Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 804 Today
» 1193 Yesterday
» 3099 Week
» 28881 Month
» 226398 Year
» 302985 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 4-4-2

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
de Glehn De Glehn   4-4-2 1903   GWR   102 - 104     3
Marsh Atlantics   4-4-2     SR   32421 - 32426 06/1911 04/1958 6
Marsh Atlantics   4-4-2     SR   32037 - 32039 12/1905 07/1951 3
Ivatt C1 GNR class 'C1' 4-4-2 1902 GNR LNER 2P 62808 - 62885 06/1904 27/11/1950 94
Ivatt C2 GNR class 'C1' 4-4-2 1898 GNR LNER         0
Robinson C4 GCR class '8B' 4-4-2 1903 GCR LNER 2P 62902 - 62924 12/1903 02/12/1950 27
Robinson C5 GCR class '8D' 4-4-2 1905 GCR LNER         4
Robinson C5 GCR class '8E' 4-4-2 1905 GCR LNER         4
Worsdell C6 NER class 'V' 4-4-2 1903 NER LNER 3P 62933 - 62937 06/1904 12/03/1948 20
Worsdell C6 NER class 'V/09' 4-4-2 1903 NER LNER 3P 62933 - 62937 06/1904 12/03/1948 20
Raven C7 NER class 'Z' 4-4-2 1911 NER LNER 3P 62954 - 62995 07/1911 26/06/1954 50
Worsdell C8 NER class '4CC' 4-4-2 1906 NER LNER         0
Raven/Gresley C9   4-4-2 1931   LNER         0
Reid C10 NBR class 'H' 4-4-2 1906 NBR LNER         0
Reid C10 NBR class 'I' 4-4-2 1906 NBR LNER         0
Reid C11 NBR class 'H' 4-4-2 1906 NBR LNER         0