935
1911     44 0-6-4T P. Drummond North British ?? 19016 11/1934
02/1911     35 4-6-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 19012 07/1946
04/1913     26 4-6-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 20160 05/1935
04/1913     29 4-6-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 20163 04/1947
07/1913     27 4-6-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 20161 02/1935
07/1913     28 4-6-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 20162 08/1944
09/1915     70 4-6-0 F. Smith Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3095 11/1939
09/1915     71 4-6-0 F. Smith Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3096 12/1936
11/1915     940 4-6-0 F. Smith Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3097 09/1945
11/1915     941 4-6-0 F. Smith Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3098 02/1939
12/1915     942 4-6-0 F. Smith Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3099 12/1946
12/1915     943 4-6-0 F. Smith Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3100 11/1939
1916     70 4-4-0 D. Jones North British ?? 21456 09/1936
1916     71 4-4-0 D. Jones North British ?? 21457 11/1935
1916     72 4-4-0 D. Jones North British ?? 21458 10/1934
11/1916 Superheated Goods   81 4-6-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3373 05/1952
1917     73 4-4-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3172 04/1936
1917     74 4-4-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3173 04/1935
03/1917     50 4-6-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 21459 09/1938
03/1917     58 4-6-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 21460 03/1946
04/1917     59 4-6-0 P. Drummond North British ?? 21461 04/1935
04/1918 Superheated Goods   75 4-6-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3286 08/1950
04/1918 Superheated Goods   76 4-6-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3287 24/05/1951
05/1918 Superheated Goods   77 4-6-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3288 09/1946
06/1918 Superheated Goods   78 4-6-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3289 18/09/1948
04/1919 Highland Clan   49 4-6-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3329 06/1947
04/1919 Highland Clan   51 4-6-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3330 08/1944
04/1919 Highland Clan   52 4-6-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3331 02/1948
06/1919 Highland Clan   53 4-6-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3332 01/1945
10/1919 Superheated Goods   79 4-6-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3371 10/1952
10/1919 Superheated Goods   80 4-6-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3372 06/1952
11/1919 Superheated Goods   82 4-6-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3374 03/1946
07/1921 Highland Clan   54 4-6-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3443 03/1944
07/1921 Highland Clan   55 4-6-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3444 02/1950
07/1921 Highland Clan   56 4-6-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3445 03/1945
08/1921 Highland Clan   57 4-6-0 C. Cumming Hawthorne Leslie ?? 3446 10/1943