z Railway Companies

Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 630 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 4085 Week
» 15378 Month
» 280011 Year
» 1501576 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Locomotives of the Brecon and Merthyr Junction Railway
Build Date BMJR Class GWR Class First BMJR Number Wheels Designer Manufacturer Order Number Works Number Withdrawn
12/1909     36 0-6-2T J. Dunbar Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ??   17/01/1949
12/1909     37 0-6-2T J. Dunbar Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ??   12/06/1950
12/1909     38 0-6-2T J. Dunbar Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ??   09/12/1949
01/1910     39 0-6-2T J. Dunbar Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ??   10/01/1948
03/1914     40 0-6-2T J. Dunbar Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ??   20/02/1951
03/1914     41 0-6-2T J. Dunbar Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ??   21/03/1950
04/1914     42 0-6-2T J. Dunbar Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ?? 3579 14/11/1947
04/1914     43 0-6-2T J. Dunbar Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ??   11/08/1950
08/1915     45 0-6-2T J. Dunbar Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ??   10/1953
09/1915     46 0-6-2T J. Dunbar Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ??   05/1953
09/1915     47 0-6-2T J. Dunbar Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ??   08/02/1951
02/1921     48 0-6-2T J. Dunbar Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ??   09/1953
02/1921     49 0-6-2T J. Dunbar Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ??   02/1954
02/1921     50 0-6-2T J. Dunbar Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ??   02/1954